Valdez et al v. City of San Jose et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Valdez, Ricardo Vasquez, Daniel Martinez and Jamil Stubbs
Defendant: City of San Jose, Robert Davis, R. Agaman, Does 1 through 2500, Martin, Rickert, Wallace and Orlando
Case Number: 4:2009cv00176
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 06/20/14. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 06/17/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting 277 request for entry into and use of electronic equipment at trial filed by Jamil Stubbs. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 06/13/14. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, Motions terminated: 244 MOTION in Limine Nos. 1 Through 8 filed by Jamil Stubbs, 248 MOTION in Limine filed by Martin, Robert Davis, Rickert, Orlando, Wallace, City of San Jose, R. Agaman.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 06/06/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 STIPULATION AND ORDER (as modified by the Court) granting 261 Stipulation to Continue June 30 trial date. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/28/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/27/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER denying 230 Request for Clarification, filed by Daniel Martinez, Ricardo Vasquez, Jamil Stubbs. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on December 19, 2013. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER re 230 Notice (Other), filed by Daniel Martinez, Ricardo Vasquez, Jamil Stubbs. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on December 9, 2013. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 AMENDED ORDER denying in part and granting in part 199 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Partial Summary Judgment filed by Orlando, Wallace, City of San Jose, R. Agaman. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on November 18, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 199 Motion for Summary Judgment.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER DISCHARGING 212 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on October 17, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN Show Cause Response due by 10/8/2013.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on October 3, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER re 207 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Francisco Valdez, Daniel Martinez, Ricardo Vasquez, 205 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Daniel Martinez, Ricardo Vasquez, Jamil Stubbs, 209 Opposition/Response to Motio n, filed by Daniel Martinez, Ricardo Vasquez, Jamil Stubbs, 206 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Daniel Martinez, Ricardo Vasquez, Jamil Stubbs, 208 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Daniel Martinez, Ricardo Vasquez, Jamil Stubbs, 204 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Daniel Martinez, Ricardo Vasquez, Jamil Stubbs. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on September 27, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Defendants leave to file a second Motion for Summary Judgment,denying 185 Motion to Sever without prejudice. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING CAUSES OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on July 10, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 176 MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO SAN JOSE DIVISION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Granting 164 Joint Statement of Proposed Trial Dates. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2013 02:00 PM. Jury Selection / Jury Trial (7 day) set for 9/16/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 118 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 127 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER unrelating case with member case C-08-4032.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/8/2012. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdez et al v. City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Valdez
Represented By: Steven Michael Berki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Vasquez
Represented By: Steven Michael Berki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Martinez
Represented By: Steven Michael Berki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamil Stubbs
Represented By: Steven Michael Berki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Davis
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Agaman
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 2500
Represented By: M. Jeffery Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickert
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando
Represented By: Clifford S. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?