Safeway Inc. et al v. Abbott Laboratories
Plaintiff: Safeway Inc., Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., New Alberton's, Inc. and American Sales Company, Inc.
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Case Number: 4:2007cv05470
Filed: October 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (369) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (421) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; (473) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; (348) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW Administrative Motion. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (390) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (445), (446) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; (494) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; (369) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE MARCH 3, 2011 REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER (378 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (357 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (482 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) Stipulation Regarding Assignments of Claims. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 373 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/24/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER Granting re (360 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (413 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW), (465 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (340 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) ABBOTT'S REQUEST PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 58.IV.E TO BRING ELECTRONIC AND OTHER MISCELLANEOUS EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/22/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting (322) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (374) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting (423) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; (301) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING(310) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (364) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; (412) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting (290) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS ASSOCIATED WITH ABBOTTS OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING (299) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW, (368) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW, (245) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW Motion to Divide Trial into Two Phases ; DENYING (265) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW, (354) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW, (401 ) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW, (279) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW Defendant's Motion for an Order Shortening Trial; RULING ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE and DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE FURTHER BRIEFING ON JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Preliminary Jury Instructions - 2-11-2011) (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (285) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; granting (339) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting (387) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting (264) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO PARTICIPATE IN FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS AND CONCERNING TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/3/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER Granting (278 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (353 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW),(400 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (298 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) Stipulation REGARDING PARTIES' EXHIBIT LISTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (269) 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (371) 4:07-cv-05985-CW; (248) 4:07-cv-06120-CW Motion to Shorten Time (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE TO PARTIES REGARDING COURTS UNAVAILABILITY AND POTENTIAL ADVANCEMENT OF TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part (227) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (232) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; granting in part and denying in part (283) Motion f or Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (287) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting in part and denying in part (328) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (332) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting in part and denying in part (209) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (213) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Granting 232 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (317 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW), (253 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (354 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) Stipulation Regarding Pre-Trial Exchanges and Trial Procedures. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)(Entered on 1/7/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (252) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (316) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; (353) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; (231) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW Motion for Administrative Relief, Seeking Order Clarifying that each Side in these Related Cases is Limited to 25 pages total for Motion in Limine. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GSK'S MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 303 filed on case no. 07-5702. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/19/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010) Modified on 11/24/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (192) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; granting (249) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting (289) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting (175) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/28/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***TO CORRECT INCORRECT ENTRY (DOCUMENT #S 268 IN C-07-5702-CW; #213 IN C-07-5470-CW, #313 IN C-07-5985; #194 IN C-07-6120-CW)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (199) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; granting (255) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting (299) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting (181) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)***TO CORRECT INCORRECT ENTRY (DOCUMENT #S 265 IN C-07-5702-CW; #210 IN C-07-5470-CW, #310 IN C-07-5985; #191 IN C-07-6120-CW) Modified on 10/28/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER re Granting (295 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (178 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (196 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) Stipulation To Three Additional Pages For Abbott Laboratories Reply In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment On Direct Purchasers Plaintiffs Claims. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Granting (173 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (287 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (190 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (247 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW) MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/9/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER re (270 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW),(234 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW), (158 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (171 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) Granting Stipulation Extending Deadlines for Filing Declarations in support of Administrative Motions to File Under Seal relating to Abbotts Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/9/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re (140 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW),(251 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (214 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW), (151 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) Granting Stipulation REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF EXPERT WITNESSES AND EXTENDING EXPERT DISCOVERY SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/18/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 AMENDED ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING (137) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Appeal in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; DENYING (199) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Appeal in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; DENYING (233) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Ap peal in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; DENYING (126) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Appeal in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/1/2010. AMENDED TO REFLECT ORDER OF 4/16/2010 PURSUANT TO PARTIES' STIPULATION. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re (209 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW),(146 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (242 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (135 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) Granting Stipulation TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCOVERY SCHEDULE. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/16/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re (204 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW), (237 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (141 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (130 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) granting STIPULATION Re Deposition of Trial Witnesses not deposed and Expert Demonstratives. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/25/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING (114) Defendant's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; DENYING (180) Defendant's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; DENYING (211) Defendant's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; DENYING (104) Defendant's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER re (227 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) (192 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW) (131 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) (120 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION to Extend the Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motion Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 12/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER re (213 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) granting as modified STIPULATION and Application to Extend Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by One Day in Light of Yom Kippur Holiday, (116 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) (183 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW) (106 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/1/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re (202 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (106 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (96 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Extending Discovery Response And Motion To Compel Deadlines. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 4/8/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (78) Motion to Stay; granting (91) Motion for Leave to File; denying (103) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; granting (120) Motion to Stay; granting (133) Motion for Le ave to File; denying (143) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting (163) Motion to Stay; granting (187) Motion for Leave to File; denying (198) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting (68) Motion to Stay; granting (81) Motion for Leave to File; denying (93) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER re (196 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) (91 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) (101 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) granting STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Depositions And The Use Of Related Evidence At Trial. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/17/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re (192 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) (87 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) (97 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Extending Motion To Compel Deadline. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 3/11/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re (188 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) (82 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) (92 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION Regarding the Deposition of Miles White. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 3/9/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re (183 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Re Fact Discovery on Certain Items After Cut-Off; (129 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Re Fact Discovery on Certain Items After Cut-Off; (77 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Re Fact Discovery on Certain Items After Cut-Off ; (87 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Re Fact Discovery on Certain Items After Cut-Off. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 2/25/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re (161 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (76 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (66 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITION OF MILES WHITE.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 1/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 FIRST DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/14/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re (149 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND SETTING DEPOSITION PROCEDURES, (55 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND SETTING DEPOSITION PROCEDURES, (65 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) GRANT ING STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND SETTING DEPOSITION PROCEDURES, (100 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND SETTING DEPOSITION PROCEDURES. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/25/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeway Inc. et al v. Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeway Inc.
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Alberton's, Inc.
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Sales Company, Inc.
Represented By: Scott E. Perwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?