Quillinan v. Ainsworth et al
Plaintiff: Quillinan and Kevin Daniel Quillinan
Defendant: Ainsworth, Wes-Co Industries, Z-Square Properties Company, Bay PropertyGroup, Paul Henderson, GTI Mundelein Partners, LLC, Beehive Distributor, Michael Kanovitz, Legal One Realty, Indus Holding Company, Abigail Bornstein, 710 Combinator Co., Grupo Flor Dispensaries, LLC, Gospa Lucik, Z-Square, Grupo Flor Operations, LLC, GTI Mundelein, LLC, Ashley Peterson, Jessie Street Collective, LLC, Corina Aguilar, Manuel Perez, Gavin Kogan, GTI Investors, LLC, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, Daniel Bornstein, Cypress Manufacturing Co., SRG Manager LLC, Mike Williams, Dennis Thompson, TD Service Company of Arizona, Benjamin Kovler, GTI Rock Island Partners, LLC, Wes-Co Inc., Martin Schneider, Grupo Flor, LLC, Big Shoulders West, Joel Feldman, Keypoint Credit Union, Oakland Manger LLC, Matt Estep, SRG Enzo I LLC, Third Coast Inc., Bruce Goldstone, Terah Olson, Dianne Murphy, Zivorad Zivanovic, Hayden Manager LLC, The Clinic Mundelein, SRG Enzo II LLC, Ari Levy, Jon Loevy, GTI-Clinic Illinois Holdings, LLC, GTI Rock Island, LLC, Russell Ainsworth, Grupo Flor Cultivations, LLC, Top Shelf Medicinals, Oakland 1852, GTI II LLC, Richard Silverstein, Jeffery Gilles, Grupo Flor Corporation, Beehive Distribution, Inc., Grupo Flor Corp., Green Thumb Industries, Daniel Fineman, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Tidewater Transporter Inc., Nancy Snider, Tyler Forman, Daniel Cheung, Joseph Janssen, Robert Weakley, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Effingham Medicinal Farms LLC, Evan Zane, Three Nymphs Sunshine Produce, Ervin Yocum, Diversified Storage Solutions, Deidra Mae Harper, EMF West Inc., Andrew Thayer and Mark Ainsworth
Case Number: 4:2017cv00077
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 119 MANDATE of USCA as to #112 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Oakland Manger LLC, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Daniel Bornstein, SRG Manager LLC, Daniel Cheung, Hayden Manager LLC, Zivorad Zivanovic, Bruce Goldstone, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Richard Silverstein, Michael Kanovitz, Andrew Thayer, Russell Ainsworth, Ashley Peterson, Joel Feldman, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, Daniel Fineman, Jon Loevy (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 118 USCA Memorandum as to #112 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Oakland Manger LLC, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Daniel Bornstein, SRG Manager LLC, Daniel Cheung, Hayden Manager LLC, Zivorad Zivanovic, Bruce Goldstone, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Richard Silverstein, Michael Kanovitz, Andrew Thayer, Russell Ainsworth, Ashley Peterson, Joel Feldman, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, Daniel Fineman, Jon Loevy (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER of USCA as to #114 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying #108 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, and certifying that any IFP appeal from the Courts May 10, 2018 order of dismissal would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3). (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 115 USCA Case Number 18-16197 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #114 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court). (Attachments: #1 Order dismissing case with Prejudice)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 22, 2018 Filing 113 USCA Case Number 18-16163 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #112 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Oakland Manger LLC, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Daniel Bornstein, SRG Manager LLC, Daniel Cheung, Hayden Manager LLC, Zivorad Zivanovic, Bruce Goldstone, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Richard Silverstein, Michael Kanovitz, Andrew Thayer, Russell Ainsworth, Ashley Peterson, Joel Feldman, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, Daniel Fineman, Jon Loevy. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
June 22, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Oakland Manger LLC, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. Appeal of Order on Motion for Sanctions, #101 (Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 0971-12457062.) (Corrected) (Attachments: #1 Supplement (Representation Statement))(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
June 22, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Oakland Manger LLC, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. Appeal of Order on Motion for Sanctions, #101 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12457062 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement (Representation Statement))(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
June 14, 2018 Filing 110 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #108 First MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis ) filed byRussell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying #104 Motion for New Trial, or in the alternative, a motion for reconsideration. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 108 First MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Re-Submittal Under Proper Heading)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety Re: #107 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan Cor rect event is found under Civil Events > Other Filings > Appeal Documents > Notice of Appeal (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety in one PDF Re: #106 Financial Affidavit filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings > Motions - General > Appeal In Forma Pauperis. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 8, 2018 Filing 107 First NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Appeal Record due by 7/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendant list with rep/counsel, #2 Supplement Order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss w/Prejudice, #3 Supplement Judgment of Dismissal)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 8, 2018 Filing 106 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit to proceed informa pauperis, #2 Affidavit to proceed informa pauperis, #3 Affidavit to proceed informa pauperis)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 105 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #104 First MOTION for New Trial ) filed byRussell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 2, 2018 Filing 104 First MOTION for New Trial filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Chambers before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 6/18/2018. Replies due by 6/25/2018. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 6/2/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 103 JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/11/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting Defendants' #35 , #43 Motions to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/10/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Defendants' #90 Second Motion for Sanctions and Request to Declare Plaintiff Vexatious. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2018: #1 Exhibit 10/5/17 Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Sanctions) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER REASSIGNING ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/25/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DISMISSING UNSERVED DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(M). Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/24/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 98 REPLY (re #90 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byRussell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AS TO UNSERVED DEFENDANTS. Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2018. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/16/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 96 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #90 MOTION for Sanctions ) Corrected Opposition to Motion for Sanctions filed byKevin Daniel Quillinan. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 95 Proposed Order re #93 Opposition/Response to Motion by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Daniel Quillinan re #91 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Email Service on Lead Counsel (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Order. Please re-file the proposed order in its entirety and link it back to opposition. Re: #93 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 10, 2018 Filing 93 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #90 MOTION for Sanctions ) Plaintiff's Proposed Order on Opposition to Motion for Sanctions filed byKevin Daniel Quillinan. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 10, 2018 Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #90 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byKevin Daniel Quillinan. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2018. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2018 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/9/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2018 01:00 PM before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 4/11/2018. Replies due by 4/18/2018. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Kevin Quillinan in Opposition to #86 Report and Recommendations,, Order Reassigning Case, OBJECTION filed byKevin Daniel Quillinan. (Related document(s) #86 ) (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 88 MANDATE of USCA as to #79 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/15/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to grant with prejudice Defendants' #35 , #43 Motions to Dismiss. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to a district judge. Objections to the report and recommendation due by 3/28/2018. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/14/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER of USCA, Vacated and Remanded, as to #79 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan, #82 Notice of Appeal filed by Oakland Manger LLC, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Daniel Bornstein, SRG Manager LLC, Daniel Cheung, Hayden Manager LLC, Zivorad Zivanovic, Bruce Goldstone, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Richard Silverstein, Michael Kanovitz, Andrew Thayer, Russell Ainsworth, Ashley Peterson, Joel Feldman, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, Daniel Fineman, Jon Loevy. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
November 27, 2017 Filing 83 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis #78 , is terminated as moot as the IFP application needs to be filed with the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 24, 2017 Filing 84 USCA Case Number 17-17375 NInth Circuit Court of Appeals for #82 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Oakland Manger LLC, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Daniel Bornstein, SRG Manager LLC, Daniel Cheung, Hayden Manager LLC, Zivorad Zivanovic, Bruce Goldstone, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Richard Silverstein, Michael Kanovitz, Andrew Thayer, Russell Ainsworth, Ashley Peterson, Joel Feldman, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, Daniel Fineman, Jon Loevy. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 15, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Oakland Manger LLC, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11881091 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 7, 2017 Filing 81 USCA Case Number 17-17276 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Filing 80 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #78 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis ) filed byRussell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Appeal of Judgment, Terminated Case #77 (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court). (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017) Modified on 11/6/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2017 Filing 77 JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/5/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Defendants' #50 Motion for Sanctions. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting with prejudice Defendants' #35 , #43 Motions to Dismiss. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER VACATING 9/21/2017 hearings on Defendants' #35 , #43 MOTIONS to Dismiss and #50 MOTION for Sanctions. Upon review of the moving papers, the Court finds that these matters are suitable for resolution without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), and will decide the motions on the papers. There will be no hearing on these matters. (This is a text-only docket entry. There is no corresponding document.) Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/20/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 73 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Motion for Sanctions #50 , set for September 21, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., is continued to September 21, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., when Magistrate Judge Westmore holds her motion calendar, in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #44 Motion to Join. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Plaintiff's #55 Administrative Motion requesting an extension of time to file a declaration in support of his opposition to the motions to dismiss. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying as moot Plaintiff's #46 Administrative Motion RELIEF FROM AUGUST 7 DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. The motion for sanctions was not properly filed prior to the filing of the administrative motion, so there was no relief available. (This is a text only docket entry. There is no corresponding document.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Mike Kanovitz. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Frank Newell. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Jon Loevy. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 66 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Mike Kanovitz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11715145.) filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Attachments: #1 List of Parties to be Represented, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kanovitz, Mike) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Frank Newell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11713586.) filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Attachments: #1 List of Parties to be Represented, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Newell, Frank) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 64 ERRATA re #63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jon Loevy ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11713011.) (Signed Version) by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Loevy, Jon) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jon Loevy ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11713011.) filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Attachments: #1 List of Parties Represented, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Loevy, Jon) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Defendants' #61 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the 9/21/17 motion hearing. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 6, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 60 REPLY (re #50 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 ) filed byRussell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 28, 2017 Filing 59 REPLY (re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byDaniel Cheung, Daniel Fineman, Gospa Lucik, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 26, 2017 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Daniel Quillinan CORRECTED, AFFIDAVIT of Service for First Amended Complaint served on DANIEL CHEUNG on July 6, 2017, filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/26/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 57 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #50 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 ) filed byKevin Daniel Quillinan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant and for Sanctions)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 56 Letter from Plaintiff Quillinan to Appearing Defendants' Counsel of Record REQUEST Defendants FILE Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.Rule Civ. Pro. Rule 7.1.. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 55 Third ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extension of time to file and append declaration to consolidated opp to motion to dismiss filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Responses due by 8/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Letter opposing counsel requesting extension of time to file and append declaration to Pltf. consolidated Opposition to Def. MTD)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 22, 2017 Filing 54 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #44 MOTION to Join and Adopt Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support , #35 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Declaration in support of opp to # 43 to follow filed byKevin Daniel Quillinan. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 15, 2017 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for August 29, 2017, is continued to November 14, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by November 7, 2017. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY (re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byRussell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 51 Proposed Order re #50 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer, Zivorad Zivanovic. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 8/24/2017. Replies due by 8/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 49 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Cheung, Daniel Fineman, Gospa Lucik, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Zivorad Zivanovic.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 48 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing- Notice is hereby given that the Motion to Dismiss #35 , previously set for August 31, 2017, is continued to September 21, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., to be heard along with the Motion to Dismiss #43 , in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612, before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore.. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants, with regard to Motion to Dismiss #43 , shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2017. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 8, 2017 Filing 46 Second ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Request Clarification of motion pleading and extension of time to respond filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Responses due by 8/14/2017. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 45 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Response to Vexatious Motion by midnight tonight filed byKevin Daniel Quillinan. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION to Join and Adopt Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Joel Feldman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Dianne Murphy, Oakland Manger LLC, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 8/21/2017. Replies due by 8/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Daniel Cheung, Daniel Fineman, Gospa Lucik, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Zivorad Zivanovic. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 8/21/2017. Replies due by 8/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Howard Feldman on behalf of Defendants Daniel Fineman, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Zivorad Zivanovic, Gospa Lukic, Daniel Cheung (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #40 Administrative Motion seeking an extension of time to file an opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's Opposition is due by 8/7/2017. Defendants' Reply is due by 8/14/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017)
July 26, 2017 Filing 40 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extension of Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Responses due by 7/24/2017. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 25, 2017 Filing 39 Plaintiff's Corrected PROOF OF SERVICE Pursuant to CCP 215.20(a) on Defendant Robert Weakley by Kevin Daniel Quillinan re #3 Summons Issued, #10 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination, #8 Amended Complaint, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 17, 2017 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Daniel Quillinan re #12 Certificate of Service For Robert Weakley; Jefferey Gilles esq. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
July 12, 2017 Filing 37 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Joel Feldman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Defendants Represented by Joel Feldman)(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
July 11, 2017 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. As the Local Rules were not followed with the filing of this motion, notice is hereby given that the Motion to Dismiss, previously set for July 20, 2017, is continued to August 31, 2017, at 11:00 a.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 10, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Russell Ainsworth, Daniel Bornstein, Joel Feldman, Bruce Goldstone, Hayden Manager LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Jon Loevy, Dianne Murphy, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Andrew Thayer. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 7/24/2017. Replies due by 7/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 10, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Howard Feldman for Defendants Andrew Thayer, Daniel Bornstein, Dianne Murphy, and SRG 414 Lessor LLC. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 3, 2017 Filing 33 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gavin Kogan.. (Kogan, Gavin) (Filed on 7/3/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 7/13/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/13/2017. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for August 22, 2017, is continued to August 29, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by August 22, 2017. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #29 Administrative Motion to extend time to serve the first amended complaint on all defendants. Plaintiff shall have until 7/10/2017 to serve all defendants. (This is a text only docket entry. There is no corresponding document.)(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 29 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Extension of Time to Serve Remaining Defendants filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Responses due by 6/19/2017. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 28 RESPONSE to re #19 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Reply by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 9, 2017 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Keypoint Credit Union identifying Corporate Parent Keypoint Credit Union for Keypoint Credit Union. (Smith, Kara) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Keypoint Credit Union.. (Smith, Kara) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 25 Defendant KeyPoint Credit Union ANSWER to Amended Complaint byKeypoint Credit Union. (Smith, Kara) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Gospa Lukic and Dianne Murphy by Kevin Daniel Quillinan re #8 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 23 RESPONSE to re #19 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; terminating #17 Administrative Motion (Opposition/Response to #16 Motion for Extension of Time). (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 21 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Answer (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 20 First MOTION strike defendant's answer to plaintiff's FAC, ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION strike defendant's answer filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 6/15/2017. Replies due by 6/22/2017. Responses due by 6/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to defendant Gavin Kogan re Motion to Strike Answer)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 24, 2017 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs byGavin Kogan. (Kogan, Gavin) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 16, 2017 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pltf.'s Notice of Suit and Request to Waive Service of Summons to Appearing and Moving Defendants)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 5/16/2017) Modified on 5/17/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Please use Opposition/Response to Motion. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Deny Defs Motion for Extension of time to Answer or plead otherwise re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 15, 2017 Filing 17 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Deny Defs Motion for Extension of time to Answer or plead otherwise re #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. Responses due by 5/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notices to Defs of Suit & Request to Waive Service of Summons)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 11, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint filed by Russell Ainsworth, Jon Loevy, Michael Kanovitz, Ashley Peterson, Richard Silverstein, Bruce Goldstone, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, SRG Manager LLC, and Hayden Manager LLC. (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2017) Modified on 5/12/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Howard Feldman (Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Joel Feldman. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 10, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Joel Feldman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11383242.) filed by Joel Feldman. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Good Standing)(Feldman, Joel) (Filed on 5/10/2017) Modified on 5/11/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2017 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Daniel Quillinan (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
April 20, 2017 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Daniel Quillinan.. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
April 7, 2017 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/21/2017. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. #8 First Amended Complaint is considered filed. Plaintiff has until June 19, 2017 to serve the first amended complaint on all defendants. ORDER continuing Initial Case Management Conference to 8/22/2017 01:30 PM. Separate Case Management Statements due by 8/15/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/6/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT 710 Combinator Co., Mark Ainsworth, Russel Ainsworth, Bay Property Group, Beehive Distribution, Inc., Beehive Distributor, Big Shoulders West, Abigail Bornstein, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Cypress Manufacturing Co., Diversified Storage Solutions, EMF West Inc., Effingham Medicinal Farms LLC. Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Tyler Forman, Jeffery Gilles, Bruce Goldstone, Deidra Mae Harper, Hayden Manager LLC., Paul Henderson, Indus Holding Company, Joseph Janssen, Jessie Street Collective, LLC., Michael Kanovitz, Keypoint Credit Union, Gavin Kogan, Legal One Realty, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Oakland 1852, Oakland Manager LLC., Terah Olson, Manuel Perez, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lesser LLC., SRG Enzo I LLC.,, SRG Enzo II LLC., SRG Manager LLC., Martin Schneider, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC., Nancy Snider, TD Service Company of Arizona, Andrew Thayer, Third Coast Inc., Dennis Thompson, Mike Williams, Corina Aguilar, Three Nymphs, Sunshine Produce, Tidewater Transporter Inc., Top Shelf Medicinals, Robert Weakley, WES-CO Industries, Ervin Yokum, Evan Zane, Zivorad Zivanovic, Grupo Flor Corporation, Grupo Flor, LLC., Grupo Flor Cultivations, LLC., Grupo Flor Dispensaries, LLC., Grupo Flor Operations, LLC., against 710 Combinator Co., Mark Ainsworth, Russell Ainsworth, Bay PropertyGroup, Beehive Distribution, Inc., Beehive Distributor, Big Shoulders West, Abigail Bornstein, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Cypress Manufacturing Co., Diversified Storage Solutions, EMF West Inc., Effingham Medicinal Farms LLC, Matt Estep, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Tyler Forman, GTI II LLC, GTI Investors, LLC, GTI Mundelein Partners, LLC, GTI Mundelein, LLC, GTI Rock Island Partners, LLC, GTI Rock Island, LLC, GTI-Clinic Illinois Holdings, LLC, Jeffery Gilles, Bruce Goldstone, Green Thumb Industries, Grupo Flor Corp., Deidra Mae Harper, Hayden Manager LLC, Paul Henderson, Indus Holding Company, Joseph Janssen, Jessie Street Collective, LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Keypoint Credit Union, Gavin Kogan, Benjamin Kovler, Legal One Realty, Ari Levy, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Oakland 1852, Oakland Manger LLC, Terah Olson, Manuel Perez, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Enzo I LLC, SRG Enzo II LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Martin Schneider, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Nancy Snider, TD Service Company of Arizona, Andrew Thayer, The Clinic Mundelein, Third Coast Inc., Dennis Thompson, Three Nymphs Sunshine Produce, Tidewater Transporter Inc., Top Shelf Medicinals, Robert Weakley, Wes-Co Inc., Mike Williams, Ervin Yocum, Z-Square, Z-Square Properties Company, Zivorad Zivanovic. Filed byKevin Daniel Quillinan. (Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 7 Motion for Permission to file an AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Kevin Daniel Quillinan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Ex Parte Motion to Amend Complaint and to Dismiss certain defendants, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Quillinan, Kevin) (Filed on 3/16/2017) Modified on 3/21/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #2 Motion permission to e-file. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
January 9, 2017 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 710 Combinator Co., Mark Ainsworth, Russell Ainsworth, Bay PropertyGroup, Beehive Distribution, Inc., Beehive Distributor, Big Shoulders West, Abigail Bornstein, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Cypress Manufacturing Co., Diversified Storage Solutions, EMF West Inc., Effingham Medicinal Farms LLC, Matt Estep, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Tyler Forman, GTI II LLC, GTI Investors, LLC, GTI Mundelein Partners, LLC, GTI Mundelein, LLC, GTI Rock Island Partners, LLC, GTI Rock Island, LLC, GTI-Clinic Illinois Holdings, LLC, Jeffery Gilles, Bruce Goldstone, Green Thumb Industries, Grupo Flor Corp., Deidra Mae Harper, Hayden Manager LLC, Paul Henderson, Indus Holding Company, Joseph Janssen, Jessie Street Collective, LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Keypoint Credit Union, Gavin Kogan, Benjamin Kovler, Legal One Realty, Ari Levy, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Oakland 1852, Oakland Manger LLC, Terah Olson, Manuel Perez, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Enzo I LLC, SRG Enzo II LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Martin Schneider, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Nancy Snider, TD Service Company of Arizona, Andrew Thayer, The Clinic Mundelein, Third Coast Inc., Dennis Thompson, Three Nymphs Sunshine Produce, Tidewater Transporter Inc., Top Shelf Medicinals, Robert Weakley, Wes-Co Inc., Mike Williams, Ervin Yocum, Z-Square, Z-Square Properties Company, Zivorad Zivanovic. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Kevin Quillinan. Responses due by 1/20/2017. Replies due by 1/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017) Modified on 1/10/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against 710 Combinator Co., Mark Ainsworth, Russell Ainsworth, Bay PropertyGroup, Beehive Distribution, Inc., Beehive Distributor, Big Shoulders West, Abigail Bornstein, Daniel Bornstein, Daniel Cheung, Cypress Manufacturing Co., Diversified Storage Solutions, EMF West Inc., Effingham Medicinal Farms LLC, Matt Estep, Joel Feldman, Daniel Fineman, Tyler Forman, GTI II LLC, GTI Investors, LLC, GTI Mundelein Partners, LLC, GTI Mundelein, LLC, GTI Rock Island Partners, LLC, GTI Rock Island, LLC, GTI-Clinic Illinois Holdings, LLC, Jeffery Gilles, Bruce Goldstone, Green Thumb Industries, Grupo Flor Corp., Deidra Mae Harper, Hayden Manager LLC, Paul Henderson, Indus Holding Company, Joseph Janssen, Jessie Street Collective, LLC, Michael Kanovitz, Keypoint Credit Union, Gavin Kogan, Benjamin Kovler, Legal One Realty, Ari Levy, Jon Loevy, Gospa Lucik, Dianne Murphy, Oakland 1852, Oakland Manger LLC, Terah Olson, Manuel Perez, Ashley Peterson, SRG 414 Lessor LLC, SRG Enzo I LLC, SRG Enzo II LLC, SRG Manager LLC, Martin Schneider, Dimitry Shkolnikov, Richard Silverstein, Silverstein Realty Group LLC, Nancy Snider, TD Service Company of Arizona, Andrew Thayer, The Clinic Mundelein, Third Coast Inc., Dennis Thompson, Three Nymphs Sunshine Produce, Tidewater Transporter Inc., Top Shelf Medicinals, Robert Weakley, Wes-Co Inc., Mike Williams, Ervin Yocum, Z-Square, Z-Square Properties Company, Zivorad Zivanovic. Receipt No. 44611013939, $400.00. Filed by Kevin Quillinan. Consent/Declination due by 1/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017) Modified on 1/9/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quillinan v. Ainsworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes-Co Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Square Properties Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay PropertyGroup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTI Mundelein Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beehive Distributor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kanovitz
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal One Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indus Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abigail Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 710 Combinator Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Flor Dispensaries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gospa Lucik
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Square
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Flor Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTI Mundelein, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Peterson
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Street Collective, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corina Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Kogan
Represented By: Gavin E Kogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTI Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG 414 Lessor LLC
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bornstein
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypress Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG Manager LLC
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Service Company of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Kovler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTI Rock Island Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes-Co Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Flor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Shoulders West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Feldman
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keypoint Credit Union
Represented By: Kara Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Manger LLC
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Estep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG Enzo I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Coast Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Goldstone
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terah Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianne Murphy
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zivorad Zivanovic
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayden Manager LLC
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clinic Mundelein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRG Enzo II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTI-Clinic Illinois Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTI Rock Island, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Ainsworth
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Flor Cultivations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Shelf Medicinals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland 1852
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTI II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Gilles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Flor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beehive Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grupo Flor Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Thumb Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Fineman
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitry Shkolnikov
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidewater Transporter Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Cheung
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Janssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Weakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverstein Realty Group LLC
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Effingham Medicinal Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Zane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Nymphs Sunshine Produce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ervin Yocum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Storage Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deidra Mae Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMF West Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Thayer
Represented By: Frank Newell
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Joel Howard Feldman
Represented By: Jon Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quillinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Daniel Quillinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?