Bonvino et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1 et al
Plaintiff: Richard Bonvino, Raymond Hartley, Daniel Matheny, Faith Perue, Brandi Smith, Raymond Acosta, Michele Gil, June Yu, Eric Johnson, Rocky Jensen, Karen Fleeman, George Kelly, Sentelle Eubanks, Roy Tada, Dennis Karst, Clarence Dykes, Linda Kelly, Kirk Williams, Brian Lee, Lewis Woods, Stanley Kelly, Michael Johnson, Raymond Jack, Loretha Barthel, Steven Newkirk, Rosa Matthews, William Fast, Michelle Sandowsky, Linda Stiers, Tommy Davis, Samuel Pewett, Richard Peloquin, Judith Motyka, Gloria Trillo-Robinson, Alam Ali, Barry Weiner, Anthony Scarsciotti, Laurie Woods, Anthony Nichogi, Peter Looney, Walter Cardinal, Marybelle Calhoun, Christopher Villa, Jack Dudum, Gerald Mariner, Julieta Marx, Christina Diaz, Guy Harris, Donald Quick, Dale Bremenour, Kurt Carr, Linda Goolsby, Harold Baker, Denny Ellingsen and Robert Hasson
Defendant: Grocery Outlet, Inc., Safeway Health, Inc., Kaiser Permanente International, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6, Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5, Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3, The Vons Companies, Inc., Safeway, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Pfizer Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv06948
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 38 Certified copy of docket sheet and remand order mailed to Alameda County Superior Court (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED EX PARTE APPLICATIONS TO STRIKE NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND REMANDING TO STATE COURT granting (25) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (30) Motion ; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-06947-SI; granting (29) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (34) Motion ; finding as moot (11) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-06948-SI; granting (15) Administrative Motion ; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (10) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-06953-SI; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay; granting (28) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (33) Motion in case 3:20-cv-06954-SI; granting (26) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (31) Motion ; finding as moot (9) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-06955-SI; granting (25) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (30) Motion ; finding as moot (9) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-06960-SI. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Ex Parte Motion to Strike Removal and Remand Case Hearing held on 10/29/2020. Total Time in Court: 38 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Brent Wisner (Chung, Cook, Rasmussen), Jennifer Moore (Bonvino, Ingram, Henderson). Defendant Attorney: Mark Cheffo (GlaxoSmithKline LLC), Fritz Zimmer (Boehringer Ingelheim Entities), Paige Sharpe (Sanofi Entities), Jessica Rydstrom Pfizer, Inc.), Sophia Castillo (Grocery Outlet, Inc.), Robert Guite (Kaiser Permanente International, Inc.), Sarah Johnston (Safeway, Inc. and The Vons Companies, Inc.). (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Combined Ex Parte Motion Hearing re: Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is requ ired of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 27, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Order finding that the Brand Defendants have no obligation to answer or otherwise respond to complaints, or alternatively, an extension of time to file responsive pleadings until November 30, 2020. filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 11/6/2020. Replies due by 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE: Set/Reset Deadlines as to:(8 in 3:20-cv-06947-SI) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, (11 in 3:20-cv-06948-SI) MOTION to Stay , (10 in 3:20-cv-06953-SI) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, (6 in 3:20-cv-06954-SI) MOTION to Stay , (9 in 3:20-cv-06955-SI) Amended MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 8, (9 in 3:20-cv-06960-SI) MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY (re #29 First Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case ) filed byRichard Bonvino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #29 First Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case ) filed bySanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn Podsiadlo)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Stay ) filed bySanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn Podsiadlo)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 29 First Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case filed by Richard Bonvino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sosa Order, #2 Declaration of Nour Abdelhady, #3 Declaration of Edward Franklin, #4 Declaration of Nathan Gibbons, #5 Declaration of John Papanicolas, #6 Declaration of Gregory Stephens, #7 Declaration of Jack Thompson, #8 Declaration of Ryan White, #9 Declaration of Laurie Woods, #10 Declaration of Kenneth Wright, #11 Proposed Order)(Moore, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 28 Renotice motion hearing re #11 MOTION to Stay filed byBoehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Stay ) filed byRichard Bonvino. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth Wright, #2 Declaration of Gregory Stephens, #3 Declaration of Nathan Gibbons)(Moore, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 26 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/14/20. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 10/14/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3.. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Bodger Rydstrom for Pfizer Inc. (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3 re #1 Notice of Removal,, #11 MOTION to Stay (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3, Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4, Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6, The Vons Companies, Inc. of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2 re #15 Certificate of Interested Entities,, #14 Notice of Appearance (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2 identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1; Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2. (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brian Shortnacy (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARINGS: According to Local Rule 7, motions must be noticed for a hearing not less than 35 days from filing. Due to the recent filing of #11 Motion to Stay, the court resets the hearing date from 11/5/2020 to 11/12/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. All other deadlines in the briefing schedule remain in effect. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or vi deoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/13/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay filed by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/20/2020. Replies due by 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tommy Huynh (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon D. Mayo (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3 . (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/20/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3 identifying Corporate Parent GlaxoSmithKline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam for GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for Alameda County. Their case number is RG20073321. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15027820). Filed byBoehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3, Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4, Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Retailer Consents to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonvino et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bonvino
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Hartley
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Matheny
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Perue
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Smith
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Acosta
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Gil
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Yu
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Jensen
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Fleeman
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Kelly
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentelle Eubanks
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Tada
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Karst
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Dykes
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kelly
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Williams
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lee
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Woods
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Kelly
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Jack
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretha Barthel
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Newkirk
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Matthews
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Fast
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sandowsky
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Stiers
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Davis
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Pewett
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Peloquin
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Motyka
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Trillo-Robinson
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alam Ali
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Weiner
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Scarsciotti
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Woods
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Nichogi
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Looney
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Cardinal
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marybelle Calhoun
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Villa
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Dudum
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Mariner
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julieta Marx
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Diaz
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Harris
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Quick
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Bremenour
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Carr
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Goolsby
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Baker
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denny Ellingsen
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hasson
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Outlet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 6
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 5
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as Doe 3
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vons Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?