The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System v. Loughlin et al
Plaintiff: Cook, Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit, Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago and Amy Cook
Defendant: Loughlin, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, John R. Shrewsberry, Michael J. Loughlin, Susan E. Engel, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., Lloyd H. Dean, Cynthia H. Milligan, Elaine L. Chao, Wells Fargo & Company, John S. Chen, John D. Baker, II, Susan G. Swenson, John G. Stumpf, Elizabeth A. Duke, James H. Quigley, Carrie Tolstedt, Donald M. James, Stephen W. Sanger, Federico F. Pena, Judith M. Runstad and Timothy J. Sloan
Petitioner: The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System
Case Number: 4:2016cv05592
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 No Further Filings in this case. All filings should be filed in 16-cv-5541 JST. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
August 21, 2019 Filing 55 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
January 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDERPursuant to the notice of settlement filed January 16, 2019 in Case No. 16-cv-5541, ECF No. 266, the case management conference scheduled for January 23, 2019 is hereby VACATED. At the parties' request, the Court now SETS the following deadlines: Motion for preliminary approval of settlement agreement due February 14, 2019; opposition to preliminary approval due February 28, 2019; reply in support of preliminary approval due March 7, 2019; preliminary approval hearing March 21, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. All other case deadlines are hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(Tigar, Jon) (Filed on 1/21/2019)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DIRECTING THE FILING OF A MOTION TO RELATE CASES by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re #50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff The Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), filed by Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), filed by Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 4, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff The Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) by Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Lebovitch in Support of Request for Order Approving Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, #2 Proposed Order)(Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
May 3, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) by Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Lebovitch in Support of Request for Order Approving Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, #2 Proposed Order)(Nicholas, Blair) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order Granting Plaintiff Amy Cook's Request for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amy Cook. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
January 31, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Amy Cook (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis A. Bottini, Jr., #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 1/31/2017) Modified on 1/31/2017 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2017 Filing 46 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 12, 2017, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (71 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) Transcript Order, (75 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) Transcript Order - CJA, (76 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2017. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 14, 2017 Filing 45 *** FILED IN ERROR,REFER TO DOCUMENT #46 *** THIS DOCUMENT REPLACES DOCUMENT NO. 73, ERRONEOUSLY FILED AS "SEALED." Transcript of Proceedings held on January 12, 2017, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (71 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2017. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/14/2017) Modified on 1/19/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2017 Filing 44 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #45 . *** Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on January 12, 2017, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (71 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2017. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/14/2017) Modified on 1/18/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part (34) Motion to (1) Consolidate Related Actions; (2) Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs; and (3) Appoint Co-Lead Counsel; granting (41) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 3:16-cv-05541-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 1/12/2017 re (11 in 3:16-cv-05915-JST, 11 in 3:16-cv-05915-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (40 in 3:16-cv-05592-JST, 40 in 3:16-cv-05592-JST) MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit, Amy Cook, (35 in 3:16-cv-05592-JST, 35 in 3:16-cv-05592-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (9 in 3:16-cv-06262-JST, 9 in 3:16-cv-06262-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (36 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST, 36 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by George Hannon, Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit, Amy Cook, (34 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) Joint MOTION to (1) Consolidate Related Actions; (2) Appoint Co-Lead Plaintiffs; and (3) Appoint Co-Lead Counsel filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado, (10 in 3:16-cv-05817-JST, 10 in 3:16-cv-05817-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (41 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit, Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago, (27 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST, 27 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) Proposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases Proposed MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (30 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado, (13 in 3:16-cv-05745-JST, 13 in 3:16-cv-05745-JST) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Alison Sherman. Total Time in Court: 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2017)
December 12, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #40 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Responses due by 12/15/2016. Replies due by 1/5/2017. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (38 in 3:16-cv-05592-JST) re STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (15 in 3:16-cv-06262-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (6 in 3:16-cv-06624-MEJ) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (16 in 3:16-cv-05745-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by Alison Sherman, (35 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (13 in 3:16-cv-05817-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (9 in 3:16-cv-06631-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, (14 in 3:16-cv-05915-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to (1) Consolidate Related Derivative Actions, (2) Appoint The Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit and George Hannon as Lead Plaintiffs, and (3) Appoint Bottini & Bottini, Inc. and Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP as Co-Lead Derivative Counsel for Plaintiffs; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Amy Cook, Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/7/2016. Replies due by 12/14/2016. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Francis A. Bottini, Jr. with Exhibits A - E, #(2) Declaration of Mark Lebovitch with Exhibit A, #(3) [Proposed] Order)(Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 39 Amended Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Abuse of COntrol, Unjust Enrichment, Declaratory Relief, Violations of the California Corporations Code, and Violations of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filed by Amy Cook, Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Consolidating Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 21, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CONSOLIDATING HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE AND COMPETING MOTIONS TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 36 Declaration of Shane P. Sanders in Support of re #35 Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Co-Lead Counsel filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to (1) Consolidate Related Shareholder Derivative Actions; (2) Appoint The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System as Lead Plaintiff, and (3) Appoint Robbins Arroyo LLP and Saxena White P.A. as Co-Lead Counsel filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/21/2016. Replies due by 11/28/2016. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Sanders, Shane) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Michael J. Loughlin waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Timothy J. Sloan waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by John G. Stumpf waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Carrie Tolstedt waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by John R. Shrewsberry waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by John D. Baker, II waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Elaine L. Chao waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by John S. Chen waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Lloyd H. Dean waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Elizabeth A. Duke waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Susan E. Engel waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Enrique Hernandez, Jr. waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Donald M. James waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Cynthia H. Milligan waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Federico F. Pena waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by James H. Quigley waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Stephen W. Sanger waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Susan G. Swenson waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Suzanne M. Vautrinot waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Judith M. Runstad waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amy Cook. Service waived by Wells Fargo & Company waiver sent on 10/13/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 12 Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2016: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (haS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 5, 2016 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 a.m. or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/5/16. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Amy Cook. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John D. Baker, II, Elaine L. Chao, John S. Chen, Lloyd H. Dean, Elizabeth A. Duke, Susan E. Engel, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., Donald M. James, Michael J. Loughlin, Cynthia H. Milligan, Federico F. Pena, James H. Quigley, Judith M. Runstad, Stephen W. Sanger, John R. Shrewsberry, Timothy J. Sloan, John G. Stumpf, Susan G. Swenson, Carrie Tolstedt, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, Wells Fargo & Company. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/17/2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2016. Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2016 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Amy Cook (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 1 Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Abuse of Control, Unjust Enrichment, Declaratory Relief, Violations of the California Corporations Code, and Violations of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-10816546). Filed by Amy Cook. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 9/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System v. Loughlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police & Fire Retirement System City of Detroit
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Cook
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini, Jr.
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Represented By: Yury A. Kolesnikov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne M. Vautrinot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Shrewsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan E. Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Hernandez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd H. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia H. Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine L. Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Baker, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan G. Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Stumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Tolstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Sanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federico F. Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith M. Runstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System
Represented By: Shane Palmesano Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?