Adams v. City of Hayward et al
Plaintiff: Terri Adams
Defendant: City of Hayward, Gale Eakin and Nguyen
Case Number: 4:2014cv05482
Filed: December 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Order Continuing Hearing Date re 161 Motion for Attorney's Fees to 4/20/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Show Cause Response due by 3/17/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/10/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Following Pretrial Conference by Judge Kandis A. Westmore, granting in part and denying in part 121 Motion in Limine; granting 131 Motion in Limine. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Pretrial Conference Tentative Ruling. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/20/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Regarding Joint Pre-Trial Statement. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/10/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion for Summary Judgment. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:, PRETRIAL ORDER Jury Trial set for 2/6/2017 09:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2017 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 2/7/ 2017 09:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2017 09:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2017 09:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 2/10/2017 09:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/28/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/25/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/11/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER REGARDING 67 PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT; CONTINUING 11/17/15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statements due by 12/8/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2015 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/09/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 60 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 45 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. Parties to file required declaration within 7 days. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Conference continued to 7/28/2015 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 06/18/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING ENE re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jonathan Colton, Antwan Nguyen, City of Hayward, Tina Mills, Gale Eakin, Terri Adams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/30/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER Permitting Filing of First Amended Complaint 27 . Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/21/15. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Non-expert discovery due by 10/5/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2015 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmo re. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 12/10/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Jury Trial set for 12/11/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 03/20/15. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. City of Hayward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hayward
Represented By: Justin Christopher Nishioka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gale Eakin
Represented By: Justin Christopher Nishioka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nguyen
Represented By: Justin Christopher Nishioka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?