Maclellan v. County of Alameda et al
Plaintiff: Doreen Maclellan
Defendant: County of Alameda, Dinis, Alvarez, Valley Care Medical Center and Alameda County Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2012cv05795
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTRAORDINARY RELIEF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF ALAMEDA, MARK DENIS, AND RAFAEL ALVAREZ. The Court hereby renders judgment in favor of defendants County of Alameda, Marc Dinis ("Deputy Dinis"), and Rafael Alvarez ("Deputy Alvarez&quo t;), and against plaintiff Doreen MacLellan, said plaintiff to take nothing against said defendants. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter this judgment as to the foregoing defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT VALLEYCARE'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES FOR DISCLOSURE OF EXPERTS AND FILING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT The motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT ValleyCare is ordered to immediately submit a chambers copy of its Motion to Supplement Expert Disclosure and to Extend the Date for Filing Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 23, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Defendant ValleyCare Health System substitutes Robert K. Lawrence, Elizabeth K. Ryan, and Robyn D. Roberts, of Bjork Lawrence, as counsel of record in place of Kevin M. Smith, of Bradley, Curley, Abel & Kowalski, P.C. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 11, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER EXTENDING EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 54 DEFENDANT ALAMEDA COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2014.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER VACATING JANUARY 31, 2014 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 28, 2014. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. All parties are directed to appear by telephone at the December 13, 2013 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maclellan v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Maclellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Gregory J. Rockwell
Represented By: Jill Sazama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinis
Represented By: Gregory J. Rockwell
Represented By: Jill Sazama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvarez
Represented By: Gregory J. Rockwell
Represented By: Jill Sazama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Care Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?