Hendricks v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Jeffery Hendricks
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv03404
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byTarget Corporation. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Judge James Donato granting #7 Stipulation. At the joint request of the parties, plaintiff Hendricks' claim for punitive damages is dismissed without prejudice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 20, 2022 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Target Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Target Corporation for Target Corporation. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 6/20/2022)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/16/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2022)
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Target Corporation. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES filed by Target Corporation. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 06/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Target Corporation.. (Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/23/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee of $402 Paid ACANDC-17250162 from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is C22-00880. (). Filed byTarget Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Livingston, Renee) (Filed on 6/9/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Hendricks
Represented By: Bradley Richard Bowles
Represented By: Steven Hambrook Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Renee Welze Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?