KANG v. PayPal Holdings, Inc et al
Plaintiff: HUEI-TING KANG
Defendant: PayPal Holdings, Inc, Daniel H. Schulman and John D. Rainey
Case Number: 3:2021cv06468
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER ORDER CONTINUING DATE UPON WHICH RESPONSIVE PLEADING IS DUE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #11 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DATE UPON WHICH RESPONSIVE PLEADING IS DUE filed by PayPal Holdings, Inc, John D. Rainey, Daniel H. Schulman. (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Neil Kramer for Defendants PayPal Holdings, Inc., Daniel H. Schulman, and John D. Rainey (Kramer, James) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander K. Talarides for Defendants PayPal Holdings, Inc., Daniel H. Schulman, and John D. Rainey (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by HUEI-TING KANG. Service waived by John D. Rainey waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by HUEI-TING KANG. Service waived by Daniel H. Schulman waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by HUEI-TING KANG. Service waived by PayPal Holdings, Inc waiver sent on 8/27/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PayPal Holdings, Inc, John D. Rainey, Daniel H. Schulman. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PayPal Holdings, Inc, John D. Rainey, Daniel H. Schulman ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16306816.). Filed byHUEI-TING KANG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/20/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KANG v. PayPal Holdings, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUEI-TING KANG
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H. Schulman
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Rainey
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?