Judson et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Steven Walter Judson, Karen Seaman, Martha Gonzales, Nina Turpie, James Alexander, Jr., Chris Roy, Barbara Carol Pruett, Dennis Brown, Lucy Franco, Sheila Van Leer, Susan Tate, Ronald Piazza, Stephen Wahl, Timothy Hugh Kindle, Victor Koch, Larry Eugene Moore, Randy Sizelove, Sukhendra Singh, Chotsani Hilt, Thomas Jackson, Christopher Hall, Neal Fitzgerald Silliman, Paul Sanso, Julie Muncrief, Denver M. Stoner, Randy Decarl Williams, Diana Crandall, Daniel Ahern, Ronald Lopez, Adrian Sabatini, Robert Henry Ratinoff, Tamra Morrison, Herman Alfred Beaudry, Lashonda Coleman, Gerald Jamriska, Terry Ruth Sealey, Stephan Nicholson, Paulette Cogshell, Paul Delaney, William J. Brinegar, Marlene Talbot, Victoria Galeastrejo, Norman Black, Stephen Moss, Mark Jon Rogers, Kathleen Pratt, Phay Tac Lau, Richard Notarianni, James Crawford, Richard Magee, Dina Akers, Amanda Thomas, Peter Yannacone, Dustin Murphy, Deavian Grauel, Cristian Miguel Sanchez, Constance Harris, Sean Arnold, Patricia Niese, Leroy Hunter, Jose F. Martinez, Jean Annette Kulm, Theresa Tafoya, Anna Herrera, Ronnie Baker, Jr., Gilbert Rubio, Chika Hunter, Timothy Brian Feldhaus, Lotta Wiik-Lambert, William Golliher, Bridget Dolkas, Antoinette Leialoha Andrewsen, Michael Roks, Sr., Joseph Leach, Anthony Kenneth Herron and Ligia Avila
Defendant: Wilbur-Ellis Nutrition, LLC, Monsanto Company, Wilbur-Ellis Company, LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC, Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Walmart Inc., Ace Hardware Corporation, Orchard Supply Hardware, Lumber City Corporation, Outdoor Supply Inc., Orange County Farm Supply, Inc., Brooker Associates, Placerville Fruit Growers Incorporated, Gutierrez Penn Valley Enterprises, Inc., B.E. Enterprises Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Target Corporation, Marketplace Hardware, Inc., Kmart Corporation, Pioneer Home Center, Inc., Lowe's Companies, Inc., Dan's Feed & Seed, Inc., Denault's Hardware-Home Centers Inc. and Grangetto's Farm & Garden Supply Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv05290
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 33 Clerk's Letter of Remand; Certified copies of final order and docket mailed to San Francisco Superior Court. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 25, 2021 MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Court's order of August 25th civil case no. 21-cv-05290 VC is terminated. cc: JPMDL (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting Stipulated Remand: 13442 in case 3:16-md-02741-VC; (28) in case 3:21-cv-05290-VC. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dan's Feed & Seed, Inc. (Smith, Summer) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dan's Feed & Seed, Inc. (Smith, Summer) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byDan's Feed & Seed, Inc.. (Smith, Summer) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 6, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation To Remand Judson Lawsuit To State Court filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 4, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of specified defendant by William J. Brinegar, Paulette Cogshell, Timothy Hugh Kindle (Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
August 4, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of specified defendant by Michael Roks, Sr (Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
August 4, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of specified defendant by Lashonda Coleman, Martha Gonzales, Marlene Talbot, Susan Tate (Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re: Incorrectly Filed Motion. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/4/2021. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of specified defendant by Michael Roks, Sr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Costco Wholesale Corporation [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 20 Costco Wholesale Corporation ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] byCostco Wholesale Corporation. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Denault's Hardware-Home Centers Inc. [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Denault's Hardware-Home Centers Inc. [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 17 Denault Hardware-Home Centers, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] byDenault's Hardware-Home Centers Inc.. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lumber City Corporation [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lumber City Corporation [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 14 Lumber City Corp.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] byLumber City Corporation. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grangetto's Farm & Garden Supply Company [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Grangetto's Farm & Garden Supply Company (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 Grangetto's Farm & Garden Supply Company's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] byGrangetto's Farm & Garden Supply Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Companies, Inc. [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lowe's Companies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Lowe's Home Center, LLC for Lowe's Companies, Inc.. [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 Lowe's Companies, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) [Plaintiff Steven Judson, et al.] byLowe's Companies, Inc.. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of specified defendants by Martha Gonzales (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of specified defendants by Timothy Hugh Kindle (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 7/16/2021)
July 9, 2021 DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED: San Francisco Superior Court, CGC-21-591748, Judson et al v. Monsanto Compay et al, Opened in California Northern District as 21-cv-05290-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Judson Lawsuit from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-591748. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16160196). Filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Answer to Removal Complaint (See Removal {1} Exhibit 1) byAce Hardware Corporation, Home Depot Product Authority, LLC, Monsanto Company, Walmart Inc., Wilbur-Ellis Company, LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Nutrition, LLC. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judson et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur-Ellis Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Samuel Zachary Fayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur-Ellis Company, LLC
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Product Authority, LLC
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Hardware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orchard Supply Hardware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumber City Corporation
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outdoor Supply Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Farm Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooker Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placerville Fruit Growers Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gutierrez Penn Valley Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.E. Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marketplace Hardware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kmart Corporation
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Home Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan's Feed & Seed, Inc.
Represented By: Summer Michelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denault's Hardware-Home Centers Inc.
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grangetto's Farm & Garden Supply Company
Represented By: Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Walter Judson
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Seaman
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Gonzales
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Turpie
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Alexander, Jr.
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Roy
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Carol Pruett
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Brown
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Franco
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Van Leer
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Tate
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Piazza
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Wahl
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hugh Kindle
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Koch
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Eugene Moore
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Sizelove
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sukhendra Singh
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chotsani Hilt
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jackson
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hall
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Fitzgerald Silliman
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Sanso
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Muncrief
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver M. Stoner
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Decarl Williams
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Crandall
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ahern
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lopez
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Sabatini
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Henry Ratinoff
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamra Morrison
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Alfred Beaudry
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashonda Coleman
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Jamriska
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Ruth Sealey
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Nicholson
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Cogshell
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Delaney
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Brinegar
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Talbot
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Galeastrejo
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Black
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Moss
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Jon Rogers
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Pratt
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phay Tac Lau
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Notarianni
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Crawford
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Magee
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Akers
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Thomas
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Yannacone
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Murphy
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deavian Grauel
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Miguel Sanchez
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Harris
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Arnold
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Niese
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Hunter
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose F. Martinez
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Annette Kulm
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Tafoya
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Herrera
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Rubio
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chika Hunter
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Brian Feldhaus
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lotta Wiik-Lambert
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Golliher
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Dolkas
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Leialoha Andrewsen
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Roks, Sr.
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Represented By: Gregory David Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Leach
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Kenneth Herron
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ligia Avila
Represented By: Behram Viraf Parekh
Represented By: Gregory D Rueb
Represented By: Gregory D. Rueb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?