Pryor v. City of Clearlake et al
Plaintiff: Sean Pryor
Defendant: City of Clearlake, Carl Miller, Alan Wade McClain, Craig Clausen and Michael Ray
Case Number: 4:2011cv00954
Filed: March 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/10/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 69 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/31/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 67 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; deferring ruling on 69 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenDENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS' 63 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on December 7, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation CONTINUING MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/27/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 4/16/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (10 day)set for 4/16/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/9/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pryor v. City of Clearlake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Pryor
Represented By: Brian David Sudano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clearlake
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Miller
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Wade McClain
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Clausen
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ray
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?