Pizzo v. Newsom et al

Plaintiff: Therese Marie Pizzo
Defendant: Gavin Newsom, Heather Fong, George Gascon, Michael Hennessey, City & County of San Francisco and Edmund G. Brown
Case Number: 4:2009cv04493
Filed: September 23, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 120 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/23/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
December 5, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS 60 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 71 and 90 ) CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012) Modified on 12/5/2012 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING SEPARATE 87 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT KAMALA HARRIS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
May 5, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATIONS 37 MOTION FOR AMICUS CURIAE STATUS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
January 3, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 32 Ex Parte Application (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
July 22, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 Granting Stipulation of the Parties to Set Aside Order of July 14, 2010 for Failure to Appear and to Reset the Case Back on the Case Management Conference Calendar. Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/22/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 14, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/14/2010. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
April 5, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 Granting Stipulation of the Parties to Continue the Case Management Conference.Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2010 02:00 PM.Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/05/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
December 10, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 9 Request to Stay. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken, on 12/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009) Modified on 12/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizzo v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therese Marie Pizzo
Represented By: Daniel Michael Karalash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gascon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Represented By: Geoffrey Lloyd Graybill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?