Holman v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez and Roane Holman
Defendant: Finex Group LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv00180
Filed: January 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 AMENDED #277 ORDER GIVING FINAL APPROVAL TO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARDS. (Motion terminated: #278 STIPULATION ). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/29/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 278 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Correction of Final Approval Order filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Stipulated Request for Correction)(Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 12/22/2014) Modified on 12/23/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GIVING #263 FINAL APPROVAL TO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARDS. (terminating #261 , #262 Stipulation). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 11, 2014 Filing 276 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Claudia Wilken: #263 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; Incentive Awards to Named Plaintiffs; and Attorney Fees and Costs Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2014. Court Reporter Name: Kathy Wyatt. Plaintiff Attorney: Carol Brewer; Andrew Ogilive. Defendant Attorney: Daniel McLoon. The motion is argued and submitted by the parties, and GRANTED by the Court. Counsel to provide the Court with a sentence that includes the excluded person's name. Written order to follow. (This is a text only minute entry, there is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Time: 2:03-2:12)(Date Filed: 12/11/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 275 RESPONSE to re #273 OBJECTIONS filed by Lester Earl Hubbard. filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 12/1/2014) Modified on 12/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 273 OBJECTIONS to the settlement filed by Lester Earl Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 7, 2014 Reset Deadlines as to #263 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Incentive Awards to Named Plaintiffs and Attorney's Fees and Costs (see docket no. #257 ): Responses due by 11/21/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 272 Ombudsman's Report and Analysis filed by Hon. James L. Warren (Ret.). (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 271 Declaration of Narcisco Navarro Hernandez in Support of #263 MOTION for Settlement Approval, Service Awards and Fees & Costs filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez. (Related document(s) #263 ) (Letona, Balam) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 270 Declaration of Miguel Alvarez in Support of #263 MOTION for Settlement Approval, Service Awards and Fees & Costs filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez. (Related document(s) #263 ) (Letona, Balam) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 269 Declaration of Balam Letona in Support of #263 MOTION for Settlement Approval, Service Awards and Fees & Costs filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez. (Related document(s) #263 ) (Letona, Balam) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 268 Declaration of Roane Holman in Support of #263 MOTION for Settlement Approval, Service Awards and Fees & Costs filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #263 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 267 Declaration of Carol Brewer in Support of #263 MOTION for Settlement Approval, Service Awards and Fees & Costs filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #263 ) (Brewer, Carol) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 266 Declaration of Mark F Anderson in Support of #263 MOTION for Settlement Approval, Service Awards and Fees & Costs filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #263 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 265 Declaration of Richard Pearl filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 11/6/2014) Modified on 11/7/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2014 Filing 264 Declaration of Andrew Ogilvie in Support of #263 MOTION for Settlement Approval, Service Awards and Fees & Costs filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #263 ) (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 263 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Incentive Awards to Named Plaintiffs and Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 11/20/2014. Replies due by 12/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 11/6/2014) Modified on 11/7/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2014 Filing 262 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Notice to the Class of the Amount of the Award filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 10/24/2014) Modified on 10/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2014 Filing 261 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Date for Determination of Disputed Claims by the Ombudsman filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 10/21/2014) Modified on 10/22/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #259 Stipulation re Date for Submission of Disputed Claims to Ombudsman. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 259 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Date for Submission of Disputed Claims to Ombudsman filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 10/14/2014) Modified on 10/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2014 Filing 258 NOTICE of Filing of Spanish Translation and Declaration by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #257 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spanish Translator Maria D. Perez-Vergara)(Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 5/29/2014) Modified on 5/30/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Set Hearings (See docket no. #257 ) : Fairness Hearing set for 12/11/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken PRELIMINARILY APPROVING #242 CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS AND SETTING HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Claim Form) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 256 Proposed Order of Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement with Notice & Claim form by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 255 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 4/24/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 254 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 24, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2014. (Related documents(s) #252 , #253 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 253 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 252 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 251 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the #242 motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement, set for April 24, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. is being advanced to April 24, 2014, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 14, 2014 Filing 250 Notice of Mailing of CAFA Notice by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Mailing of CAFA Notice, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Mailing of CAFA Notice)(Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 4/14/2014) Modified on 4/15/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2014 Filing 249 Declaration of Daniel J. McLoon in Support of #248 Notice (Other) filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel J. McLoon, Revised Mail Notice, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Daniel J. McLoon, redline of revisions to Mail Notice)(Related document(s) #248 ) (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 248 Joint Notice of Filing of Revised Form of Proposed Mail Notice to Settlement Class by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 4/3/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2014 ***See text order 247 . Reset Hearing as to #242 MOTION Preliminary approval of class action settlement . Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Order granting #244 Motion to Shorten Time entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 31, 2014 Filing 246 Proposed Order (revised) Preliminary Approval by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 Filing 245 Proposed Order re #242 MOTION Preliminary approval of class action settlement by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 244 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary and Proposed Order filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 3/28/2014) Modified on 3/31/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2014 Filing 243 Declaration of Andrew J Ogilvie in Support of #242 MOTION Preliminary approval of class action settlement filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Ogilvie dec - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 to Ogilvie dec. - Mail Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 to Ogilvie dec. - Claim Form)(Related document(s) #242 ) (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 242 MOTION Preliminary approval of class action settlement filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 4/10/2014. Replies due by 4/17/2014. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 14, 2014 Filing 241 Minute Entry: Further Telephonic Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Parties have reached full proposed class settlement. Class counsel anticipates filing of motion for preliminary approval by 3/31/2014. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/14/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER to Submit Joint Letter re Status of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/03/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
December 19, 2013 Filing 239 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Class settlement reached in principle. Parties anticipate that they will complete drafting of class settlement agreement by late February 2014. Parties shall lodge a joint status letter with Judge Ryu by no later than 2/18/2014. (FTR Recording: Not recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 237 Proposed Order Excusing Holman & Alvarez from attending by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 11/26/2013) Modified on 11/27/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER (AS MODIFIED) by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #236 Plaintiffs' Request to Excuse Plaintiffs Miguel Alvarez and Roane Holman from personal attendance at the 12/19/2013 further settlement conference. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 236 MOTION TO EXCUSE PLAINTIFFS MIGUEL ALVAREZ AND ROANE HOLMAN FROM PERSONAL ATTENDANCE AT THE DECEMBER 19, 2013 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Corrected filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Roane Holman. (Brewer, Carol) (Filed on 11/22/2013) Modified on 11/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2013 Filing 235 MOTION TO EXCUSE PLAINTIFFS MIGUEL ALVAREZ AND NARCISCO NAVARRO HERNANDEZ FROM PERSONAL ATTENDANCE AT THE APRIL 16, 2013 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Roane Holman. (Brewer, Carol) (Filed on 11/22/2013) Modified on 11/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Settlement Conference set for 12/19/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court has determined that the settlement process may benefit from the appointment of Howard Herman, ADR Program Director, as co-mediator. Court appoints Director Herman to serve as co-mediator in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/20/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 233 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #227 motion for approval of class notice and appointment of KCC to send notice and the #228 motion for approval of class notice and questionnaire under submission on the papers. The hearing previously scheduled for November 7, 2013, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 24, 2013 Filing 232 REPLY (re #228 MOTION Approval of Class Notice and Questionnaire ) filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 21, 2013 Filing 231 REPLY (re #227 MOTION Approval of Class Notice and Appointment of KCC to Send Notice, etc. ) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 230 RESPONSE (re #228 MOTION Approval of Class Notice and Questionnaire ) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 229 RESPONSE (re #227 MOTION Approval of Class Notice and Appointment of KCC to Send Notice, etc. ) filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 3, 2013 Filing 228 MOTION Approval of Class Notice and Questionnaire filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/17/2013. Replies due by 10/24/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G Morgan ISO Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Questionnaire, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Questionnaire)(Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 227 MOTION Approval of Class Notice and Appointment of KCC to Send Notice, etc. filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/15/2013. Replies due by 10/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plffs' Proposed Notice, #2 Declaration of Andrew J Ogilvie)(Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS #186 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 225 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #186 motion for summary judgment and to decertify class under submission on the papers. The hearing previously scheduled for Thursday, August 22, 2013, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 224 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #219 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh 41 to #212 Ogilvie dec. - unredacted by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 8/13/2013) Modified on 8/13/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2013 Filing 223 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #219 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh 39 to #212 Ogilvie dec - unredacted by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 8/13/2013) Modified on 8/13/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2013 Filing 222 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #219 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh 38 to #212 Ogilvie dec - unredacted by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 8/13/2013) Modified on 8/13/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2013 Filing 221 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #219 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exh B to #212 Ogilvie dec.-Henke depo testimony unredacted by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 8/13/2013) Modified on 8/13/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2013 Filing 220 EXHIBITS re #219 Order Filed in Public Record per Order filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 165, #2 Exhibit 174, #3 Exhibit 177, #4 Exhibit 178)(Related document(s) #219 ) (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE #210 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/12/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013) Modified on 8/13/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2013 Filing 218 Proposed Order re #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 217 Declaration of Michael Morgan in Support of #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #210 ) (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 216 Declaration of Katie Muzik in Support of #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #210 ) (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 215 REPLY (re #186 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Decertify the Class ) filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 214 CORRECTED DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. OGILVIE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO EXPERIANS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS Jurat added by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/31/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2013 Filing 213 RESPONSE (re #186 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Decertify the Class ) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 212 DECLARATION of Andrew Ogilvie in support of re #186 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Decertify the Class filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Levine excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Henke excerpts, public version, #3 Exhibit C - Buell excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Centanni excerpts, #5 Exhibit E - Exp's Resp to Int 8, #6 Exhibit F - Exp's Resp to Int 21, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 18, #9 Exhibit 33, #10 Exhibit 38 - redacted, #11 Exhibit 39 - lodged separately, #12 Exhibit 40, #13 Exhibit 41 - redacted, #14 Exhibit 42, #15 Exhibit 126 - EIS 289 redacted, #16 Exhibit 139, #17 Exhibit 145, #18 Exhibit 148, #19 Exhibit 149, #20 Exhibit 150, #21 Exhibit 159, #22 Exhibit 161, #23 Exhibit 162, #24 Exhibit 164, #25 Exhibit 165 - lodged separately, #26 Exhibit 168, #27 Exhibit 171, #28 Exhibit 172, #29 Exhibit 173, #30 Exhibit 174 - lodged separately, #31 Exhibit 177 - lodged separately, #32 Exhibit 178 - lodged separately, #33 Exhibit 179, #34 Exhibit 182, #35 Exhibit 190)(Related document(s) #186 ) (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 7/25/2013) Modified on 7/25/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2013 Filing 211 STIPULATION re re Collection Advantage Reports filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 7/25/2013) Modified on 7/25/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2013 Filing 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 7/25/2013) Modified on 10/31/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2013 See Order, Docket No. #209 .Reset Deadlines as to #186 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Decertify the Class. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #208 Stipulation Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Decertify the Class. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 15, 2013 Filing 208 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Decertify the Class filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roanne Holman, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 7/15/2013) Modified on 7/15/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS #186 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS. Reset Deadlines/Hearing: Responses due by 7/25/2013; Replies due by 8/1/2013; Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/2/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 26, 2013 Filing 206 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2013 Filing 205 Minute Entry: Further telephonic Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Further telephonic settlement discussions conducted between 5/3/2013 and 6/11/2013. Matter did not settle. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/11/2013)
May 29, 2013 Filing 204 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 5/29/2013) Modified on 5/30/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2013 Filing 203 Minute Entry: Further Telephonic Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2013)
May 1, 2013 Filing 202 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 5/1/2013) Modified on 5/2/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2013 Filing 201 Minute Entry: Further Telephonic Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Class counsel to call Judge Ryu on 5/3/2013 for further discussions. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 200 Minute Entry: Further Telephonic Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Defense counsel to call Judge Ryu with response to latest proposal by 4/29/2013. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 199 Minute Entry: Telephonic Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Telephonic settlement discussion held with Class Counsel. Class Counsel to contact Judge Ryu with response by 4/22/2013. (Date Filed: 4/19/2013). (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2013)
April 16, 2013 Filing 198 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Judge Ryu to contact Plaintiffs' counsel on 4/19/13 for response to latest proposal. (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2013)
April 2, 2013 Filing 197 Joint Status Report by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 4/2/2013) Modified on 4/3/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #194 Motion for Plaintiffs Miguel Alvarez and Narcisco Navarro Hernandez be excused from personally appearing at the Settlement Conference on 4/16/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #193 Motion that Ann Sterling and Eric A. Lidman be excused from personally appearing at the 4/16/2013 Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 194 MOTION to excuse Alvarez and Navarro from attending in person at the 4/16/2013 settlement conference (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 3/29/2013) Modified on 4/1/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2013 Filing 193 Request to Excuse Ms. Sterling and Mr. Lidman from Personal Appearance at the April 16, 2013 Settlement Conference filed by Experian Information Solutions. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 3/28/2013) Modified on 3/29/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 4/16/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/14/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Order granting #190 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. The parties shall file a joint status report every 28 days. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 6, 2013 Filing 190 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay the Proceedings filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 4, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to #186 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Decertify the Class Pursuant to Docket No. #176 . Responses due by 3/7/2013. Replies due by 3/21/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 189 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference HELD before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy will contact parties to schedule further settlement conference to take place within next 30-60 days, or as soon thereafter as is available on Judge Ryu's calendar. (Date Filed: 3/1/2013). (FTR Recording: Not Recorded) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 188 Declaration of Patricia Finneran in Support of Experian's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 187 Declaration of Michael G. Morgan in Support of Experian's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 186 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Decertify the Class filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 2/21/2013. Replies due by 2/28/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment and to Decertify the Class)(Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING EXPERIANS #180 MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR RELIEF FROM A NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF THE DISCOVERY MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 184 REPLY (re #180 MOTION To Reopen Discovery or, Alternatively, for Relief from a Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge ) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Reopen Discovery or, Alternatively, for Relief from a Nondispositive Pretrial Order of the Magistrate Judge, filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 11, 2013 Filing 183 RESPONSE (re #180 MOTION To Reopen Discovery or, Alternatively, for Relief from a Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge ) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 4, 2013 Filing 182 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 5, 2012, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2013. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
December 28, 2012 Filing 181 Declaration of Michael G. Morgan in Support of #180 MOTION To Reopen Discovery or, Alternatively, for Relief from a Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Discovery Requests)(Related document(s) #180 ) (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 12/28/2012) Modified on 12/31/2012 (kcS, ).
December 28, 2012 Filing 180 MOTION To Reopen Discovery or, Alternatively, for Relief from a Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 1/11/2013. Replies due by 1/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order granting Experian's motion to reopen discovery)(Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 12/28/2012) Modified on 12/31/2012 (kcS, ).
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #177 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/1/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/13/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 7, 2012 Filing 177 Joint Discovery Letter BriefDiscovery Dispute Joint Report # 7 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mcintosh, Haley) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 6, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 5, 2012 Filing 176 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/5/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 12/5/2012). Motions due by 2/7/2013. Responses due by 3/7/2013.Replies due by 3/21/2013. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2012)
December 5, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for Wednesday, December 12, 2012, is continued to Wednesday, January 16, 2013, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by January 9, 2013.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) **DISREGARD, FILED ON THE INCORRECT CASE*** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012) Modified on 12/5/2012 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re discovery disputes #171 , #173 , #174 . Parties to submit joint letter by 12/7/12. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 30, 2012 Filing 174 OBJECTIONS to re #173 First Discovery Letter Brief re Discover Dispute # 7 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 29, 2012 Filing 173 First Discovery Letter Briefre Discover Dispute # 7 filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 172 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Case Management Statement: Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Case Management Statement: Questionnaire)(Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 11/28/2012) Modified on 11/29/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2012 Filing 171 Seventh Discovery Letter Brief filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Experian's Discovery Report No. 7, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Experian's Discovery Report No. 7)(Sawyer, Jessica) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
October 23, 2012 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Melisse Mcintosh (Mcintosh, Haley) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #168 Stipulation Extending Experian's Deadline to Respond to Discovery.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 16, 2012 Filing 168 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Experian's Deadline to Respond to Discovery filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman, Narciso Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez. (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2012) Modified on 8/17/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 Filing 167 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 25, 2012, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/31/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2012. (rhm, ) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 165 Notice of Withdrawal of John Gehart by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Gehart, John) (Filed on 7/31/2012) Modified on 8/1/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2012 Filing 166 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/25/2012 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 7/25/2012). Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2012 02:00 PM. ***Motions terminated: #162 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge #61 .** (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/25/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 164 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 7/18/2012) Modified on 7/19/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2012 Filing 163 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 14, 2012, before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2012. (rhm, ) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 162 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge #61 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Gehart, John) (Filed on 7/16/2012) Modified on 7/17/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying #156 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE DISCOVERY. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER on plaintiffs' motions to compel #157 Joint Discovery Letter Briefon Disputes 2 & 3 filed by Roane Holman, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez, #154 Fifth Discovery Letter Brief(Joint Report) filed by Roane Holman, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/27/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012) Modified on 6/28/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2012 Filing 159 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/14/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 6/15/2012). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/15/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Continuing Hearing on Discovery Disputes. Discovery Hearing set for 6/14/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/17/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 16, 2012 Filing 157 Updated Joint Discovery Letter Briefon Disputes 2 & 3 filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ogilvie dec, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 5/16/2012) Modified on 5/17/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2012 Filing 156 Joint Discovery Letter Brief #6 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez. (Gehart, John) (Filed on 5/16/2012) Modified on 5/17/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2012 Filing 155 Declaration of Mark F Anderson in Support of #154 Fifth Discovery Letter Brief(Joint Report) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #154 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 Filing 154 Fifth Discovery Letter Brief(Joint Report) filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 5/16/2012) Modified on 5/17/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #151 Motion for Leave to File Combined Joint Discovery Letter.(hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS #140 MOTION TO CONTINUE, VACATING CASE DEADLINES AND CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/16/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 15, 2012 Filing 151 MOTION for Leave to File Single 20-Page Report for Discovery Disputes 2 & 3 filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #148 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Discovery Letters.(hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 149 Proposed Order re #148 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Letter Briefs by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Gehart, John) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 14, 2012 Filing 148 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Letter Briefs filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Miguel A. Alvarez. (Gehart, John) (Filed on 5/14/2012) Modified on 5/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2012 Filing 147 RESPONSE (re #140 MOTION to Continue Case-Dispositive Motion Deadline ) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ogilvie declaration, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken amending class definition and denying #144 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 8, 2012 Filing 145 Notice of Lodging of Redaction Log filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Gehart, John) (Filed on 5/8/2012) Modified on 5/9/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2012 Filing 144 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Class Certification Order filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Gehart, John) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Gehart, III as Counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Gehart, John) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 142 Proposed Order re #140 MOTION to Continue Case-Dispositive Motion Deadline by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 141 Declaration of Michael G. Morgan in Support of #140 MOTION to Continue Case-Dispositive Motion Deadline filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #140 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 140 MOTION to Continue Case-Dispositive Motion Deadline filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 139 Notice of Lodging of Privilege Log and Verification of Completion filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 5/3/2012) Modified on 5/4/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #68 Motion to Certify Class (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Notice of Reference and Order re Discovery Procedures and Pending Discovery Disputes. Motions terminated: #128 Fifth Discovery Letter Brief(Joint Report), #123 Fourth Discovery Letter BriefDiscovery Dispute Joint Report. Discovery Hearing set for 5/24/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/26/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 AMENDED #135 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT AND SPECIAL MASTER AND REFERRING THE CASE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR DISCOVERY. ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 117] Joint Discovery Letter Brief Discovery Dispute #2 and #119 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Discovery Dispute #3. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/26/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 24, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DENYING #125 MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL MASTER AND REFERRING THE CASE TO OAKLAND MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYU FOR DISCOVERY. ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #123 Fourth Discovery Letter Brief Discovery Dispute (Joint Report), and #128 Fifth Discovery Letter Brief (Joint Report). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 134 REPLY (re #125 MOTION Appoint Special Master ) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ogilvie Supplemental Dec., #2 Proposed Order)(Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 133 Declaration of Michael G. Morgan in Support of #132 Opposition/Response to Motion to Appoint Special Master filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 132 RESPONSE (re #125 MOTION Appoint Special Master ) filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 4/13/2012) Modified on 4/16/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Order granting #127 Motion to Shorten Time entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. Defendant's response to motion for appointment of special master is due April 13, Plaintiffs' reply is due April 17, and the motion will be decided on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 9, 2012 Filing 130 Declaration of Michael G. Morgan in Support of #129 Opposition/Response to Motion to Shorten Time filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 9, 2012 Filing 129 RESPONSE (re #127 MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion for Special Master ) Opposition filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 6, 2012 Filing 128 Fifth Discovery Letter Brief(Joint Report) filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman, Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 4/6/2012) Modified on 4/9/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2012 Filing 127 MOTION to Shorten Time for Motion for Special Master filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Andrew Ogilvie, #2 Proposed Order)(Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 126 Declaration of Andrew J Ogilvie in Support of #125 MOTION Appoint Special Master filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #125 ) (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 125 MOTION Appoint Special Master filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 4/18/2012. Replies due by 4/25/2012. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 124 EXHIBITS re #123 Fourth Discovery Letter BriefDiscovery Dispute Joint Report Exemplars of forms sought by subpoena filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #123 ) (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Filing 123 Fourth Discovery Letter BriefDiscovery Dispute Joint Report filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
February 14, 2012 Filing 122 Declaration of Michael G. Morgan in Support of Experian's portions of re #119 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #3 filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #119 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 121 Declaration of Michael G. Morgan in Support of Experian portions of re #117 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2 filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #117 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Andrew Ogilvie with exhibits re #119 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #3 filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #119 ) (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 119 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #3 filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 118 DECLARATION of Andrew Ogilvie with exhibits re #117 Discovery Dispute Joint #2 filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #117 ) (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2012 Filing 117 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2 filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 2/14/2012) Modified on 2/15/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2012 Filing 116 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 26, 2012, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 115 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/26/2012 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 1/26/2012). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2012)
January 25, 2012 Filing 114 NOTICE of Errata and Omitted Attachment to re #87 Declaration of Jesse A. Enriquez Filed December 29, 2011 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/25/2012) Modified on 1/26/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2012 Filing 113 Rebuttal Declaration of Michael G. Morgan Pursuant to Order Entered January 20, 2012 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/23/2012) Modified on 1/24/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2012 Filing 112 Rebuttal Declaration of Jesse A. Enriquez Pursuant to Order Entered January 20, 2012 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/23/2012) Modified on 1/24/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2012 Filing 111 Rebuttal Evidence Pursuant to re #107 Order Entered January 20, 2012 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/23/2012) Modified on 1/24/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2012 Filing 110 Declaration of Michael G. Morgan in Support of #109 Opposition/Response to Motion re Class Certification [Unredacted] filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #109 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 109 RESPONSE (re #68 First MOTION to Certify Class ) in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Unredacted] filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re (1) Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1 #60 and (2) Administrative Motion to File under Seal #48 . Motion to seal granted as to Centanni Decl., Exhibit 6, but otherwise denied.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LEAVE TO FILE REBUTTAL EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/20/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 106 Proposed Order re #105 Declaration in Support, #104 Opposition/Response to Motion re Discovery Issues by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 105 Declaration of Michael G. Morgan in Support of #104 Opposition/Response to Motion re Discovery Issues filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #104 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 104 RESPONSE (re #100 MOTION Admin relief re Discovery Issues ) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS #84 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 19, 2012 Filing 102 OBJECTIONS to New Evidence Filed with Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/19/2012) Modified on 1/20/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2012 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Andrew J. Ogilvie in Support of Plffs' Admin Mtn re Discovery Issues filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 1/18/2012) Modified on 1/19/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2012 Filing 100 MOTION Admin relief re Discovery Issues filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. Responses due by 2/1/2012. Replies due by 2/8/2012. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 99 Declaration of Paul Price in Support of #68 First MOTION to Certify Class (Reply) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 98 Declaration of Antonia Blas-Sainz in Support of #68 First MOTION to Certify Class (Reply) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 97 Declaration of Mark F Anderson in Support of #68 First MOTION to Certify Class Attaching Documents (Reply) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 96 REPLY (re #68 First MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #93 Order re Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal (Docket No. 84) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #84 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Experian's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS #84 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/9/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 4, 2012 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in support of re #68 MOTION to Certify Class and appointment of class counsel filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 12/29/2011. Replies due by 1/12/2012. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 1/4/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS #80 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PUBLICLY THEIR UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DENYING THEIR #83 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 29, 2011 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Scot Levine in Support of #85 Opposition filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 12/29/2011) Modified on 12/30/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2011 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Peter Henke in Support of #85 Opposition filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 12/29/2011) Modified on 12/30/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2011 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Pat Finneran in Support of #85 Opposition filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 12/29/2011) Modified on 12/30/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2011 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Jesse A. Enriquez in Support #85 Opposition filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 12/29/2011) Modified on 12/30/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2011 Filing 86 DECLARATION of Michael G. Morgan in Opposition to #68 First MOTION to Certify Class [REDACTED] filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 29, 2011 Filing 85 RESPONSE (re #68 First MOTION to Certify Class ) in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 29, 2011 Filing 84 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Experian's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 83 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Memo ISO Class Certification) filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 82 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #78 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Exhs D and 7-11) by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2011 Filing 81 Declaration of Mark F Anderson Attaching Henke Depo Transcripts (redacted) & Paul Price depo Transcripts (Exhs D & E) in Support of #68 First MOTION to Certify Classfiled byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/14/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2011 Filing 80 First MOTION Unseal Pls' Memo ISO Class Certification re #68 First MOTION to Certify Class filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. Responses due by 12/19/2011. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 14, 2011 Filing 79 Declaration of Mark F Anderson Attaching Henke Depo Transcripts (redacted) and Paul Price Depo Transcripts (Exhs D & E) in Support of #68 First MOTION to Certify Class filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/14/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***NO ATTACHMENT, REFER TO DOCUMENT #81 ***
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS AMENDED #75 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 8, 2011 Filing 77 Proposed Order re #75 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (correcting errors) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 12/8/2011) Modified on 12/9/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2011 Filing 76 Declaration of Kathy Centanni in Support of #75 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (correcting errors) filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Related document(s) #75 ) (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 75 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (correcting errors) filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (ndr, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/15/2011 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 Filing 74 Declaration of R. Holman in Support of #68 First MOTION to Certify Class filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #73 , #69 , #72 , #68 , #71 , #70 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 Filing 73 Declaration of Paul Price filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 Filing 72 Declaration of Andrew J Ogilvie in Support of #68 First MOTION to Certify Class filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/2/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 Filing 71 Declaration of Antonia Blas-Sainz filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/2/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 Filing 70 Declaration of Mark F. Anderson in Support of #68 First MOTION to Certify Class filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2011 Filing 69 Declaration of Miguel Alvarez in Support of #68 First MOTION to Certify Class filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #68 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 68 First MOTION to Certify Class filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 12/29/2011. Replies due by 1/12/2012. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 67 Proposed Order re #65 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Transcripts & Documents, #66 Declaration in Support, by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 66 Declaration of Mark F. Anderson in Support of #65 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Transcripts & Documents filed byMiguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Related document(s) #65 ) (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 65 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Transcripts & Documents filed by Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting #63 Stipulation to Continue Deadline for ADR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 28, 2011 Filing 63 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Deadline for ADR by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 62 Joint Discovery Dispute Report #1 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez, Roane Holman. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 10/20/2011) Modified on 10/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2011 Filing 61 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Murawski, Mattia) (Filed on 10/19/2011) Modified on 10/20/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re #47 Motion Retain Confidentiality of Certain Documents. Parties are directed to comply with this court's Standing Order re Civil Discovery Disputes as to that dispute and all future discovery matters. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 59 First Amended Complaint; Jury Demand. by Roane Holman, Miguel A. Alvarez, Narcisco Navarro Hernandez. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order finding as moot #40 Motion for Leave to File entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting #56 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Motions due by 12/1/2011. Replies due by 1/12/2012. Responses due by 12/29/2011. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 56 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 10/4/2011) Modified on 10/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2011 Filing 55 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 54 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Morgan in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File His First Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 3, 2011 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the #48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal is referred to Judge Lloyd. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order granting #52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lloyd for Discovery purposes re #47 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality of Designated Documents Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 52 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to the Declaration of Michael Morgan in Support of Experian's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah G. Conway in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 51 RESPONSE (re #40 First MOTION for Leave to File to File First Amended Complaint ) filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. Morgan in Support of Experian's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File His First Amended Complaint)(Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 50 NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. of Manual Filing of Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Morgan ISO Experian's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #47 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality of Designated Documents Pursuant to #49 Notice. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. of Motion to Retain Confidentialilty of Designated Documents (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice #47 motion to retain confidentiality to an available hearing date. Hearing date of November 10, 2011 is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 28, 2011 Filing 48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits Attached to Centanni Decl. in Support of Motion to Retain Confidentiality filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Centanni in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) to Permit Experian to File Under Seal Exhibits, #3 Proposed Order Granting Experian's Administrative Motion toi File Under Seal)(Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 Filing 47 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality of Designated Documents filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/12/2011. Replies due by 10/19/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Morgan in Support of Motion to Retain Confidentiality, #2 Declaration of K. Centanni in Support of Motion to Retain Confidentiality, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Retain Confidentiality)(Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 Filing 46 NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. of Manual Filing of Exhibits to Decl. of K. Centanni in Support of Experian's Motion to Retain Confidentiality (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah G Conway (Conway, Sarah) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 19, 2011 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Pretrial Conference, previously set for Tuesday, September 11, 2012, is continued to Wednesday, September 12, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting #42 Stipulation for Dismissal of Def Finex Group LLC. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/16/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #40 First MOTION for Leave to File to File First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 9/29/2011. Replies due by 10/6/2011. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 43 Proposed Order re #42 Stipulation for Dismissal of Def Finex Group LLC by Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 42 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Def Finex Group LLC by Roane Holman, Finex Group LLC. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 9/15/2011) Modified on 9/16/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2011 Filing 41 Proposed Order re #40 First MOTION for Leave to File to File First Amended Complaint by Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 40 First MOTION for Leave to File to File First Amended Complaint filed by Roane Holman. (Anderson, Mark) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #38 Stipulation Continuing Deadline To File Motion To Retain Confidentiality of Designated Documents. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 38 STIPULATION And Proposed Order Continuing Deadline To File Motion To Retain Confidentiality of Designated Documents by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Roane Holman. (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2011) Modified on 9/13/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2011 Filing 37 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 26, 2011, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2011. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 25, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Tomio Buck Narita as counsel for Defendant Finex Group LLC (Narita, Tomio) (Filed on 6/25/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Charles A. Sundholm, Esq (Sundholm, Charles) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Murawski, Mattia) (Filed on 6/8/2011) Modified on 6/9/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2011 Filing 33 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/26/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 5/26/2011), Case referred to Private ADR. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Trial (10 day) set for 9/24/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/26/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.S #11 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 31 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Finex Group LLC. (Murawski, Mattia) (Filed on 5/19/2011) Modified on 5/20/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2011 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Murawski, Mattia) (Filed on 5/19/2011) Modified on 5/20/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/11/11. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 9, 2011 Filing 28 [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Finex Group LLC, Roane Holman. (Murawski, Mattia) (Filed on 5/9/2011) Modified on 5/10/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2011 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roane Holman re #25 Case Management Scheduling Order (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 26 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS. #11 Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/26/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 5/19/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/28/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RELATING CASE with member case C-03-5471-CW. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/26/2011. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 4/26/2011 with Robin W. Siefkin, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Pursuant to the Order Reassigning Case all hearings on motions and further deadlines terminated and must be renoticed in front of newly assigned Judge. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/25/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 21 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points of Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byExperian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 19, 2011 Filing 20 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 4/26/2011 at 2:00 p.m. pacific time. Please call 661-673-8600 and use access code 956682.(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re #15 , Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/13/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/15/2011 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 4/15/2011). (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 18 RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Dismiss , Notice of Joinder in Experian's FRCP 12b6 Motion to Dismiss, #11 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points of Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byRoane Holman. (Ogilvie, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 13, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding Pursuant to Local Rule 3-13 (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 16 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Finex Group LLC (Sundholm, Charles) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 13 Notice of Joinder in Experian's FRCP 12b6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Finex Group LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Sundholm, Charles) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 4/27/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2011 Filing 12 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options signed by client and counsel (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 11, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Points of Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 5/20/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2011 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byFinex Group LLC. (Sundholm, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters.. Signed by The Executive Committee on 02/01/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 31, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #7 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2011) Modified on 1/31/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2011 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re ) #1 ) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2011) Linkage added on 1/31/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2011 Filing 4 First Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Morgan, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2011) Modified on 1/31/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2011: #1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, #2 Standing Order for All San Jose Judges, #3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Finex Group LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2011 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint (Summons Issued);jury demand; against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Finex Group LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008906.). Filed byRoane Holman. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2011: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holman v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finex Group LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Sundholm, Esq.
Represented By: Tomio Buck Narita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah G Conway
Represented By: Haley Melisse Mcintosh
Represented By: Daniel John McLoon
Represented By: John Joseph Gehart, III
Represented By: Michael Gregory Morgan
Represented By: Jessica McGahie Sawyer
Represented By: Mattia Victor Murawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narcisco Navarro Hernandez
Represented By: Andrew J. Ogilvie
Represented By: Carol McLean Brewer
Represented By: Balam Osberto Letona
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Alvarez
Represented By: Andrew J. Ogilvie
Represented By: Carol McLean Brewer
Represented By: Balam Osberto Letona
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roane Holman
Represented By: Andrew J. Ogilvie
Represented By: Carol McLean Brewer
Represented By: Balam Osberto Letona
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?