In re: Uber Technologies, Inc., Passenger Sexual Assault Litigation
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LSA 340, Katherine Hylin, E. R., A. G., Taylor Gavin, Cynthia Crawford, A. M., A. H. M., H. B., Jane Doe LS 340, Aundreya Rollo, N. R., Jessica Freshwater, William Adorno, Kelly Cowsert, S. W., C. S., Jane Doe LS 251, Jane Doe LS 376, Jane Doe LS 117, Jane Doe LS 346, Jane Doe LS 383, Elunda Murphy, M. H., Jane Doe, Jane Doe LS 253, Jane Doe LS 177, Jane Doe LS 35, Beck Glaser, Jane Doe LS 107, Jane Doe LS 375, Jane Doe LS 364, V. R., Jane Doe LS 112, Jane Doe LS 163, Jane Doe LS 155, B. R., Jane Doe LS 293, R. M., Jane Doe LS 63, Jane Doe LS 218, D. P., E. E., Jane Doe LS 231, R. T., Jane Doe LS 90, Jane Doe F-1, N. F., E. D., Jane Doe LS 384, Jane Doe LS 336, Jane Doe LS 349, Jane Doe LS 76, Jane Doe LS 57, Jane Doe LS 264, Jane Doe LS 365, Jane Doe LS 259, Jane Doe LS 348, Jone Doe LS 238, Jane Doe LS 158, Jane Doe LS 388, Jane Doe LS 13, Jane Doe LS 37, Jane Doe LS 144, Jane Doe LS 154, Jane Doe LS 257, Jane Doe LS 237, Jane Doe LS 164, Jane Doe LS 249, Jane Doe LS 91, Jane Doe LS 159, Jane Doe LS 67, Jane Doe LS 134, Jane Doe LS 320, Jane Doe LS 260, Jane Doe LS 149, Jane Doe LS 203, Jane Doe LS 354, Ariane Cunningham, Jane Doe LS 74, Jane Doe LS 244, Jane Doe LS 174, Jane Doe LS 168, Jane Doe LS 353, Jane Doe LS 97, Jane Doe LS 284, Jane Doe LS 311, Jane Doe LS 266, Jane Doe LS 390, Jillian Sullivan, Katie Espinosa, K. O., E. C., J. B., H. D., Travon Brown, Jane Doe LS 98, Jane Doe LS 241, Jane Doe LS 66, Jane Doe LS 126, Jane Doe LS 317, Jane Doe LS 234, Jane Doe F-2, Joshua Cormier, Melanie Halstenberg, A. P., Jane Roe CL 1, Jane Roe CL 2, Jane Roe CL 3, C. T., M. R., S. D., C. L., Audriauna Fittro, Jane Doe LS 256, Jane Doe LS 326, Jane Doe LS 200, N. M., Jane Doe F-3, J. C., Heather Worzalla, Jane Doe LS 25, Jane Doe LS 103, Jane Doe LS 33, Marktez Govan, M. F. A., R. H., Marquita Harris, A. K., Jane Doe LS 377, Jane Doe LS 191, Jane Doe LS 302, John Doe LS 59, Jane Doe LS 322, M. C. H., Jane Doe LS 16, Jane Doe LS 75, Ashley Jones, Jane Doe LS 250, A. I., Mildred Hunter, T. V., S. A., W., E. M., L. E., T. R., Marcy Geraghty, C. W., L. M., J.R. M., M. S., K. F., Jane Doe EB 1, Jane Doe EB 2, F. W., S. E., Jane Doe LS 285, Kayanna Ayles, H. K., Brianna Craig, Jane Doe LS 387, O. W., Jane Doe LS 396, Jane Doe LS 273, Jane Doe LS 333, Jane Doe LS 185, J. S., N. W., Jane Roe CL 4, Jane Roe CL 5, Jane Roe CL 6, Jane Doe LS 381, Jane Doe LS 308, Keisha Grier, Jane Doe LS 56, Jane Doe LS 245, Cecilia Cazares, Steven Webb and M.H.
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Raiser, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Rasier, LLC and Rasier-CA, LLC
Petitioner: Bret Stanley
Case Number: 3:2023md03084
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Lisa J Cisneros
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #150 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Samantha Hoefs. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 150 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number 146185.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/1/2023 filed by M. F. A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hoefs, Samantha) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #145 Proposed Summons filed by Steven Webb.File proposed summons in member case. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 149 Letter from William A. Levin in Response to Rachel Abrams' November 27 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Levin, William) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Response to Rachel Abrams' November 27 Letter filed by Jane Doe LS 107, Jane Doe LS 168, Jane Doe LS 244, Jane Doe LS 253, Jane Doe LS 264, Jane Doe LS 266, Jane Doe LS 273, Jane Doe LS 311, Jane Doe LS 353, Jane Doe LS 377, Jane Doe LS 388, Jane Doe LS 396, Jane Doe LS 74, Jane Doe LS 103, Jane Doe LS 112, Jane Doe LS 117, Jane Doe LS 126, Jane Doe LS 13, Jane Doe LS 134, Jane Doe LS 144, Jane Doe LS 149, Jane Doe LS 154, Jane Doe LS 155, Jane Doe LS 158, Jane Doe LS 159, Jane Doe LS 16, Jane Doe LS 163, Jane Doe LS 164, Jane Doe LS 174, Jane Doe LS 177, Jane Doe LS 185, Jane Doe LS 191, Jane Doe LS 200, Jane Doe LS 203, Jane Doe LS 218, Jane Doe LS 231, Jane Doe LS 234, Jane Doe LS 237, Jone Doe LS 238, Jane Doe LS 241, Jane Doe LS 245, Jane Doe LS 249, Jane Doe LS 25, Jane Doe LS 250, Jane Doe LS 251, Jane Doe LS 256, Jane Doe LS 257, Jane Doe LS 259, Jane Doe LS 260, Jane Doe LS 264, Jane Doe LS 284, Jane Doe LS 285, Jane Doe LS 293, Jane Doe LS 302, Jane Doe LS 308, Jane Doe LS 317, Jane Doe LS 320, Jane Doe LS 322, Jane Doe LS 326, Jane Doe LS 33, Jane Doe LS 333, Jane Doe LS 336, Jane Doe LS 340, Jane Doe LS 346, Jane Doe LS 348, Jane Doe LS 349, Jane Doe LS 35, Jane Doe LS 354, Jane Doe LS 364, Jane Doe LS 365, Jane Doe LS 37, Jane Doe LS 375, Jane Doe LS 376, Jane Doe LS 381, Jane Doe LS 383, Jane Doe LS 384, Jane Doe LS 387, Jane Doe LS 390, Jane Doe LS 396, Jane Doe LS 56, Jane Doe LS 57, John Doe LS 59, Jane Doe LS 63, Jane Doe LS 66, Jane Doe LS 67, Jane Doe LS 74, Jane Doe LS 75, Jane Doe LS 76, Jane Doe LS 90, Jane Doe LS 91, Jane Doe LS 97, Jane Doe LS 98. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted version of Response to Rachel Abrams' November 27, 2023 Letter, #4 Exhibit)(Levin, William) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting motions for leave to proceed anonymously. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/30/2023. Associated Cases: See Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 146 Certificate of Interested Entities by Steven Webb identifying Corporate Parent UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Delaware Corporation, Other Affiliate Steven Webb for Steven Webb. re #144 Complaint (Luhana, Roopal) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 145 Proposed Summons. (Luhana, Roopal) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 144 ***FILING FEE APPLIED TO NEW CIVIL CASE FILED AS 3:23-CV-6191*** COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18884733.). Filed by Steven Webb. (Luhana, Roopal) (Filed on 11/30/2023) Modified on 12/1/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2023 Filing 143 Proposed Summons. (Luhana, Roopal) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 142 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cecilia Cazares identifying Corporate Parent uber, Other Affiliate Cecilia Cazares for Cecilia Cazares. re #141 Complaint (Luhana, Roopal) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 30, 2023 Filing 141 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18884608.). Filed by Cecilia Cazares. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Luhana, Roopal) (Filed on 11/30/2023)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #135 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 27, 2023 Filing 139 Letter from Rachel B. Abrams in Response to (#136) Letter from William A. Levin in Opposition to her Application for Co-Lead Counsel . (Abrams, Rachel) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 27, 2023 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Gastel (Gastel, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 27, 2023 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyson Steele Beridon (Beridon, Alyson) (Filed on 11/27/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 136 Letter from William A. Levin in Opposition to the Application for Co-Lead Counsel of Rachel Abrams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Levin, William) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 135 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Opposition to the Application for Co-Lead Counsel of Rachel Abrams filed by Jane Doe LS 107, Jane Doe LS 168, Jane Doe LS 244, Jane Doe LS 253, Jane Doe LS 264, Jane Doe LS 266, Jane Doe LS 273, Jane Doe LS 311, Jane Doe LS 353, Jane Doe LS 377, Jane Doe LS 388, Jane Doe LS 396, Jane Doe LS 74, Jane Doe LS 103, Jane Doe LS 112, Jane Doe LS 117, Jane Doe LS 126, Jane Doe LS 13, Jane Doe LS 134, Jane Doe LS 144, Jane Doe LS 149, Jane Doe LS 154, Jane Doe LS 155, Jane Doe LS 158, Jane Doe LS 159, Jane Doe LS 16, Jane Doe LS 163, Jane Doe LS 164, Jane Doe LS 174, Jane Doe LS 177, Jane Doe LS 185, Jane Doe LS 191, Jane Doe LS 200, Jane Doe LS 203, Jane Doe LS 218, Jane Doe LS 231, Jane Doe LS 234, Jane Doe LS 237, Jone Doe LS 238, Jane Doe LS 241, Jane Doe LS 249, Jane Doe LS 25, Jane Doe LS 250, Jane Doe LS 251, Jane Doe LS 256, Jane Doe LS 257, Jane Doe LS 259, Jane Doe LS 260, Jane Doe LS 264, Jane Doe LS 284, Jane Doe LS 285, Jane Doe LS 293, Jane Doe LS 302, Jane Doe LS 308, Jane Doe LS 317, Jane Doe LS 320, Jane Doe LS 322, Jane Doe LS 326, Jane Doe LS 33, Jane Doe LS 333, Jane Doe LS 336, Jane Doe LS 340, Jane Doe LS 346, Jane Doe LS 348, Jane Doe LS 349, Jane Doe LS 35, Jane Doe LS 354, Jane Doe LS 364, Jane Doe LS 365, Jane Doe LS 37, Jane Doe LS 375, Jane Doe LS 376, Jane Doe LS 381, Jane Doe LS 383, Jane Doe LS 384, Jane Doe LS 387, Jane Doe LS 390, Jane Doe LS 396, Jane Doe LS 57, John Doe LS 59, Jane Doe LS 63, Jane Doe LS 66, Jane Doe LS 67, Jane Doe LS 74, Jane Doe LS 75, Jane Doe LS 76, Jane Doe LS 90, Jane Doe LS 91, Jane Doe LS 97, Jane Doe LS 98. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted version of Opposition to the Application for Co-Lead Counsel of Rachel Abrams, #4 Unredacted version of Exhibit A to Opposition to the Application for Co-Lead Counsel of Rachel Abrams, #5 Unredacted version of Exhibit B to Opposition to the Application for Co-Lead Counsel of Rachel Abrams)(Levin, William) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 134 Letter from John Eddie Williams Jr. Responding to Applications for Leadership and PSC. (Williams, John) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 133 Letter from Stephen J. Estey . (Estey, Stephen) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Filing 132 Letter from proposed Plaintiffs Leadership Group and all other Plaintiffs Counsel (non-JCCP) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Abrams, Rachel) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting motions for leave to proceed anonymously. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/22/2023. Associated Cases: See Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #129 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Jo Anna Pollock. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 129 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18856921.) filed by O. W.. (Pollock, Jo Anna) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #103 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Hailey E. Watts. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #126 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Alexandra M. Walsh. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2023)
November 20, 2023 Filing 126 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18852216.) filed by H. B.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Walsh, Alexandra) (Filed on 11/20/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 125 Letter from Andrea S Hirsch re Leadership Application to PSC. (Hirsch, Andrea) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 124 Letter from Karen Barth Menzies re Leadership Application . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Menzies, Karen) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 123 Letter from Erin Copeland RE Leadership Application . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Copeland, Erin) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 122 Letter from Bret Stanley Re Leadership Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stanley, Bret) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 121 Letter from William A. Levin Re Leadership Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Levin, William) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 120 Letter from Khaldoun A. Baghdadi re Leadership Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baghdadi, Khaldoun) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 119 Letter from Sara M. Peters . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Leadership Group, #2 Exhibit B - CV)(Peters, Sara) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 118 Letter from Michael W. Carney Re: Leadership Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carney, Michael) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 117 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Randall Scott Luskey (Luskey, Randall) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 116 Letter from John Eddie Williams, Jr. PSC Leadership Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, John) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 115 Letter from Stephen J. Estey Re: Leadership Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Estey, Stephen) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 114 Letter from Layne C. Hilton re: Leadership Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hilton, Layne) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #96 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Sommer D. Luther. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 112 Letter from Celine Cutter Re: Leadership Application. (Cutter, Celine) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #93 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Andrea S Hirsch. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #92 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Erin K. Copeland. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #91 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Ellyn H. Hurd. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #89 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Marlene Goldenberg. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 107 Letter from Alexandra M. Walsh Re: Leadership Application. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Channick, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 106 Letter from Rachel Abrams to the Honorable Judge Charles R. Breyer in Support of her Application for a Position on Plaintiffs' Steering Committee . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rachel Abrams Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Judicial Contact Information, #3 Exhibit C - List of MDL Cases, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Plaintiffs Leadership Group)(Abrams, Rachel) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 105 Letter from Tracey Cowan Re: Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 104 Letter from Sommer D. Luther Re: Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Application . (Luther, Sommer) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 103 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18849591.) filed by L. M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Watts, Hailey) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 102 Letter from Ellyn Hurd Re: Leadership Application. (Hurd, Ellyn) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 101 Letter from Roopal P. Luhana, Application for Plaintiffs' Co-Lead . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Luhana, Roopal) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 100 Letter from Meredith D. Stratigopoulos Re: Leadership Application . (Stratigopoulos, Meredith) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 99 Letter from Sarah R. London Re: Leadership Application. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 98 Letter from Alyson Beridon to the Honorable Judge Charles R. Breyer in Support of her Application for a Position on Plaintiffs' Steering Committee . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Plaintiffs Leadership Group, #2 Exhibit B - Alyson Beridon Resume)(Abrams, Rachel) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 Filing 97 Letter from Marlene J. Goldenberg Re: Leadership Application . (Goldenberg, Marlene) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 17, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #95 Complaint filed by H. B. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, a member case complaint shall not be filed on the main MDL docket. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 96 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number CCANDC-18846062.) filed by E. D.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Luther, Sommer) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 95 COMPLAINT against Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Filed by H. B.. (Channick, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Aimee H. Wagstaff (Wagstaff, Aimee) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 93 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18843774.) filed by A. M.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Hirsch, Andrea) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 92 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice 3:23-md-03084-CRB ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18843578.) filed by L.M.. (Attachments: #1 TX State Bar - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 TX Southern District - Certificate of Good Standing)(Copeland, Erin) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 91 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18843002.) filed by M.S.. (Hurd, Ellyn) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #85 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Layne C. Hilton. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 16, 2023 Filing 89 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18842379.) filed by M. F. A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldenberg, Marlene) (Filed on 11/16/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 88 RESPONSE re #61 Status Report, #2 Order, #56 Notice (Other), #63 Statement (Joint Response to Submissions Concerning Appointment of a Special Settlement Master) by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Luskey, Randall) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Chloe R. Shrode. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Meredith D. Stratigopoulos. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 15, 2023 Filing 85 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18839003.) filed by V.R.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hilton, Layne) (Filed on 11/15/2023)
November 14, 2023 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re:3084 Uber Technologies Inc et al, Opened in California Northern District as 23-cv-05867-CRB F. v. Uber Technologies Inc et al cc: JPMDL (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 84 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) by MDL Panel on 11/14/2023. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 14, 2023 Filing 83 Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier, LLC, and Rasier-CA, LLC's Petition for a Writ of Mandamus to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. USCA Case Number 23-3445 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
November 10, 2023 Filing 82 NOTICE by Jane Doe F-1 Withdrawal of Counsel (Salicrup, Alejandro) (Filed on 11/10/2023)
November 10, 2023 Filing 81 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18826721.) filed by L. M.. (Attachments: #1 Texas Bar Cert.)(Shrode, Chloe) (Filed on 11/10/2023)
November 10, 2023 Filing 80 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18826395.) filed by L. M.. (Attachments: #1 Texas Bar Cert.)(Stratigopoulos, Meredith) (Filed on 11/10/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Zarrina Ozari (Ozari, Zarrina) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Clarkson (Clarkson, Ryan) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 9, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Barth Menzies (Menzies, Karen) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 76 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 3, 2023, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #67 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2024. (Related documents(s) #67 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Benjamin T. Carroll. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Kristen A. Barnes. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18812883.) filed by Jane Doe. (Carroll, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 7, 2023 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18812750.) filed by Jane Doe. (Barnes, Kristen) (Filed on 11/7/2023)
November 6, 2023 Filing 71 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) by MDL Panel on 11/06/2023. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3: APPLICATIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/6/2023. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/03/2023 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Jane Doe LS 107, Jane Doe LS 168, Jane Doe LS 244, Jane Doe LS 253, Jane Doe LS 264, Jane Doe LS 266, Jane Doe LS 311, Jane Doe LS 353, Jane Doe LS 377, Jane Doe LS 388, Jane Doe LS 74, Jane Doe LS 103, Jane Doe LS 112, Jane Doe LS 117, Jane Doe LS 126, Jane Doe LS 13, Jane Doe LS 134, Jane Doe LS 144, Jane Doe LS 149, Jane Doe LS 154, Jane Doe LS 155, Jane Doe LS 158, Jane Doe LS 159, Jane Doe LS 16, Jane Doe LS 163, Jane Doe LS 164, Jane Doe LS 174, Jane Doe LS 177, Jane Doe LS 191, Jane Doe LS 200, Jane Doe LS 203, Jane Doe LS 218, Jane Doe LS 231, Jane Doe LS 234, Jane Doe LS 237, Jone Doe LS 238, Jane Doe LS 241, Jane Doe LS 249, Jane Doe LS 25, Jane Doe LS 250, Jane Doe LS 251, Jane Doe LS 256, Jane Doe LS 257, Jane Doe LS 259, Jane Doe LS 260, Jane Doe LS 264, Jane Doe LS 284, Jane Doe LS 293, Jane Doe LS 302, Jane Doe LS 317, Jane Doe LS 320, Jane Doe LS 322, Jane Doe LS 326, Jane Doe LS 33, Jane Doe LS 336, Jane Doe LS 340, Jane Doe LS 346, Jane Doe LS 348, Jane Doe LS 349, Jane Doe LS 35, Jane Doe LS 354, Jane Doe LS 364, Jane Doe LS 365, Jane Doe LS 37, Jane Doe LS 375, Jane Doe LS 376, Jane Doe LS 383, Jane Doe LS 384, Jane Doe LS 390, Jane Doe LS 57, John Doe LS 59, Jane Doe LS 63, Jane Doe LS 66, Jane Doe LS 67, Jane Doe LS 74, Jane Doe LS 75, Jane Doe LS 76, Jane Doe LS 90, Jane Doe LS 91, Jane Doe LS 97, Jane Doe LS 98, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Levin, William) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 3, 2023 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Luskey, Randall) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/03/2023 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by M. F. A., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/3/2023. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2: PRELIMINARY ORDER ON THE PRESERVATION OF INFORMATION THAT MAY BE RELEVANT TO THIS LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/3/2023. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Status Conference held on 11/3/2023. Applications for Steering Committee deadline advanced to November 17, 2023; Any comments/objections to the applications due by November 22, 2023. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros for discovery. The Court will issue an Order. (Total Time in Court: 1 Hour and 6 Minutes) Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiff Attorney: Rachel Abrams, John Eddie Williams, Brian Abramson, C. Brooks Cutter, Celine Cutter, William A. Levin, David M. Grimes, Roopal P. Luhana, Sarah Landen. Defendant Attorney: Robert Atkins, Randy Luskey, Andrea Keller and Kyle Smith. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 Filing 63 Statement Re Appointment of Special Settlement Master by Jane Roe CL 1. (Cutter, Celine) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 3, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros for Discovery (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2023)
November 2, 2023 Filing 62 Statement re #2 Order Defendants Submission Concerning Appointment of a Special Settlement Master (Pursuant to Pretrial Order No. 1) by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Luskey, Randall) (Filed on 11/2/2023)
November 2, 2023 Filing 61 STATUS REPORT (SUPPLEMENTAL) by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order After October 30, 2023 CMC, #2 Exhibit B - JCCP Scheduling Order, #3 Exhibit C - Order re: October 18, 2023 CM Stmt)(Luskey, Randall) (Filed on 11/2/2023)
November 2, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Beth Abrams (Abrams, Rachel) (Filed on 11/2/2023)
November 1, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Zarrina Ozari (Ozari, Zarrina) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/1/2023. Associated cases: 23-md-03084, 23-cv-04313. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
November 1, 2023 Filing 57 RESPONSE re #38 Status Report,, by M. F. A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(London, Sarah) (Filed on 11/1/2023)
October 31, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE by M. F. A. re #2 Order / PLAINTIFFS' RECOMMENDATIONS FOR SETTLEMENT MASTER PURSUANT TO PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 (London, Sarah) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Bartlet A. Brebner. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Margret Lecocke. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Brian Abramson. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Andrea M. Keller. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Caitlin E. Grusauskas. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Kyle N. Smith. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Robert Atkins. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18791065.) filed by William Adorno. (Brebner, Bartlet) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Batami Elaine Baskin for Jane Does F-1, F-2, F-3 (Baskin, Batami) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Margret Lecocke ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18790944.) filed by Jane Doe F-1, Jane Doe F-2, Jane Doe F-3. (Lecocke, Margret) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 31, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brian Abramson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18790587.) filed by Jane Doe F-1, Jane Doe F-2, Jane Doe F-3. (Abramson, Brian) (Filed on 10/31/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 48 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-cv-4313. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/30/2023. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 43 STATUS REPORT Response by Plaintiffs to Uber's Status Report by Jane Roe CL 1. (Cutter, Celine) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/30/2023. Associated cases: 23-md-03084-CRB, 23-cv-04740-VC, 23-cv-05524-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 30, 2023 Filing 41 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-cv-5524. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 30, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
October 28, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Samira Bokaie on behalf of LS Plaintiffs (Bokaie, Samira) (Filed on 10/28/2023)
October 28, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Levin on behalf of LS Plaintiffs (Levin, William) (Filed on 10/28/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT re 002 Pretrial Order No. 1 Initial Conference Submission by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Status Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Order on Uber's Demurrer, #3 Exhibit C - Order on Uber's Motion to Strike, #4 Exhibit D - Order on Application to All Cases, #5 Exhibit E - Stipulation and Order re: Case Management, #6 Exhibit F - Stipulation and Order re FNC Discovery, #7 Exhibit G - Stipulation and Order (Lyft JCCP))(Luskey, Randall) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18784709.) filed by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Keller, Andrea) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18784692.) filed by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Grusauskas, Caitlin) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18784657.) filed by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Smith, Kyle) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18784607.) filed by Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Atkins, Robert) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 27, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Scott Luskey for Defendants Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc. (Luskey, Randall) (Filed on 10/27/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by John Eddie Williams, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe F-1, F-2, and F-3 (Williams, John) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 26, 2023 Filing 31 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-cv-4740. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 26, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2023)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Andrew Kaufman. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2023)
October 24, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18769564.) filed by M. F. A.. (Kaufman, Andrew) (Filed on 10/24/2023)
October 24, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Robin London (London, Sarah) (Filed on 10/24/2023)
October 24, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin M. Nelson (Nelson, Caitlin) (Filed on 10/24/2023)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/23/2023. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 23, 2023 Filing 25 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-cv-04723-JD; 23-cv-03951-JD. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/23/2023. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 23, 2023 Filing 24 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-cv-4175, 23-cv-4299, 23-cv-4306, 23-cv-4617, 23-cv-4643, 23-cv-4731, 23-cv-4939. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on October 23, 2023. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 23, 2023 Filing 23 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 4:23-cv-4940-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 23, 2023. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/23/2023. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding returned summons. Summons are to be filed as Summons Returned Executed in their member case, not on the main MDL docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 20 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 23-cv-4308 AMO, 23-cv-4705 AMO, 23-cv-4745 AMO, and 23-cv-3949 AMO. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 10/20/2023. (ads, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 20, 2023 Filing 19 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Re 4:23-cv-04772-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/20/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 18 Summons Returned Executed by Ariane Cunningham. Raiser LLC served on 9/5/2023, answer due 9/26/2023.(Luhana, Roopal) (Filed on 10/20/2023) Modified on 10/20/2023 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2023 Filing 17 Summons Returned Executed by Ariane Cunningham. Uber Technologies served on 9/5/2023, answer due 9/26/2023. (Luhana, Roopal) (Filed on 10/20/2023) Modified on 10/20/2023 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REFERRAL ORDER FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/20/2023. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REFERRAL ORDER FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/20/2023. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REFERRAL ORDER FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/20/2023. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/20/2023. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Roopal P. Luhana. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) by MDL Panel on 10/20/2023. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 20, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Re: #17 Affidavit of Service filed by Ariane Cunningham, #18 Affidavit of Service filed by Ariane Cunningham Correct ECF event is Summons Returned Executed.Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 19, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18753466.) filed by Ariane Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Luhana, Roopal) (Filed on 10/19/2023)
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/18/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/16/2023. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/16/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2023)
October 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Pro Hac Vice Admission. Any attorney who is not a member of the bar of this Court must submit an application to appear pro hac vice and a certificate of good standing, as required under Civil Local Rule 11-3(a), and must pay the admission fee, as required under Civil Local Rule 11-3(e). Parties are not required to obtain local counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2023) Modified on 10/13/2023 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2023 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by MDL Panel on 10/13/2023. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 4 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Re 23-cv-3945-HSG; 23-cv-3956-HSG; 23-cv-4301-HSG; 23-cv-4367-HSG; and 23-cv-4744-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/12/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/12/2023. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 10, 2023 Set/Reset Hearing - Re #2 Order. Status Conference set for 11/3/2023 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor or by video conference before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 31, 2023 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 11/3/2023 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/6/2023. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 4, 2023 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel on 10/04/2023. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Transferee Court)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Uber Technologies, Inc., Passenger Sexual Assault Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LSA 340
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Hylin
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. R.
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. G.
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Gavin
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Crawford
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Represented By: Andrea Solomon Hirsch
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Zarrina Ozari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. H. M.
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. B.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Represented By: Alexandra M. Walsh
Represented By: Kimberly Jane Channick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 340
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aundreya Rollo
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. R.
Represented By: Andrew Ready Tate
Represented By: Grace Arden Hancock
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Freshwater
Represented By: C. Andrew Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Adorno
Represented By: Bartlet Brebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Cowsert
Represented By: Carl Kessinger
Represented By: Eric D. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. W.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Represented By: Samantha Katen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: Brian John Perkins
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 251
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 376
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 117
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 346
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 383
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elunda Murphy
Represented By: Brian John Perkins
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. H.
Represented By: Michael Lee Nimmo
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Zarrina Ozari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Benjamin T. Carroll
Represented By: Kristen Ann Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 253
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 177
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 35
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beck Glaser
Represented By: Michael Lee Nimmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 107
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 375
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 364
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. R.
Represented By: Layne Hilton
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 112
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 163
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 155
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. R.
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 293
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. M.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 63
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 218
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. P.
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. E.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 231
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. T.
Represented By: Michael Wayne Carney
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 90
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe F-1
Represented By: John Eddie Williams, Jr
Represented By: Alejandro J. Salicrup
Represented By: Batami Elaine Baskin
Represented By: Brian Alan Abramson
Represented By: Kristen K. Barton
Represented By: Margret Lecocke
Represented By: Walter E. Cubberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. F.
Represented By: Kimberly A Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. D.
Represented By: Kimberly A Dougherty
Represented By: Aimee H. Wagstaff
Represented By: Sommer Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 384
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 336
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 349
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 76
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 57
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 264
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 365
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 259
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 348
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jone Doe LS 238
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 158
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 388
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 13
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 37
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 144
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 154
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 257
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 237
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 164
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 249
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 91
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 159
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 67
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 134
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 320
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 260
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 149
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 203
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 354
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariane Cunningham
Represented By: Roopal Premchand Luhana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 74
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 244
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 174
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 168
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 353
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 97
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 284
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 311
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 266
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 390
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Sullivan
Represented By: Brian John Perkins
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Espinosa
Represented By: Eric Hawley
Represented By: Steven J Kherkher
Represented By: Bret D. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. O.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. C.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Michael Wayne Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Michael Wayne Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. D.
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travon Brown
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 98
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 241
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 66
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 126
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 317
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 234
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe F-2
Represented By: John Eddie Williams, Jr
Represented By: Walter E. Cubberly
Represented By: Batami Elaine Baskin
Represented By: Brian Alan Abramson
Represented By: Margret Lecocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Cormier
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Halstenberg
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. P.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Roe CL 1
Represented By: Celine Emily Cutter
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Roe CL 2
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Celine Emily Cutter
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Roe CL 3
Represented By: Celine Emily Cutter
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Represented By: Jennifer Sylvia Domer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. T.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Michael Wayne Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. R.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. D.
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. L.
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Zarrina Ozari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audriauna Fittro
Represented By: Khaldoun A. Baghdadi
Represented By: Sara M. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 256
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 326
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 200
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. M.
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Zarrina Ozari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe F-3
Represented By: Walter E. Cubberly
Represented By: Batami Elaine Baskin
Represented By: Brian Alan Abramson
Represented By: Margret Lecocke
Represented By: John Eddie Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. C.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Worzalla
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 25
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 103
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 33
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marktez Govan
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. F. A.
Represented By: Sarah Robin London
Represented By: Andrew Kaufman
Represented By: Caitlin M. Nelson
Represented By: Marlene Jaye Goldenberg
Represented By: Samantha Hoefs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. H.
Represented By: Adam B. Wolf
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquita Harris
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. K.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 377
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 191
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 302
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe LS 59
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 322
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. C. H.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 16
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 75
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Jones
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 250
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. I.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Michael Wayne Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mildred Hunter
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. V.
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Zarrina Ozari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. A.
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Zarrina Ozari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. M.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Michael Wayne Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. E.
Represented By: Tracey B. Cowan
Represented By: Ryan J. Clarkson
Represented By: Zarrina Ozari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. R.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcy Geraghty
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. W.
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. M.
Represented By: Chloe Shrode
Represented By: Meredith Drukker Stratigopoulos
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Erin K. Copeland
Represented By: Hailey Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R. M.
Represented By: Adam B. Wolf
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. S.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Sarah Robin London
Represented By: Ellyn Hurd
Represented By: Michael Wayne Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. F.
Represented By: Michael Wayne Carney
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe EB 1
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Stephen John Estey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe EB 2
Represented By: Angela J. Nehmens
Represented By: Stephen John Estey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. W.
Represented By: Alyson Steele Beridon
Represented By: Benjamin Gastel
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. E.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 285
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayanna Ayles
Represented By: Richard Samuel Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. K.
Represented By: Adam Brett Wolf
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Craig
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 387
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. W.
Represented By: Ellyn Hurd
Represented By: Jo Anna Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 396
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 273
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 333
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 185
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. S.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Represented By: Michael Wayne Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. W.
Represented By: Lauren Aliz Welling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Roe CL 4
Represented By: Celine Emily Cutter
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Roe CL 5
Represented By: Celine Emily Cutter
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Roe CL 6
Represented By: Celine Emily Cutter
Represented By: Curtis Brooks Cutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 381
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 308
Represented By: William A. Levin
Represented By: David M. Grimes
Represented By: Laurel Lisa Simes
Represented By: Samira Bokaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Grier
Represented By: Rachel Beth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 56
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe LS 245
Represented By: William A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Cazares
Represented By: Roopal Premchand Luhana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Webb
Represented By: Roopal Premchand Luhana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.H.
Represented By: Sarah R. London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Augusto Alarcon
Represented By: Samuel Quinn Schleier
Represented By: Colton Parks
Represented By: Randall Scott Luskey
Represented By: Caitlin Grusauskas
Represented By: Dominyka Plukaite
Represented By: Christopher G. Betke
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Marc-Daniel Paul
Represented By: Robert A Atkins
Represented By: Alexis Nicole Tinucci
Represented By: Andrea Keller
Represented By: Clayton J. Callen
Represented By: George Mario Velcich
Represented By: Jennifer Rebholz
Represented By: Kirk Andrew Carter
Represented By: Kyle N. Smith
Represented By: Luke Charles Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser, LLC
Represented By: Colton Parks
Represented By: Paul Augusto Alarcon
Represented By: Samuel Quinn Schleier
Represented By: Randall Scott Luskey
Represented By: Caitlin Grusauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser-CA, LLC
Represented By: Randall Scott Luskey
Represented By: Colton Parks
Represented By: Paul Augusto Alarcon
Represented By: Samuel Quinn Schleier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Represented By: Randall Scott Luskey
Represented By: Robert A Atkins
Represented By: Alexis Nicole Tinucci
Represented By: Andrea Keller
Represented By: Caitlin Grusauskas
Represented By: Clayton J. Callen
Represented By: Colton Parks
Represented By: David F. Norden
Represented By: Dominyka Plukaite
Represented By: George Mario Velcich
Represented By: Jennifer Rebholz
Represented By: Kirk Andrew Carter
Represented By: Kyle N. Smith
Represented By: Luke Charles Spencer
Represented By: Paul Augusto Alarcon
Represented By: Samuel Quinn Schleier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier-CA, LLC
Represented By: Randall Scott Luskey
Represented By: Robert A Atkins
Represented By: Andrea Keller
Represented By: Caitlin Grusauskas
Represented By: Clayton J. Callen
Represented By: Colton Parks
Represented By: Kyle N. Smith
Represented By: Paul Augusto Alarcon
Represented By: Samuel Quinn Schleier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bret Stanley
Represented By: Bret D. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?