Hidalgo et al v. CL Medical Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Hidalgo and Fernando Hidalgo
Defendant: CL Medical Inc. and Uroplasty, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv05664
Filed: November 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/21/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Case Management Conference continued to 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/05/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REJECTING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 53 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Fernando Hidalgo. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/12/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 6/28/13 is continued to 9/6/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/21/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING 12 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Hon. Susan Illston granting 20 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Uroplasty, Inc. without prejudice.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012) Modified on 12/10/2012 (tlS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Judge Illston's Standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hidalgo et al v. CL Medical Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CL Medical Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Lynn Newton
Represented By: Lenell Topol McCallum
Represented By: Jennifer Hageman
Represented By: Paul Cosgrove
Represented By: Regan Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uroplasty, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas O. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Hidalgo
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: Amy Eskin
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Hidalgo
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: Amy Eskin
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?