Bonner v. City & County of San Francisco et al

Defendant: San Francisco Municipal Transit Agency, City & County of San Francisco, Sarita Britt, R. Scott Jefferis and Mike Helms
Plaintiff: Harry Bonner
Case Number: 4:2013cv04007
Filed: August 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/10/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
March 21, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2014 at 5:00 p.m. March 25, 2015 case management conference is vacated. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/21/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
April 21, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 12 Order to Show Cause.Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2014. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/21/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner v. City & County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Municipal Transit Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarita Britt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Scott Jefferis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Bonner
Represented By: Russell Alan Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.