Princeton Developments, LLC v. Baylor et al
Plaintiff: Princeton Developments, LLC
Defendant: GPH Holdings, LLC, Patrick Lewis, Brynee K Baylor, Baylior & Jackson, PLLC, The Milan Group, Inc and Frank Lorenzo
Case Number: 4:2011cv04471
Filed: September 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS ( 102 in case 4:11-cv-04471-CW and 89 in case 4:11-cv-04472-CW) MOTION TO ALLOW SERVICE BY PUBLICATION UPON DEFENDANT DAWN JACKSON,ADDRESSING DEFENDANT MIA BALDASSARIS FAILURE TO ANSWER IN 11-4471 AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING (53 in case 4:11-cv-04471-CW and 33 in case 4:11-cv-04472-CW ) MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS FRANK LORENZO PAVLICO III AND THE MILAN GROUP, INC. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER (1) DISMISSING DEFENDANT ABBAS 37 ; (2) GRANTING DEFENDANTS LORENZO AND THE MILAN GROUP'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT 28 ; AND (3) THAT THIS CASE BE REASSIGNED TO A DISTRICT JUDGE. The clerk shall promptly reassign this case to a district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/11/2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Princeton Developments, LLC v. Baylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPH Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brynee K Baylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylior & Jackson, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Milan Group, Inc
Represented By: Veronika Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Lorenzo
Represented By: Veronika Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princeton Developments, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Hassing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?