Kimmons v. Avilar et al
Plaintiff: Branlett Eugene Kimmons
Defendant: A. Avilar, Vera, R. Gomez, J. Merena, Gamboa, M. Spearman and W. Wilson
Case Number: 4:2014cv00954
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/30/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 112 Motion for Discovery; denying 113 Motion for Discovery. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/28/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/5/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 82 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 92 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/23/2017. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/26/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER, Motions terminated: 31 MOTION filed by Branlett Eugene Kimmons.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/12/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER STAYING CASE and REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Vadas for Settlement. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/23/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO FILE A RESPONSE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/9/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying 19 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 20 Stipulation for extension of time. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimmons v. Avilar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branlett Eugene Kimmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Avilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Merena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?