Crawford v. Ducart
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Crawford
Defendant: C.E. Ducart
Case Number: 4:2018cv05141
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Lee Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 REVISED CLERK'S 2ND NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 11/13/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018) Modified on 10/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from Christopher Lee Crawford re #6 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Christopher Lee Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re Completion of Complaint. Complaint on Form due by 10/29/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/22/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Lee Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a Magistrate Judge. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher Lee Crawford. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.E. Ducart. Filed byChristopher Lee Crawford. Consent/Declination due by 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Ducart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.E. Ducart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?