Eggers et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1 et al
Plaintiff: Eric Pinkston, Andrew O. Bridgeman, James Messelbeck, Robert Ducharme, Joyce Tassler, Jennifer L. Steele, Lisa Lalonde, Thomas J. Seeley, Samuel Anoai, Jon Davenport, Sandra Taylor, Deborah D. Cline, Michael A. Einerson, Willie B. Moore, Cheryl L. Conant, Pamela Spangle, Dawn Ban, Reginald Dechard, Phillip Porpora, William F. Colston, James Green, Derrick Pregler, Melissa Hollander, Robert L. Mobley, Laurie J. Dietz, Lionel Lancaster, James R. Dorminey, Nigel B. Taylor, Charles A. Wieben, Gerald Lerner, Jerry D. Hasson, Danel L. Bass, Jeffrey A. Salter, Tonjua Bradley, Alvin Tripp, James M. Altavilla, Freda J. Barrow, Marcia Ford, Mariangela Nobre, Henry Merritt, Rodney E. Gravatt, Frederick R. McCurtis, James C. Sims, Susie J. McDonald, Darryl Dahlquist, Amy P. Marsh, Robert J. Thode, Marilyn Keeton, Sarah G. Teausaw, John D. Eggers and Roger L. Morris
Defendant: The Vons Companies, Inc., Grocery Outlet, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as DOE 2, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1, Kaiser Permanente International, Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 4, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6, Safeway, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 3, Safeway Health, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Pfizer Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv07274
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' COMBINED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REMAND CASES TO STATE COURT granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07266-SI; granting (32) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07267-SI; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07268-SI; granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07270-SI; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay; granting (28) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07271-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07272-SI; finding as moot (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07274-SI; finding as moot (10) Motion to Stay; granting (24) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07276-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07277-SI; granting (23) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (5) Motion to Stay; finding as moot (11) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07280-SI; finding as moot (8) Motion to Stay; granting (26) Ex Parte Application in case 3:20-cv-07282-SI; granting (24) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (9) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07283-SI; granting (26) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (4) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07287-SI; granting (29) Ex Parte Application ; finding as moot (6) Motion to Stay in case 3:20-cv-07291-SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/12/2020. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 24 Ex Parte Application to Strike Removal and Remand Case filed by James M. Altavilla, Samuel Anoai, Dawn Ban, Freda J. Barrow, Danel L. Bass, Tonjua Bradley, Andrew O. Bridgeman, Deborah D. Cline, William F. Colston, Cheryl L. Conant, Darryl Dahlquist, Jon Davenport, Reginald Dechard, Laurie J. Dietz, James R. Dorminey, Robert Ducharme, John D. Eggers, Michael A. Einerson, Marcia Ford, Rodney E. Gravatt, James Green, Jerry D. Hasson, Melissa Hollander, Marilyn Keeton, Lisa Lalonde, Lionel Lancaster, Gerald Lerner, Amy P. Marsh, Frederick R. McCurtis, Susie J. McDonald, Henry Merritt, James Messelbeck, Robert L. Mobley, Willie B. Moore, Roger L. Morris, Mariangela Nobre, Eric Pinkston, Phillip Porpora, Derrick Pregler, Jeffrey A. Salter, Thomas J. Seeley, James C. Sims, Pamela Spangle, Jennifer L. Steele, Joyce Tassler, Nigel B. Taylor, Sandra Taylor, Sarah G. Teausaw, Robert J. Thode, Alvin Tripp, Charles A. Wieben. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byJohn D. Eggers. (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 22 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation Hearing set for 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si Court Appearances: Advanced notice is re quired of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than November 18, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 10:00 A M in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed bySanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 20 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Susan Illston granting (43) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:20-cv-03913-SI.Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-03913-SI, 3:20-cv-07266-LB, 3:20-cv-07267-WHA, 3:20-cv-07270-LB, 3:20-cv-07272-SK, 3:20-cv-07274-LB, 3:20-cv-07276-JCS, 3:20-cv-07277-SK, 3:20-cv-07280-SK, 3:20-cv-07291-EMC, 4:20-cv-07268-KAW, 4:20-cv-07271-YGR, 4:20-cv-07282-DMR, 4:20-cv-07283-KAW, 4:20-cv-07287-PJH(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by GlaxoSmithKline LLC identifying Corporate Parent Glaxosmithkline plc for GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Tam (Tam, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/27/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as DOE 2 identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH for Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as DOE 2; Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brian Shortnacy (Shortnacy, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Bodger Rydstrom for Defendant Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as Doe 4 (Rydstrom, Jessica) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6 re #1 Notice of Removal, #8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/30/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo (Podsiadlo, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tommy Huynh (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5 identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6 . (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG20073452. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15073715). Filed bySanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a s eparate docket entry Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20) re #1 . #3 Notice of Removal, filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6, Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eggers et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Pinkston
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew O. Bridgeman
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Messelbeck
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ducharme
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Tassler
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Steele
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lalonde
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Seeley
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Anoai
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Davenport
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Taylor
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah D. Cline
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Einerson
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie B. Moore
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl L. Conant
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Spangle
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Ban
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Dechard
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Porpora
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Colston
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Green
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Pregler
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hollander
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Mobley
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie J. Dietz
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Lancaster
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Dorminey
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nigel B. Taylor
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Wieben
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Lerner
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry D. Hasson
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danel L. Bass
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Salter
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonjua Bradley
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Tripp
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Altavilla
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freda J. Barrow
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Ford
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariangela Nobre
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Merritt
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney E. Gravatt
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick R. McCurtis
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Sims
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie J. McDonald
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Dahlquist
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy P. Marsh
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Thode
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Keeton
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah G. Teausaw
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Eggers
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger L. Morris
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Nicole Kathleen Holmes Maldonado
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vons Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grocery Outlet
Represented By: Monica Marie Browner
Represented By: John Clifton McCarron
Represented By: Michael L. Baum
Represented By: Sophia Castillo
Represented By: Ashley Boulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, incorrectly designated as DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente International
Represented By: Robert James Guite
Represented By: Adam Michael Foster
Represented By: Jennifer E. Pennington
Represented By: Moe Keshavarzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 6
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., incorrectly designated as DOE 5
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC, incorrectly designated as DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jonathan S. Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Podsiadlo
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Represented By: Michael Brian Shortnacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?