National Lifeline Association v. Batjer et al
Plaintiff: National Lifeline Association
Defendant: Liane M. Randolph, Martha Guzman Aceves, Clifford Rechtschaffen, Marybel Batjer and Genevieve Shiroma
Case Number: 3:2020cv08312
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. All discovery-related deadlines are vacated. Defendants shall file their answer on or before January 25, 2021. Plaintiff shall file its motion for summary judgment, not to exceed 35 pages, on or before February 1, 2021, defendants shall file their opposition, not to exceed 35 pages, on or before March 12, 2021, and plaintiff shall file its reply, not to exceed 20 pages, on or before April 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 18, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule filed by National Lifeline Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tahir L. Boykins, #2 Proposed Order)(Boykins, Tahir) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Lifeline Association.. (Boykins, Tahir) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by National Lifeline Association. Service waived by Marybel Batjer waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Boykins, Tahir) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by National Lifeline Association. Service waived by Martha Guzman Aceves waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Boykins, Tahir) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by National Lifeline Association. Service waived by Liane M. Randolph waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Boykins, Tahir) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by National Lifeline Association. Service waived by Genevieve Shiroma waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Boykins, Tahir) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by National Lifeline Association. Service waived by Clifford Rechtschaffen waiver sent on 11/25/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Boykins, Tahir) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/9/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Lifeline Association (Boykins, Tahir) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Lifeline Association (Boykins, Tahir) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martha Guzman Aceves, Marybel Batjer, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschaffen, Genevieve Shiroma ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15236543.). Filed byNational Lifeline Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-W to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boykins, Tahir) (Filed on 11/24/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Lifeline Association v. Batjer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liane M. Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Guzman Aceves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Rechtschaffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marybel Batjer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genevieve Shiroma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Lifeline Association
Represented By: Tahir Lynn Boykins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?