Perez et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank et al
Plaintiff: Amelia Perez and Constantino Perez, Jr.
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company and LaSalle Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2011cv03602
Filed: July 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on July 5, 2012. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS 5 , 25 MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 3/29/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/15/12. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER POSTPONING ADR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/23/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Represented By: LaShon Harris
Represented By: Sung-Min Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: LaShon Harris
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Bank, N.A.
Represented By: LaShon Harris
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Represented By: S. Christopher Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constantino Perez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?