Todd v. Lamarque et al

Plaintiff: Michael Andre Todd
Defendant: A.A. Lamarque, R. C. Garcia, F.O. Chavez, P. Lord and M.O. Haffner
3rd_party_defendant: California Dept. of Corrections & Rehab. and Office of the Inspector General
Case Number: 4:2003cv03995
Filed: September 2, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2009 458 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
December 11, 2008 452 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Good cause exists for the withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Sanctions. No further controversy remains in this action. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/08/08. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
October 22, 2008 451 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 449 Letter filed by Michael Andre Todd. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/21/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
February 8, 2008 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 216 Writ Issued. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/8/08. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Lamarque et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Andre Todd
Represented By: Winslow Taub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.A. Lamarque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. C. Garcia
Represented By: Neah Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.O. Chavez
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Lord
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.O. Haffner
Represented By: Virginia Irene Papan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: California Dept. of Corrections & Rehab.
Represented By: Peter Jon Hirsig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Office of the Inspector General
Represented By: Barbara L Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?