McCarthy et al v. Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Davis, Pamela Faust, Sondra Russell, Valarie Jolly, Jan-Marie Brown, Christine M Whalen, Gabriel Garavanian, June Stansbury, Lenard Marazzo, Mary Katherine Arcell, Deborah Pulfer, Carolyn Fjord, Donna Frye, Lisa McCarthy, Bill Rubinsohn, Clyde Duane Stensrud, Diana Lynn Ultican, Donald C Freeland, Jose Brito, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Pamela Ward, Timothy Nieboer, Harry Garavanian, Keith Dean Bradt, Rosemary D'Augusta, Gary Talewsky and Michael Malaney
Defendant: Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Barclays Capital, Inc., Lloyds Bank PLC, Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group Inc., HSBC Holdings plc, Credit Suisse Group AG, CitiGroup, Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Deutsche Bank AG, UBS AG, Barclays Bank, PLC, Citibank, N.A., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ LTD, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, MUFG Bank, Ltd., UBS Group AG, Royal Bank of Scotland, PLC, Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Lloyds Securities Inc., National Westminster Bank plc, Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group Inc., Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Credit Suisse AG, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank PLC, The Norinchukin Bank, ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, UBS Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., RBC Capital Markets, LLC and ICE Data Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv05832
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc., CitiGroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Lloyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group Inc., National Westminster Bank plc, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Royal Bank of Scotland, PLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd, Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group Inc., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ LTD, The Norinchukin Bank, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/20/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 ***SUMMONS ISSUED IN ERROR BY CLERK***Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc., CitiGroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Lloyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group Inc., National Westminster Bank plc, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Royal Bank of Scotland, PLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd, Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group Inc., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ LTD, The Norinchukin Bank, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 ***DIREGARD. FILED IN INCORRRECT CASE.*** Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per Order at docket # 63 . Amended Pleadings due by 9/8/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/19/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 ***DISREGARD. ERROR IN ASSSIGNMENT.*** Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/19/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD. ERROR IN ASSIGNMENT*** Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc., CitiGroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Lloyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Securities Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group Inc., National Westminster Bank plc, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Royal Bank of Scotland, PLC, SMBC Capital Markets, Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd, Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group Inc., The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ LTD, The Norinchukin Bank, UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Securities LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020) Modified on 8/19/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mary Katherine Arcell, Keith Dean Bradt, Jose Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Donald C Freeland, Donna Frye, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valarie Jolly, Michael Malaney, Lenard Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Nieboer, Deborah Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde Duane Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Diana Lynn Ultican, Pamela Ward, Christine M Whalen.. (Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Mary Katherine Arcell, Keith Dean Bradt, Jose Brito, Jan-Marie Brown, Rosemary D'Augusta, Brenda Davis, Pamela Faust, Carolyn Fjord, Donald C Freeland, Donna Frye, Gabriel Garavanian, Harry Garavanian, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Valarie Jolly, Michael Malaney, Lenard Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Timothy Nieboer, Deborah Pulfer, Bill Rubinsohn, Sondra Russell, June Stansbury, Clyde Duane Stensrud, Gary Talewsky, Diana Lynn Ultican, Pamela Ward, Christine M Whalen . (Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction and for Damages Against Defendants Violations of Sections 1 and 2 of the Sherman Antitrust Act against All Defendants with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14832162.). Filed by Sondra Russell, Brenda Davis, Pamela Ward, Timothy Nieboer, Michael Malaney, Christine M Whalen, Bill Rubinsohn, Donald C Freeland, Donna Frye, Gabriel Garavanian, Valarie Jolly, Deborah Pulfer, Mary Katherine Arcell, Lenard Marazzo, Lisa McCarthy, Diana Lynn Ultican, Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner, Gary Talewsky, June Stansbury, Clyde Duane Stensrud, Harry Garavanian, Rosemary D'Augusta, Keith Dean Bradt, Carolyn Fjord, Pamela Faust, Jose Brito, Jan-Marie Brown. (Alioto, Joseph) (Filed on 8/18/2020) Modified on 8/19/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy et al v. Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Davis
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Faust
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sondra Russell
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valarie Jolly
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan-Marie Brown
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine M Whalen
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Garavanian
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Stansbury
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenard Marazzo
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Katherine Arcell
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Pulfer
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Fjord
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Frye
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa McCarthy
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Rubinsohn
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Duane Stensrud
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Lynn Ultican
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C Freeland
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Brito
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Jocelyn Gardner
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Ward
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Nieboer
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Garavanian
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dean Bradt
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary D'Augusta
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Talewsky
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Malaney
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto, Sr.
Represented By: Angelina Alioto-Grace
Represented By: Lawrence Genaro Papale
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Miller
Represented By: Christopher A.. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coperatieve Rabobank U.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMBC Capital Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Bank, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Group AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Exchange, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Securities Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Westminster Bank plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natwest Markets Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Norinchukin Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Benchmark Administration Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICE Data Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?