Praetorian Financial Insurance Company v. United States Of America et al
Plaintiff: Praetorian Financial Insurance Company
Defendant: United States Of America and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 4:2007cv05746
Filed: November 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Wayne D. Brazil
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/3/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Removing Incorrectly Filed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 8/6/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 10/19/2009 08:30 AM. Motions due by 7/28/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2009 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/29/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, DENYING AS MOOT 41 Stipulation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/21/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009) Modified on 1/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/2/2008. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Praetorian Financial Insurance Company v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praetorian Financial Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin J. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?