Heyward v. Hayward Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Marco B. Heyward
Defendant: Hayward Police Department, Wright and McCrea
Case Number: 4:2015cv04802
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE, AND APPOINTING COUNSEL/GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DEPOSITION OF M.H. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
December 9, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order Granting in part, denying in part, discovery issues re: Joint Letter Brief 52 . Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/9/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016) Modified on 12/9/2016 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 45 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
February 5, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Relating Case 15-4802 DMR to Case No. 15-4799 JCS. Case No. 15-4802 DMR shall be reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 5, 2016. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heyward v. Hayward Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco B. Heyward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayward Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?