CTIA - The Wireless Association v. City of Berkeley et al

Plaintiff: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Defendant: City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel and Lester Lawrence Lessig, III
Case Number: 4:2015cv02529
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 83 for Leave for Out-of-Town Counsel to Appear Telephonically at May 12, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
January 27, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 59 Defendants' Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
December 14, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE AND CMC filed by City of Berkeley, Christine Daniel re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2016. Case Management Conference reset for 1/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing reset for 1/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
September 22, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Vacate October 1, 2015 Case Management Conference filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association (denied). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/22/15. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 21, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and Granting 36 NRDC's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
June 18, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Hearing Schedule filed by CTIA - The Wireless Association Motion Hearing reset for 8/20/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/18/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 15, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CTIA - The Wireless Association v. City of Berkeley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Represented By: Joshua David Dick
Represented By: Michael R. Huston
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Represented By: Theodore B Olson
Represented By: Jacob T Spencer
Represented By: Helgi C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berkeley
Represented By: Zachary Cowan
Represented By: Lester Lawrence Lessig, III
Represented By: Amanda Shanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Daniel
Represented By: Zachary Cowan
Represented By: Lester Lawrence Lessig, III
Represented By: Amanda Shanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Lawrence Lessig, III
Represented By: Lester Lawrence Lessig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?