Feuer v. Baker, et al.
Plaintiff: R.A. Feuer
Defendant: Fredrico F. Pena, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, John R. Shrewsberry, Donald M. James, Michael J. Loughlin, Cynthia Milligan, Susan E. Engel, Theodore F. Craver, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., Lloyd H. Dean, Maria Morris, Elaine L. Chao, Ronald L. Sargent, Wells Fargo & Company, Carrie L. Tolstedt, John S. Chen, John D. Baker, II, Susan G. Swenson, John G. Stumpf, Elizabeth A. Duke, James H. Quigley, Juan A. Pujadas, Celeste Clark, Stephen W. Sanger, Judith M. Runstad, Karen B. Peetz, Timothy J. Sloan, National General Insurance Company, Avid Modjtabai, Franklin Codel, National General Holdings Corp., Dawn Martin Harp and Maria R. Morris
Interested Party: Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado and The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System
Case Number: 4:2018cv02866
Filed: May 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 120 Statement Regarding Clarification of Facts Related to Proposed Settlments by R.A. Feuer. (Gouldsbury, Walter) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDERThese motions are administratively terminated. The parties are instructed to file a joint statement upon conclusion of the state court's consideration of that action indicating whether they still desire rulings on the motions. Motions terminated: #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT--[CORRECTION TO DKT#53 filed by Wells Fargo & Company, #55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National General Insurance Company, National General Holdings Corp.., ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 17, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 118 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 117 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 11/18/19 TO 11/12/19. Judge Tigar's Case Management Conference calendar will shift from Monday afternoons to Tuesday afternoons, therefore this case is being rescheduled consistent with the change. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER RE: COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter W. Gouldsbury, III of Ciardi Ciardi & Astin (Gouldsbury, Walter) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION to Substitute Attorney and for Leave of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP to Withdraw as Counsel filed by R.A. Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 113 MOTION to Substitute Attorney and for Leave of Richard D. Greenfield and Ilene F. Brookler to to Withdraw as Counsel filed by R.A. Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 112 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE filed by Wells Fargo & Company of Preliminary Approval of State Court Settlement & Unopposed Request for Continuance of CMC and Related Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE filed by Dawn Martin Harp of Withdrawal of Counsel Monica Ramirez Almadani (Almadani, Monica) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/07/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Wells Fargo & Company, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Hogberg, Sverker) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 108 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/7/19, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #104 Transcript Order,, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2019. (Related documents(s) #104 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 107 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2019 is continued to 7/31/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7/24/2019 by 5:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 28, 2019 Filing 106 Plaintiff's Opposition to re #105 Wells Fargo's Request for Continuance filed by R.A. Feuer. (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 4/28/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 105 Notice of Filing of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Request for Continuance of Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Wells Fargo & Company. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/07/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by John D. Baker, II, Elaine L. Chao, John S. Chen, Celeste Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Lloyd H. Dean, Elizabeth A. Duke, Susan E. Engel, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Donald M. James, Cynthia Milligan, Maria R. Morris, Karen B. Peetz, Fredrico F. Pena, Juan A. Pujadas, James H. Quigley, Judith M. Runstad, Stephen W. Sanger, Ronald L. Sargent, Susan G. Swenson, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Cove, John) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/07/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by R.A. Feuer, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 13, 2019 Filing 102 *** DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET #103 ) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/07/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by R.A. Feuer, for Court Reporter Joanne Farrell. (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 4/13/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2019 Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2019 re #55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National General Insurance Company, National General Holdings Corp., #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Total Time in Court: 38 minutes. Court Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam F. Shearer and Nanci L. Clarence and Josh A. Cohen for Timothy J. Sloan (Shearer, Adam) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 99 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 filed by John D. Baker, II, Elaine L. Chao, John S. Chen, Celeste Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Lloyd H. Dean, Elizabeth A. Duke, Susan E. Engel, Enrique Hernandez, Jr, Donald M. James, Cynthia Milligan, Maria R. Morris, Karen B. Peetz, Fredrico F. Pena, Juan A. Pujadas, James H. Quigley, Judith M. Runstad, Stephen W. Sanger, Ronald L. Sargent, Susan G. Swenson, Suzanne M. Vautrinot (Cove, John) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Cove, Jr (Cove, John) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A. Reider (Reider, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER DENYING #86 NOTICE by Wells Fargo & Company of Settlement and Request for Continuance filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 6, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Miles F. Ehrlich for Defendants John R. Shrewsberry and Franklin Codel (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine Ann Kates for Defendants John R. Shrewsberry and Franklin Codel (Kates, Katharine) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Ismail Jomo Ramsey for Defendants John R. Shrewsberry and Franklin Codel (Ramsey, Ismail) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 92 Joinder in Request for Continuance by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 91 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Faucette for Defendant Carrie Tolstedt (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 89 Letter to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 88 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #55 MOTION to Dismiss, re #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT -- [CORRECTION TO DKT#53) filed by R.A. Feuer. (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re #86 Notice filed by Wells Fargo & Company The Court has received Defendant Wells Fargo & Co.'s request to continue the motion hearing scheduled for March 7, 2019. ECF No. 86. Given the impending hearing, the Court hereby ORDERS that any opposition to the requested continuance shall be filed March 6, 2019 by 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 5, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE by Wells Fargo & Company of Settlement and Request for Continuance (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 85 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2019 is continued to 5/22/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 5/13/2019 by 5:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 84 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 83 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options - Independent Director Defendants ADR Certifications (Cove, John) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 82 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 2/18/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant P. Fondo (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 2/18/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 80 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 79 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -Plaintiff's ADR Certification filed by R.A. Feuer. (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 78 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Change of Address by Betsy Carol Manifold (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
January 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL, #55 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #72 Motion to Continue. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 75 Letter from Corey Worcester re Request to Continue Hearing. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 27, 2019 Filing 74 Letter from Richard D. Greenfield to Hon. Jon S. Tigar re Motions to Continue. (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 1/27/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 73 JOINDER in Request to Continue or Adjourn Hearing filed by Wells Fargo & Company. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motions to Dismiss; [Proposed] Order filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 71 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING MOTION HEARINGS. The hearings on the pending #54 , #55 Motions to Dismiss remain on the Court's calendar and are scheduled for January 31, 2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDERPursuant to the notice of settlement filed January 16, 2019 in Case No. 16-cv-5541, ECF No. 266, the case management conference scheduled for January 23, 2019 is hereby VACATED. At the parties' request, the Court now SETS the following deadlines: Motion for preliminary approval of settlement agreement due February 14, 2019; opposition to preliminary approval due February 28, 2019; reply in support of preliminary approval due March 7, 2019; preliminary approval hearing March 21, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. All other case deadlines are hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(Tigar, Jon) (Filed on 1/21/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 69 STATUS REPORT filed by R.A. Feuer. (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2019 is continued to 3/6/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. A Joint Case Management Statement due 2/25/2019 by 5:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
December 13, 2018 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearings as to #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND, #55 MOTION to Dismiss. The Motion Hearings set for 12/20/2018 are continued to 1/31/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. No other deadlines are changed by this notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 66 REPLY (re #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT--[CORRECTION TO DKT#53) Reply in support of Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice of Certain Documents in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and in reply to Wells Fargo & Company's Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice filed by R.A. Feuer. (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 65 Supplemental Brief to re #61 Opposition/Response to Motion, re #64 Reply to Opposition/Response, re #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT --[CORRECTION TO DKT#53, re #62 Request for Judicial Notice -- Wells Fargo & Company's Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice of Certain Documents Submitted in Support of Opposition to Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo & Company. (Related document(s) #61 , #64 , #54 , #62 ) (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 64 REPLY (re #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT -- [CORRECTION TO DKT#53) filed by Wells Fargo & Company. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 63 REPLY (re #55 MOTION to Dismiss) filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 8, 2018 Filing 62 Request for Judicial Notice re #55 MOTION to Dismiss , #53 Notice (Other), #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT--[CORRECTION TO DKT#53 filed byR.A. Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Greenfield Declaration, #2 Exhibit Compendium of Exhibits-I, #3 Exhibit Compendium of Exhibits-II)(Related document(s) #55 , #53 , #54 ) (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 10/8/2018)
October 8, 2018 Filing 61 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #55 MOTION to Dismiss , #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT--[CORRECTION TO DKT#53 ) filed byR.A. Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Decl. Richard D. Greenfield, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 10/8/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 60 Request for Judicial Notice re #59 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Dismiss the Amended Complaint re #54 and #55 filed byR.A. Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Richard D. Greenfield, #2 Exhibit Compendium of Exhibits Vol I, #3 Exhibit Compendium of Exhibits Vol II)(Related document(s) #59 ) (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 59 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #55 MOTION to Dismiss , #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT--[CORRECTION TO DKT#53 ) filed byR.A. Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #57 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #55 MOTION to Dismiss, re #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL filed by R.A. Feuer. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 57 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Response to re #55 MOTION to Dismiss, re #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT -- [CORRECTION TO DKT#53] - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re: Plaintiff's Response to Motions to Dismiss of Wells Fargo & Company and National General Insurance Company and National General Holdings Corp. filed by R.A. Feuer. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 56 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to re #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT--[CORRECTION TO DKT#53] - (Reason: Correcting an error - deadlines) filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Responses due by 10/8/2018. Replies due by 10/29/2018. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/8/2018. Replies due by 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting National General's Motion to Dismiss)(Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT --[CORRECTION TO DKT#53] filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/21/2018. Replies due by 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE by Wells Fargo & Company OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (51 in 3:18-cv-02866-JST) (251 in 3:16-cv-05541-JST) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Feuer Complaint filed by The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 7, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 51 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding the Feuer Complaint filed by Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado, The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Heimann, Richard) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by R.A. Feuer to re #19 Amended Complaint (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY COREY WORCESTER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JANE BYRNE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL CARLINSKY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 46 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company (Vance, Robert) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12629753) filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Carlinsky, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12629714) filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Byrne, Jane) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12629638) filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 8/27/2018) ).
August 21, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Olivia Zinsou (Zinsou, Tracy) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #36 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Concerning Schedule for Briefing Issue of Demand Refusal filed by National General Insurance Company, National General Holdings Corp. Filing deadline for National General's motion to dismiss: 9/7/2018. Responses due by 10/8/2018. Replies due by 10/29/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 21, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Nathan Shallman on behalf of Defendant Dawn Martin Harp (Shallman, Daniel) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Kubota on behalf of Defendant Dawn Martin Harp (Kubota, Carolyn) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 38 Certification Pursuant to L.R. 3-15 filed by Dawn Martin Harp (Almadani, Monica) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Marie-Ramirez Almadani on behalf of Defendant Dawn Martin Harp (Almadani, Monica) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 36 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Concerning Schedule for Briefing Issue of Demand Refusal filed by National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company. (Vance, Robert) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Patrick Vance, Jr on behalf of Defendants National General Holding Corporation and National General Insurance Company (Vance, Robert) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by Franklin Codel waiver sent on 8/7/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by Dawn Martin Harp waiver sent on 8/3/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2018 is continued to 1/16/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. A Joint Case Management Statement is due 1/7/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 31 Letter from Wells Fargo & Company Request to Adjourn CMC. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #29 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Concerning Schedule for Briefing Issue of Demand Refusal filed by Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 26, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 24, 2018 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Concerning Schedule for Briefing Issue of Demand Refusal filed by Wells Fargo & Company. (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD D. GREENFIELD PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12463359) (Filing Fee Previously Paid on June 25, 2018) filed by R.A. Feuer. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by National General Holdings Corp. waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018; National General Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by Avid Modjtabai waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachele R. Rickert (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy Carol Manifold (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice without prejudice because local co-counsel does not appear to maintain an office within the State of California. See Civil L.R. 11-3(a)(3). Co-counsel provides a PO Box, but does not provide an office address. Further, co-counsel's address of record with the State Bar of California is outside of California. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 26, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12463359) filed by R.A. Feuer. (Greenfield, Richard) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 20, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by All Defendants. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 20, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byR.A. Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Verification)(Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by John R. Shrewsberry waiver sent on 5/25/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 14, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 13, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (219) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:16-cv-05479-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by Wells Fargo & Company waiver sent on 5/25/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by Carrie L. Tolstedt waiver sent on 5/25/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by Timothy J. Sloan waiver sent on 5/25/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by Michael J. Loughlin waiver sent on 5/25/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by John G. Stumpf waiver sent on 5/25/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2018. Judge Alsup's standing orders may be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 27, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by R.A. Feuer.. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 5/27/2018)
May 27, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by R.A. Feuer (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 5/27/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12357518). Filed by R.A. Feuer . (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Verification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 5/16/2018) Modified on 5/16/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feuer v. Baker, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredrico F. Pena
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne M. Vautrinot
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Shrewsberry
Represented By: Miles F. Ehrlich
Represented By: Ismail Jomo Ramsey
Represented By: Katharine Ann Kates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald M. James
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Milligan
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore F. Craver
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Hernandez, Jr.
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd H. Dean
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine L. Chao
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L. Sargent
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Sverker Kristoffer Hogberg
Represented By: Brendan P. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie L. Tolstedt
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Chen
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Baker, II
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan G. Swenson
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Stumpf
Represented By: Grant P. Fondo
Represented By: Nicholas A. Reider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Duke
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Quigley
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan A. Pujadas
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celeste Clark
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Sanger
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith M. Runstad
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen B. Peetz
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Sloan
Represented By: Adam F. Shearer
Represented By: Josh Alan Cohen
Represented By: Nanci L. Clarence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jane M. Byrne
Represented By: Robert Patrick Vance, Jr.
Represented By: Corey Worcester
Represented By: Michael Barry Carlinsky
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avid Modjtabai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Codel
Represented By: Miles F. Ehrlich
Represented By: Ismail Jomo Ramsey
Represented By: Katharine Ann Kates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National General Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Jane M. Byrne
Represented By: Robert Patrick Vance, Jr.
Represented By: Corey Worcester
Represented By: Michael Barry Carlinsky
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Martin Harp
Represented By: Daniel Nathan Shallman
Represented By: Carolyn Kubota
Represented By: Tracy Olivia Zinsou
Represented By: Monica Ramirez Almadani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria R. Morris
Represented By: Alethea M. Sargent
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Represented By: John Gueli,
Represented By: Emily Victoria Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.A. Feuer
Represented By: Ilene Freier Brookler
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Represented By: Fred Taylor Isquith
Represented By: Brittany Nicole DeJong
Represented By: Richard D. Greenfield
Represented By: Walter W. Gouldsbury, III
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Represented By: Marisa C. Livesay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?