Bao v. Page et al

Plaintiff: Victor Bao
Defendant: Alan R. Mulally, Alphabet Inc., Diane B. Greene, Ruth M. Porat, John L. Hennessy, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Ann Mather, K. Ram Schriram, Sergey Brin, Eric E. Schmidt, L. John Doerr, Lawrence E. Page and Sundar Pichai
Case Number: 4:2019cv00314
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of Benjamin M. Crosson in Support of #13 MOTION to Stay Shareholder Derivative Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byAlphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Lawrence E. Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Schriram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Shareholder Derivative Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Lawrence E. Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt, K. Ram Schriram. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 4/1/2019. Replies due by 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Alphabet Inc. and Defendants' Civ. L. R. 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Feldman , Benjamin M. Crosson and Laurie Smilan (Feldman, Boris) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER. The Court finds that Cases C18-6245 JSW, C19-314 SK, and C19-447 VKD are related. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/6/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Victor Bao.. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendants Alphabet Inc., Sergey Brin, L. John Doerr, Roger W. Ferguson, Jr., Diane B. Greene, John L. Hennessy, Ann Mather, Alan R. Mulally, Lawrence E. Page, Sundar Pichai, Ruth M. Porat, Eric E. Schmidt & K. Ram Schriram. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE filed by Victor Bao of Notice of Related Case re #1 Complaint (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Victor Bao (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLD DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13016414). Filed by Victor Bao. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/18/2019) Modified on 1/23/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bao v. Page et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan R. Mulally
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane B. Greene
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth M. Porat
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Hennessy
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger W. Ferguson, Jr.
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Mather
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Ram Schriram
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergey Brin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric E. Schmidt
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. John Doerr
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E. Page
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundar Pichai
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Bao
Represented By: Laurence M. Rosen
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?