Sierra Club et al v. Ryan Zinke et al
Plaintiff: Citizens for a Healthy Community, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Earthworks, Environmental Defense Fund, Wyoming Outdoor Council, Montana Environmental Information Center, Wilderness Workshop, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, The Wilderness Society, Sierra Club, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Center For Biological Diversity, San Juan Citizens Alliance, Los Padres Forestwatch, WildEarth Guardians and Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior and Ryan Zinke
Intervenor Defendant: State of Wyoming
Case Number: 4:2018cv05984
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in case 4:18-cv-05712-YGR; granting (44) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-05984-YGR. Case 4:18-cv-5984-YGR is CONSOLIDATED with case 4:18-cv-5712-YGR. All future pleadings shall be filed in the docket in case no. 4:18-cv-5712-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Erik E. Petersen. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael M. Robinson. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 48 Corrected MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Wyoming. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Replies due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Answer)(Marsh, Christian) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2018 Filing 47 ***FILED IN ERROR. RE-FILED AT DKT. #48 *** MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Wyoming. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Replies due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marsh, Christian) (Filed on 10/29/2018) Modified on 10/30/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12800921.) filed by State of Wyoming. (Petersen, Erik) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12800739.) filed by State of Wyoming. (Robinson, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidated Cases filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights, Los Padres Forestwatch, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, San Juan Citizens Alliance, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop, Wyoming Outdoor Council. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geis, Stacey) (Filed on 10/26/2018) Modified on 10/29/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on October 26, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RELATING CASES 18-cv-5712-YGR and 18-cv-5984-SBA. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/25/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Carter Fleeth Thurman (Thurman, Carter) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2019. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2019 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/15/18. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/15/18. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 37 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bureau of Land Management, Ryan Zinke, United States Department of the Interior.. (Boronow, Clare) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 36 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center For Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights, Los Padres Forestwatch, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, San Juan Citizens Alliance, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop, Wyoming Outdoor Council.. (Geis, Stacey) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE by Bureau of Land Management, Ryan Zinke, United States Department of the Interior of Motion to Relate Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Relate Cases)(Boronow, Clare) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David Doniger. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Melissa Lynch. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Tomas Carbonell. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Susannah L. Weaver. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Scott Strand. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rachel Granneman. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robin Cooley. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as Peter Zalzal. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Laura King. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joel Minor. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Erik Schlenker-Goodrich. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Darin Schroeder. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ann Brewster Weeks. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12730719.) filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Doniger, David) (Filed on 10/2/2018) Modified on 10/3/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12730502.) filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lynch, Melissa) (Filed on 10/2/2018) Modified on 10/3/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Boronow (Boronow, Clare) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management, Ryan Zinke, United States Department of the Interior. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. (Geis, Stacey) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #1 Complaint,,, filed by San Juan Citizens Alliance, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Natural Resources Defense Council, Wyoming Outdoor Council, Environmental Defense Fund, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Los Padres Forestwatch, National Wildlife Federation, The Wilderness Society, Center For Biological Diversity, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, Earthworks Proposed Summons E-filed Incorrectly. Must use the event Proposed Summons and E-file Proposed Summons as One Document not in Separate Parts (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/28/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12723072.) filed by Environmental Defense Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carbonell, Toms) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12723055.) filed by Environmental Defense Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weaver, Susannah) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12723027.) filed by Environmental Law and Policy Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Strand, Scott) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12722984.) filed by Environmental Law and Policy Center. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Good Standing)(Granneman, Rachel) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12722970.) filed by Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Councils. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to PHV Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cooley, Robin) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12722955.) filed by Environmental Defense Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Zalzal, Peter) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12722937.) filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Los Padres Forestwatch, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Wildlife Federation, San Juan Citizens Alliance, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop, Wyoming Outdoor Council. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to PHV Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(King, Laura) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12722912.) filed by Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Councils. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to PHV Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Minor, Joel) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12722861.) filed by Center For Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Los Padres Forestwatch, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Wildlife Federation, San Juan Citizens Alliance, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop, Wyoming Outdoor Council. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to PHV Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schlenker-Goodrich, Erik) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12722819.) filed by National Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schroeder, Darin) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12722771.) filed by National Wildlife Federation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weeks, Ann) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosalie Giselle Winn (Winn, Rosalie) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center For Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Earthworks, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights, Los Padres Forestwatch, Montana Environmental Information Center, National Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, San Juan Citizens Alliance, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society, Western Organization of Resource Councils, WildEarth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop, Wyoming Outdoor Council (Geis, Stacey) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVEW RELIEF; (NO PROCESS); against Bureau of Land Management, Ryan Zinke, United States Department of the Interior ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12722517.). Filed byEnvironmental Law and Policy Center, The Wilderness Society, WildEarth Guardians, Los Padres Forestwatch, Sierra Club, Wyoming Outdoor Council, Wilderness Workshop, Montana Environmental Information Center, Natural Resources Defense Council, Center For Biological Diversity, Citizens for a Healthy Community, Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights, San Juan Citizens Alliance, Western Organization of Resource Councils, National Wildlife Federation, Earthworks, Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment, Environmental Defense Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3Erroneously E-filed: Please See Error Message Dated 09/28/18 Summons, #4 Attachment to Summons)(Geis, Stacey) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club et al v. Ryan Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for a Healthy Community
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Law and Policy Center
Represented By: Scott Ray Strand
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Rachel Leigh Granneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earthworks
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Peter Michel Zalzal
Represented By: Toms E Carbonell
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Susannah Landes Foster Weaver
Represented By: Rosalie Giselle Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming Outdoor Council
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Workshop
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Organization of Resource Councils
Represented By: Robin L Cooley
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Joel Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dine Citizens Against Ruining Our Environment
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Robin L Cooley
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Joel Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Robin L Cooley
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Joel Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Wildlife Federation
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Darin T. Schroeder
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: David Daniel Doniger
Represented By: Melissa Joy Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Juan Citizens Alliance
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Padres Forestwatch
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Laura H King
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Erik Schlenker-Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Berthold Protectors of Water and Earth Rights
Represented By: Robin L Cooley
Represented By: Stacey P. Geis
Represented By: Joel Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Carter Fleeth Thurman
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Carter Fleeth Thurman
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Carter Fleeth Thurman
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Erik Edward Petersen
Represented By: Michael M. Robinson
Represented By: Christian Lucier Marsh, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?