March 7, 2011 |
Filing
392
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (369) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (421) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; (473) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; (348) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW Administrative Motion. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
|
March 4, 2011 |
Filing
391
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (390) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (445), (446) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; (494) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; (369) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE MARCH 3, 2011 REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
|
March 1, 2011 |
Filing
382
ORDER (378 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (357 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (482 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) Stipulation Regarding Assignments of Claims. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing
373
PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/24/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
|
February 22, 2011 |
Filing
364
ORDER Granting re (360 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (413 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW), (465 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (340 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) ABBOTT'S REQUEST PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 58.IV.E TO BRING ELECTRONIC AND OTHER MISCELLANEOUS EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/22/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
|
February 18, 2011 |
Filing
354
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting (322) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (374) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting (423) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; (301) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing
342
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING(310) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (364) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; (412) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting (290) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW DEFENDANT ABBOTT LABORATORIES ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS ASSOCIATED WITH ABBOTTS OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS IN LIMINE (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
|
February 11, 2011 |
Filing
339
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING (299) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW, (368) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW, (245) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW Motion to Divide Trial into Two Phases ; DENYING (265) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW, (354) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW, (401 ) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW, (279) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW Defendant's Motion for an Order Shortening Trial; RULING ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE and DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE FURTHER BRIEFING ON JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Preliminary Jury Instructions - 2-11-2011) (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
|
February 7, 2011 |
Filing
321
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (285) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; granting (339) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting (387) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting (264) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
|
February 3, 2011 |
Filing
318
ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO PARTICIPATE IN FURTHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS AND CONCERNING TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/3/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
|
February 1, 2011 |
Filing
304
ORDER Granting (278 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (353 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW),(400 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (298 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) Stipulation REGARDING PARTIES' EXHIBIT LISTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
|
January 26, 2011 |
Filing
296
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (269) 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (371) 4:07-cv-05985-CW; (248) 4:07-cv-06120-CW Motion to Shorten Time (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing
268
NOTICE TO PARTIES REGARDING COURTS UNAVAILABILITY AND POTENTIAL ADVANCEMENT OF TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
|
January 14, 2011 |
Filing
262
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part (227) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (232) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; granting in part and denying in part (283) Motion f or Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (287) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting in part and denying in part (328) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (332) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting in part and denying in part (209) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (213) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
|
January 6, 2011 |
Filing
258
ORDER Granting 232 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (317 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW), (253 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (354 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) Stipulation Regarding Pre-Trial Exchanges and Trial Procedures. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)(Entered on 1/7/2011)
|
January 3, 2011 |
Filing
256
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (252) in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; (316) in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; (353) in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; (231) in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW Motion for Administrative Relief, Seeking Order Clarifying that each Side in these Related Cases is Limited to 25 pages total for Motion in Limine. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing
248
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GSK'S MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 303 filed on case no. 07-5702. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/19/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010) Modified on 11/24/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
217
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (192) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; granting (249) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting (289) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting (175) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/28/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***TO CORRECT INCORRECT ENTRY (DOCUMENT #S 268 IN C-07-5702-CW; #213 IN C-07-5470-CW, #313 IN C-07-5985; #194 IN C-07-6120-CW)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing
214
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (199) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; granting (255) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting (299) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting (181) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)***TO CORRECT INCORRECT ENTRY (DOCUMENT #S 265 IN C-07-5702-CW; #210 IN C-07-5470-CW, #310 IN C-07-5985; #191 IN C-07-6120-CW) Modified on 10/28/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
October 4, 2010 |
Filing
203
ORDER re Granting (295 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (178 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (196 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) Stipulation To Three Additional Pages For Abbott Laboratories Reply In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment On Direct Purchasers Plaintiffs Claims. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing
191
ORDER Granting (173 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (287 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (190 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (247 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW) MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/9/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing
175
ORDER re (270 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW),(234 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW), (158 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW), (171 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) Granting Stipulation Extending Deadlines for Filing Declarations in support of Administrative Motions to File Under Seal relating to Abbotts Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/9/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing
152
ORDER re (140 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW),(251 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (214 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW), (151 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) Granting Stipulation REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF EXPERT WITNESSES AND EXTENDING EXPERT DISCOVERY SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/18/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
|
June 2, 2010 |
Filing
150
AMENDED ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING (137) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Appeal in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; DENYING (199) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Appeal in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; DENYING (233) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Ap peal in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; DENYING (126) Abbott's Motion for Leave to Appeal in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/1/2010. AMENDED TO REFLECT ORDER OF 4/16/2010 PURSUANT TO PARTIES' STIPULATION. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
|
April 16, 2010 |
Filing
147
ORDER re (209 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW),(146 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (242 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (135 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) Granting Stipulation TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCOVERY SCHEDULE. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/16/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
|
March 25, 2010 |
Filing
145
ORDER re (204 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW), (237 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (141 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (130 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) granting STIPULATION Re Deposition of Trial Witnesses not deposed and Expert Demonstratives. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/25/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
|
January 12, 2010 |
Filing
133
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING (114) Defendant's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; DENYING (180) Defendant's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; DENYING (211) Defendant's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; DENYING (104) Defendant's Omnibus Motion to Dismiss in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
|
December 21, 2009 |
Filing
132
ORDER re (227 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) (192 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW) (131 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) (120 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION to Extend the Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motion Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 12/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing
117
ORDER re (213 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) granting as modified STIPULATION and Application to Extend Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by One Day in Light of Yom Kippur Holiday, (116 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) (183 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW) (106 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/1/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
|
April 8, 2009 |
Filing
107
ORDER re (202 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (106 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (96 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Extending Discovery Response And Motion To Compel Deadlines. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 4/8/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
|
March 18, 2009 |
Filing
105
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (78) Motion to Stay; granting (91) Motion for Leave to File; denying (103) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 4:07-cv-05470-CW; granting (120) Motion to Stay; granting (133) Motion for Le ave to File; denying (143) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 4:07-cv-05702-CW; granting (163) Motion to Stay; granting (187) Motion for Leave to File; denying (198) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 4:07-cv-05985-CW; granting (68) Motion to Stay; granting (81) Motion for Leave to File; denying (93) Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery in case 4:07-cv-06120-CW (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing
104
ORDER re (196 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) (91 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) (101 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) granting STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' 30(b)(6) Depositions And The Use Of Related Evidence At Trial. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/17/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
|
March 11, 2009 |
Filing
99
ORDER re (192 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) (87 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) (97 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Extending Motion To Compel Deadline. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 3/11/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
|
March 9, 2009 |
Filing
96
ORDER re (188 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) (82 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) (92 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION Regarding the Deposition of Miles White. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 3/9/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
|
February 25, 2009 |
Filing
88
ORDER re (183 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Re Fact Discovery on Certain Items After Cut-Off; (129 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Re Fact Discovery on Certain Items After Cut-Off; (77 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Re Fact Discovery on Certain Items After Cut-Off ; (87 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Re Fact Discovery on Certain Items After Cut-Off. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 2/25/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
|
January 29, 2009 |
Filing
77
ORDER re (161 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW), (76 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW), (66 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITION OF MILES WHITE.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 1/29/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing
70
FIRST DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/14/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
|
September 25, 2008 |
Filing
66
ORDER re (149 in 4:07-cv-05985-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND SETTING DEPOSITION PROCEDURES, (55 in 4:07-cv-06120-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND SETTING DEPOSITION PROCEDURES, (65 in 4:07-cv-05470-CW) GRANT ING STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND SETTING DEPOSITION PROCEDURES, (100 in 4:07-cv-05702-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE SCHEDULE AND SETTING DEPOSITION PROCEDURES. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 9/25/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
|