Philip Morris USA Inc. v. City & County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Philip Morris USA Inc.
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco, Board of Supervisors of the City & County of San Francisco and Gavin Newsom
Case Number: 4:2008cv04482
Filed: September 24, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 45 granting STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/20/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
December 12, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 granting as modified Stipulated Application For Order Staying Case Pending Appeal From Orders Denying Preliminary Injunction. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/12/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 5, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
October 14, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 22 GRANTING STIPULATION re Application to Continue Hearing Date. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/6/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/14/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
September 26, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken re 6 (1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND (2) REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philip Morris USA Inc. v. City & County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Morris USA Inc.
Represented By: Mark R Yohalem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of the City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?