Guo v. Woodman et al
Plaintiff: Wenduo Guo
Defendant: Kenneth Goldman, Brian McGee, Peter Gotcher, Michael Marks, Alexander Lurie, Susan Lyne, Anthony Bates, Lauren Zalaznick, Edward Gilhuly, Nicholas Woodman, GoPro, Inc. and Rick Welts
Consolidated Plaintiff: Mario Romero
Case Number: 4:2018cv00920
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 REMINDER: Counsel must update personal profile for new address to be in effect Re: #29 Notice of Change of Address filed by Wenduo Guo (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
December 19, 2018 REMINDER: Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials CW immediately after the case number instead of MEJ Re: #29 Notice of Change of Address filed by Wenduo Guo (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ashley Rawlins Rifkin (Rifkin, Ashley) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order filed by Anthony Bates, Edward Gilhuly, GoPro, Inc., Kenneth Goldman, Peter Gotcher, Alexander Lurie, Susan Lyne, Michael Marks, Brian McGee, Rick Welts, Nicholas Woodman, Lauren Zalaznick, Mario Romero, Wenduo Guo. (Bafus, Marie) (Filed on 6/4/2018) Modified on 6/5/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2018 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Anthony Bates, Edward Gilhuly, Kenneth Goldman, Peter Gotcher, Alexander Lurie, Susan Lyne, Michael Marks, Brian McGee, Rick Welts, Nicholas Woodman, Lauren Zalaznick (Bafus, Marie) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Caroline Bafus , Susan S. Muck, Catherine D. Kevane and Vincent Barredo (Bafus, Marie) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #23 Stipulation Staying Case.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Action filed by Wenduo Guo, Nicholas Woodman, et al. (Rifkin, Ashley) (Filed on 5/7/2018) Modified on 5/7/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #21 Stipulation to Consolidate Derivative Actions and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs. (CONSOLIDATING CASES 4:18-cv-00920-CW AND 4:18-cv-01284-CW) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018) Modified on 4/10/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Derivative Actions and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs filed by Wenduo Guo, Nicholas Woodman, et al. (Rifkin, Ashley) (Filed on 4/5/2018) Modified on 4/6/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2018 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/15/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ELIGIBILITY FOR VIDEO RECORDING. Case reassigned to Judge Judge Claudia Wilken. Judge Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018) Modified on 3/16/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that cases 18-cv-920 SBA and 18-cv-1284 SK are related to case 16-cv-6654 CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/15/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2018. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2018 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/28/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/28/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 27, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 26, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wenduo Guo.. (Rifkin, Ashley) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Wenduo Guo. Service waived by All Defendants. (Rifkin, Ashley) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting #7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 11 Declaration of Marie C. Bafus in Support of #7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Complaint filed byGoPro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Version of Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - [Prop.] Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Portions of Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint Under Seal)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Bafus, Marie) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by GoPro, Inc. (Bafus, Marie) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Caroline Bafus , Susan S. Muck, Catherine D. Kevane and Vincent Barredo for Nominal Defendant GoPro, Inc. (Bafus, Marie) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 15, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wenduo Guo re #7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Complaint (Rifkin, Ashley) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 7 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Complaint filed by Wenduo Guo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Redacted Version of Portions of Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Unredacted Version of Portions of Complaint, #5 Proposed Order)(Rifkin, Ashley) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Anthony Bates, Edward Gilhuly, GoPro, Inc., Kenneth Goldman, Peter Gotcher, Alexander Lurie, Susan Lyne, Michael Marks, Brian McGee, Rick Welts, Nicholas Woodman, Lauren Zalaznick. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018) Modified on 2/14/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wenduo Guo (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Redacted Version) against Anthony Bates, Edward Gilhuly, GoPro, Inc., Kenneth Goldman, Peter Gotcher, Alexander Lurie, Susan Lyne, Michael Marks, Brian McGee, Rick Welts, Nicholas Woodman, Lauren Zalaznick ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12107156.). Filed byWenduo Guo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 2/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guo v. Woodman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Goldman
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian McGee
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Gotcher
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marks
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Lurie
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Lyne
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bates
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Zalaznick
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Gilhuly
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Woodman
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoPro, Inc.
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Catherine Duden Kevane
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Welts
Represented By: Marie Caroline Bafus
Represented By: Catherine D. Kevane
Represented By: Vincent Barredo
Represented By: Susan Samuels Muck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenduo Guo
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Ashley Rawlins Rifkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mario Romero
Represented By: David Jay Stone
Represented By: Avraham Noam Wagner
Represented By: Todd Harris Henderson
Represented By: Lawrence Paul Eagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?