Ashker v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Todd Ashker
Defendant: Mathew Cate, Francisco Jacquez, Michael Sayre, Maureen McLean, Sue Risenhoover, James Flowers, Pam Labans, R. Robinson, Dwight Winslow, William Barlow and J. R. Andrada
Case Number: 4:2009cv02948
Filed: June 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 22 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 33 MOTION FOR DEFENDANTS TO PHOTOCOPY HIS OPPOSITION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED 29 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 20 Defendants' Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Dispositive Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Mailing) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying re 14 Request for service filed by Todd Ashker, and Granting 15 Request to withdraw request for service filed by Todd Ashker. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on June 30, 2010. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Reviewing 9 Amended Complaint, Ordering Service of Cognizable Claims and Dismissing Non-Cognizable Claims, filed by Todd Ashker. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on June 1, 2010. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting Motion to Serve Order on Prison Litigation Office and denying Motion to Order Marshal to Serve Complaint 6 and; granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Reviewing Complaint Under 28 USC section 1915A, Ordering Service of Cognizable Claims and Dismissing Non-Cognizable Claims re 1 Complaint, filed by Todd Ashker. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on February 16, 2010. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashker v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Ashker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Jacquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Risenhoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Labans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. R. Andrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?