Kirola et al v. City & County of San Francisco, The et al
Plaintiff: Ivana Kirola, Michael Kwok and Elizabeth Elftman
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco, Gavin Newsom, Aaron Peskin, Jake McGoldrick, Michela Alioto-Pier, Ed Jew, Chris Daly, Sean Elsbernd, Bevan Dufty, Tom Ammiano, Sophie Maxwell, Ross Mirkarimi and Gerardo Sandoval
Case Number: 4:2007cv03685
Filed: July 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg for Judge Saundra B. Armstrong Granting 789 Motion for Taxation of Costs. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 687 JUDGMENT ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/26/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 681 PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER by Judge Armstrong Denying 667 Stipulated Request for Further Modification of Briefing Schedule on Defendant City and County of San Francisco's Post-Judgment Trial Motion for Judgment (sbalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 664 Stipulation Requesting Modification of Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion for Judgment or Class Decertification. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER RE FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Set Deadlines: Motions due by 5/19/2014; Responses due by 6/6/2014; Replies due by 6/13/2014. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/29/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 660 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER AND TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT RE FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Joint Statement due by 4/11/2014. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/20/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/24/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG finding as moot 385 Motion ; finding as moot 392 Motion ; finding as moot 395 Motion to Shorten Time (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER re 608 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Elizabeth Elftman, Ivana Kirola, 604 Trial Brief filed by Elizabeth Elftman, Ivana Kirola. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/19/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER re 605 MOTION for Leave to Permit Filing of Motion to Strike Defendants' Reply Brief Supporting Request for Judicial Notice filed by Elizabeth Elftman, Ivana Kirola. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/13/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 597 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 593 Stipulation,, filed by City & County of San Francisco, The, Aaron Peskin, Bevan Dufty, Ross Mirkarimi, Gerardo Sandoval, Ivana Kirola, Gavin Newsom, Ed Jew, Michela Alioto-Pier, Jake McGoldrick, Sean Elsbernd, Sophie Maxwell, Elizabeth Elftman, Tom Ammiano, Chris Daly. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/25/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER Granting 527 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions (Joint Letter of March 29, 2011). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER re 583 Request for Judicial Notice,, filed by City & County of San Francisco, The, Aaron Peskin, Bevan Dufty, Ross Mirkarimi, Gerardo Sandoval, Gavin Newsom, Ed Jew, Michela Alioto-Pier, Jake McGoldrick, Sean Elsbernd, Sophie Maxwell, Tom Ammiano, Chris Daly. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/10/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER RE POST-TRIAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/5/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 544 Motion ; denying 548 Motion ; denying 549 Motion to Strike (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 543 Motion for leave to file (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER re 541 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/4/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 523 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER SETTING FURTHER BRIEFING re 506 MOTION for Modification of the Class Definition to Exclude Howard Chabner as a Class Member filed by City & County of San Francisco, The, Aaron Peskin, Bevan Dufty, Ross Mirkarimi, Gerardo Sandoval, Gavin Newsom, Ed Jew, Michela Alioto-Pier, Sean Elsbernd, Jake McGoldrick, Joanna Fraguli, Sophie Maxwell, Tom Ammiano, Chris Daly. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/31/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER 508 -1 Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition of Joanna Fraguli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/30/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 522 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 508 Motion for Relief to Permit the Filing of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Deposition of Joanna Fraguli. Defendants' Opposition shall be due on or before 03/28/11; Any Replies shall be due 03/29/11. Matter referred to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen, the assigned Discovery Magistrate Judge in this matter. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 03/25/11. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER re 495 MOTION Administrative Relief Pursuant to Civil L.R.7-11 to Permit the Filing of Motion for A Modification of Class Definition filed by Joanna Fraguli. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER Re Letters of March 4, 2011 496 497 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/4/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 494 AMENDED ORDER re 493 Order, 483 Letter Brief, filed by Elizabeth Elftman, Ivana Kirola, 488 Letter, filed by Ivana Kirola (order dated 3/2/11). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/2/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER re 488 Plaintiff's Letter, filed by Ivana Kirola. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/1/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER re 467 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for: (1) Clarification of Scope of Discovery Authorized Under the Court's January 31, 2011 Order; and (2) to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Joanna Fraguli MOTION for Leave to File Motion for: (1) Clarification of Scope of Discovery Authorized Under the Court's January 31, 2011 Order; and (2) to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Joanna Fraguli filed by City & County of San Francisco, The. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/23/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER, Motions terminated: 467 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for: (1) Clarification of Scope of Discovery Authorized Under the Court's January 31, 2011 Order; and (2) to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Joanna Fraguli MOTION for Leave to Fil e Motion for: (1) Clarification of Scope of Discovery Authorized Under the Court's January 31, 2011 Order; and (2) to Quash Subpoena for Deposition of Joanna Fraguli filed by City & County of San Francisco, The, 473 MOTION for Leave to File CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION SUPPORTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR: (1) CLARIFICATION OF SCOPE OF DISCOVERY AUTHORIZED UNDER THE COURT'S JANUARY 31, 2011 ORDER MOTION for Leave to File CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION SUPPORTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR: (1) CLARIFICATION OF SCOPE OF DISCOVERY AUTHORIZED UNDER THE COURT'S JANUARY 31, 2011 ORDER MOTION for Leave to Fil e CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION SUPPORTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR: (1) CLARIFICATION OF SCOPE OF DISCOVERY AUTHORIZED UNDER THE COURT'S JANUARY 31, 2011 ORDER filed by City & Count y of San Francisco, The, Aaron Peskin, Bevan Dufty, Ross Mirkarimi, Gerardo Sandoval, Gavin Newsom, Ed Jew, Michela Alioto-Pier, Sean Elsbernd, Jake McGoldrick, Joanna Fraguli, Sophie Maxwell, Tom Ammiano, Chris Daly.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/18/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denied as moot 432 Motion to Stay; granting 451 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 455 Motion ; denying 455 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 428 Motion to Strike (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 414 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 353 Motion to Authorize Communications with Class Members. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/2/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER by Judge Armstrong granting in part and denying in part 359 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 361 Motion in Limine (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 376 Motion FOR PERMISSION TO BRING EQUIPMENT FOR TRIAL (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/22/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER FOLLOWING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 19, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG striking 317 Motion to Dismiss; denying 320 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 310 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 187 Motion to Certify Class (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 175 Motion to Bifurcate (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER: That parties shall meet and confer by no later than 05/27/10. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/25/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010) Modified on 5/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 258 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 255 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Plaintiffs produce revised privilege log in compliance with Rule 26 by 04/21/10; Joint Letter Brief due by 04/28/10, re 252 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen, on 4/19/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010) Modified on 4/20/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER re 231 Joint Letter of April 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/12/2010. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 230 Stipulation to Addendum to 1/29/10 order,, filed by City & County of San Francisco, The, Ross Mirkarimi, Ivana Kirola, Craig Yates, Michela Alioto-Pier, Jake McGoldrick, Sophie Maxwell, Tom Ammiano, Aaron Peskin, Bevan Dufty, Gerardo Sandoval, Gavin Newsom, Ed Jew, Sean Elsbernd, Michael Kwok, Elizabeth Elftman, Chris Daly. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER Re 223 Joint Letter of March 31, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/2/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 216 Stipulation,, filed by City & County of San Francisco, The, Ross Mirkarimi, Ivana Kirola, Craig Yates, Michela Alioto-Pier, Jake McGoldrick, Sophie Maxwell, Tom Ammiano, Aaron Peskin, Bevan Dufty, Gerardo Sandoval, Gavin Newsom, Ed Jew, Sean Elsbernd, Michael Kwok, Elizabeth Elftman, Chris Daly. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/29/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER RE 203 Joint Letter of March 8, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/9/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen re 128 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Re Joint Letter of March 3, 2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 100 Motion for Relief Modifying the Discovery Cut-off and Expert Rebuttal Disclosure Dates. All discovery shall be completed by 03/31/2010. Rebuttal expert disclosures due 02/26/2010. Expert discovery shall be completed by 03/26/2010. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010) Modified on 2/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/17/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010) Modified on 2/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 75 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010) Modified on 2/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER DENYING re 68 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/30/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009) Modified on 12/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 5/24/2010 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/11/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirola et al v. City & County of San Francisco, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivana Kirola
Represented By: Guy Burton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kwok
Represented By: Guy Burton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Elftman
Represented By: Guy Burton Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Peskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake McGoldrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michela Alioto-Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Jew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Elsbernd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bevan Dufty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Ammiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophie Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Mirkarimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?