In re Toy Asbestos Litigation
Plaintiff: AGNES TOY, THOMAS TOY and Thomas H. Toy, Sr.
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Association, ITT LLC, Armstrong International Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Fryer-Knowles Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Viad Corp., Ford Motor Company, IMO Industries Inc., Crane Co., Warren Pumps LLC, Thomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc., Napa, Blackmer Pump Company, Flowserve US Inc., General Electric Company, Dana Companies LLC, Velan Valve Corp., Aurora Pump Company, Honeywell International Inc., Dezurik, Inc, Carrier Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, The William Powell Company, Borg Warner Morse Tec LLC, Grinnell LLC, Alfa Laval Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, SB Decking Inc, CLA-VAL Co., Standard Motor Products Inc., M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Western Auto Supply Company, Pneumo Abex LLC, Smothers Parts International, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metalclad Insulation LLC, Copes-Vulcan Inc., Viking Pump Inc., BW/IP Inc., Hennessy Industries LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., CBS Corporation, BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, Genuine Parts Company doing business as Rayloc also known as Napa, Hoffman Specialty MFG, Corp., Bell and Gossett Company, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Allied-Products Liability Signal, Inc., Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation, ITT Marlow, Hennessy Industries Inc, Metalclad Insulation Corporation, ITT Industries Inc, ITT Corporation, Viacom, Inc., Smothers Parts International, Inc. doing business as Smothers Auto Parts & Performance Accessories, ITT Fluid Products Corp and The Dial Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00325
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 288 Answer to Amended Complaint byParker-Hannifin Corporation, Standard Motor Products Inc.. (Tavera, Leonard) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 287 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint by CLA-VAL Co. (Lister, John) (Filed on 8/12/2019) Modified on 8/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2019 Filing 286 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 285 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 284 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/12/2019) Modified on 8/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2019 Filing 283 **DUPLICATE FILING, SEE DOCKET NO. #22 ** NOTICE of Appearance for Defendant General Electric Company by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo. (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 8/12/2019) Modified on 8/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2019 Filing 282 **DUPLICATE FILING, SEE DOCKET NO. 21** NOTICE of Appearance for Defendant General Electric Company by Katherine Paige Gardiner. (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 8/12/2019) Modified on 8/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2019 Filing 281 **DUPLICATE FILING, SEE DOCKET NO. #20 ** NOTICE of Appearance for Defendant General Electric Company by Charles T. Sheldon. (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 8/12/2019) Modified on 8/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2019 Filing 280 **DUPLICATE FILING, SEE DOCKET NO. #16 ** NOTICE of Appearance for Defendant General Electric Company by Derek S. Johnson (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 8/12/2019) Modified on 8/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2019 Filing 279 Defendant Dana Companies LLC's ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Dana Companies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Park, Charles) (Filed on 8/9/2019) Modified on 8/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2019 Filing 278 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Alfa Laval Inc. (Cunningham, Emily) (Filed on 8/9/2019) Modified on 8/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2019 Filing 277 ANSWER to #247 Complaint with Jury Demand by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Adams, Joseph) (Filed on 8/7/2019) Modified on 8/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2019 Filing 276 Answer to #247 Amended Complaint by The William Powell Company. (Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 8/7/2019) Modified on 8/8/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 275 Defendant BW/IP, Inc. And Its Wholly Owned Subsidiaries ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint by BW/IP Inc. (Yuen, Nicole) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 274 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Viking Pump Inc. (Thacker, Todd) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 273 Answer to #247 Second Amended Complaint by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 272 Answer to #247 Second Amended Complaint byFryer-Knowles Inc. (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING all parties to caption all future filings as "In re Toy Asbestos Litigation," as directed by the Court in its #153 Order Granting Motion to Consolidate. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 270 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Smothers Parts International, Inc.. (Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 269 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by SB Decking Inc. (Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 268 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Armstrong International Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 267 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Dezurik, Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 266 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint by Aurora Pump Company. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 265 Answer to #247 Second Amended Complaint by CBS Corporation. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 264 Answer to #247 Second Amended Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Bacon, Juniper) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 263 Answer to #247 Amended Complaint by IMO Industries Inc. (Pena, Olga) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 262 Answer to #247 Second Amended Complaint by M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. (Bacon, Juniper) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 261 ANSWER to #247 Second Complaint with Jury Demand by Crane Co. (Soskin, Peter) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 260 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint by Flowserve US Inc. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 259 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint by Copes-Vulcan Inc. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 258 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps LLC. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 257 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint by Blackmer Pump Company. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 256 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint by Carrier Corporation. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 255 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint by Honeywell International Inc. (Turner, Glen) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 254 Answer to #247 Second Amended Complaint by Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Jubelirer, Samuel) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 253 Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC as Successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation's ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint byBorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. (Jubelirer, Samuel) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/6/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2019 Filing 252 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Western Auto Supply Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2019 Filing 251 ANSWER to #247 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Genuine Parts Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2019 Filing 250 ANSWER to #247 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 7/29/2019) Modified on 7/30/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2019 Filing 249 NOTICE of Change of Address by Whitney A. Davis Attorney for Defendant, Viad Corp. (Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 248 ANSWER to #247 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 7/25/2019) Modified on 7/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is "AMENDED COMPLAINT" Event can be found under Civil Events > Initial Pleadings and Service >g t; Complaints and Other Initiating Documents > Amended ComplaintCorrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #247 Amended Petition, filed by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 247 AMENDED COMPLAINTFor Damages (Personal Injury, Wrongful Death and Survivor Action) against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Armstrong International Inc, Aurora Pump Company, BW/IP Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Borg Warner Morse Tec LLC, BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, CBS Corporation, CLA-VAL Co., Carrier Corporation, Copes-Vulcan Inc., Crane Co., Dana Companies LLC, Dezurik, Inc, Flowserve US Inc., Fryer-Knowles Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Grinnell LLC, Hennessy Industries LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries Inc., ITT LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, SB Decking Inc, Smothers Parts International, Inc., Standard Motor Products Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The William Powell Company, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp., Viking Pump Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Western Auto Supply Company. Filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/22/2019) Modified on 7/23/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #238 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/13/2019; Opening Reports due by 1/17/2020; Rebuttal Reports due by 2/7/2020; Motions due by 4/6/2020; Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2020 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. and Jury Selection / Jury Trial (15-day) set for 7/27/2020 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/26/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 244 NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by Leonard Michael Tavera. (Tavera, Leonard) (Filed on 6/20/2019) Modified on 6/21/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2019 Reset #238 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, See Docket No. #243 : Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 243 Renotice motion hearing re #238 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 242 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the #238 motion for leave. Hearing date of October 17, 2019, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed t o check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. October 17th was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was re-noticed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 241 ***SEE DOCKET ENTRY [243} FOR CORRECTED FILING*** NOTICE re #238 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/12/2019) Modified on 6/13/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2019 Filing 240 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must Notice not re-file the #238 motion for leave to file a second amended complaint. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before noticing the motion for a hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #237 Proposed Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney. Attorney Marshall E. Bluestone terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 238 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 ***ENTERED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD*** #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The Correct event is a Motion. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re : #237 Proposed Order filed and #236 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Smothers Parts International, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2019 Filing 237 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Smothers Parts International, Inc. (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 6/6/2019) Modified on 6/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2019 Filing 236 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Florence Anne McClain on Behalf of Smothers Parts & Performance Accessories (McClain, Florence) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 235 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Case Schedule. correcting Doc #234 , page 18 filed by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/3/2019) Modified on 6/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2019 Filing 234 ***PDF ERROR, SEE REFILED DOCUMENT, AT DOCKET ENTRY #235 *** STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Schedule filed by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/3/2019) Modified on 6/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., directing the parties TO SHOW CAUSE why they have not filed a stipulation and proposed order with a case schedule as directed by the Court at the May 14 case management conference and by the May 22 text order, Dkt. No. 231. The parties shall file by June 6 either a stipulation and proposed order with a stipulated case schedule or a short joint statement explaining why they are unable to do so. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING #205 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DIRECTING the parties to file their proposed stipulated case schedule as a stipulation and proposed order, as directed by the Court at the May 14 case management conference. The parties shall file a stipulation and proposed order, in accordance with the Civil Local Rules and the Court's Standing Order, by May 24. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 230 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #205 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) filed byNational Automotive Parts Association. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 229 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Amended) filed by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #225 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Christine Dianne Calareso for Armstrong International Inc. and terminated Attorney Sonja E. Blomquist. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING #81 MOTION TO DISMISS.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 226 Certificate of Interested Entities by Western Auto Supply Company identifying Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Corporate Parent Advance Stores Company, Incorporated, Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies Inc, Other Affiliate Chubb National Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Arrowpoint Capital, Other Affiliate Resolute Management Inc. for Western Auto Supply Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 225 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Christine D. Calareso; Gilliam F. Stewart of CMBG3 Law LLC filed by Armstrong International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Substitution of Attorney)(Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 224 Certificate of Interested Entities by Western Auto Supply Company identifying Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb National Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Resolute Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Arrowpoint Capital, Other Affiliate Advance Stores Company, Incorporated for Western Auto Supply Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The Correct Event is a Motion. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re : #221 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Armstrong International Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Insurance Carriers Must be Entered. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, ente r all affiliates or corporate parents. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #220 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Western Auto Supply Company. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 223 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Motion Hearing and Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/14/2019. Total Time in Court: 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo-Hebel. Plaintiff Attorney: Benjamin Adams. Defendant Attorney: Geoffrey Davis appearing via courtcall; Thomas Tarkoff appearing via courtcall; Nicole Yuen; Lori Cataldo; Charles Sheldon; P. Mark Mahoney; E. Reno Cross, Nilufar Majd; James Cunningham; Trina Clayton; Gavin Whitis; John Lister; Gilliam Stewart; Frederick Gatt; James Scadden; Daniel Hoye; Charles Bishop; Thomas Steig; Edward Tugade; Glen Turner; Lance Wilson; Michael Eagan, Jr. and Heather Kirkpatrick Parties are directed to meet and confer and e-file by close of business on May 21st either a stipulation and proposed order setting a revised case schedule or a notice indicating no agreement regarding a case schedule was reached. Defendant, Viking Pump, Inc.s motion to dismiss (docket no. #81 ) is argued and submitted by the parties and taken under submission by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #205 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, See Docket No. 222 : Responses due by 5/21/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DIRECTING dismissed Defendant National Automotive Parts Association to respond to Plaintiffs' #205 motion for leave to file motion for reconsideration. NAPA shall file a response of five pages or less by May 21, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 221 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Gilliam Fipp Stewart and Christine D. Calareso on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Substitution of Attorney)(Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 220 Certificate of Interested Entities by Western Auto Supply Company identifying Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Other Affiliate Advance Stores Company, Incorporated for Western Auto Supply Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Lori A. Cataldo Needs to Update Current Address Information in her ECF Profile. [err102] Re: #214 Notice of Appearance filed by The William Powell Comp any (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety Re: #208 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Western Auto Supply Company. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., DIRECTING the parties to review and comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Civil Local Rules. For example, the parties should not file initial disclosures or other discovery materials on the Court's docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by Reno Cross (Cross, Reno) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 217 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 216 ASSOCIATION of Counsel with Christine D. Calareso; Gilliam F. Stewart of CMBG3 Law LLC by Armstrong International Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 215 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Defendant Viking Pump, Inc. (Thacker, Todd) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori A. Cataldo (Cataldo, Lori) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Graham on behalf of Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Graham, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leigh Burch on behalf of Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Nilufar Kashani Majd on behalf of Defendant Western Auto Supply Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 209 Initial Disclosures pursuant to FRCP 26 by Western Auto Supply Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 5/13/2019) Modified on 5/14/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2019 Filing 208 Certificate of Interested Entities by Western Auto Supply Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 207 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byWestern Auto Supply Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison of Charles T. Sheldon (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 205 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 204 Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Crane Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/8/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2019 Filing 203 Initial Disclosures by Smothers Parts International, Inc. (Bluestone, Marshall) (Filed on 5/8/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2019 Filing 202 FRCP, RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Fryer-Knowles Inc. (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 5/8/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2019 Filing 201 Initial Disclosures by Metalclad Insulation LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26. (Jubelirer, Samuel) (Filed on 5/8/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2019 Filing 200 Initial Disclosures by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, As Successor-By-Merger to BorgWarner Corporation's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26. (Jubelirer, Samuel) (Filed on 5/8/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #194 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 198 Initial Disclosures by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 197 Initials Disclosures by Dezurik, Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 196 Initial Disclosure by Aurora Pump Company. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 195 Initial Disclosures by Honeywell International Inc. (Turner, Glen) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 194 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Crane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 193 Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 26(a)(1)(A) by IMO Industries Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 192 Initial Disclosures by Viad Corp. (Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 191 DEFENDANT WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC. FKA ATWOOD & MORRILL'S RULE 26(a) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Bacon, Juniper) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 190 Initial Disclosures by M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. (Bergstrom, Emily) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 189 INITIAL DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) by SB Decking Inc. (Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #187 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 187 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 186 PLAINTIFFS JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Reset Hearing as to #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(2), see docket no. 184 and 185 : Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the parties to review the updated scheduling order at Dkt. No. 184 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. RESCHEDULING the hearing on the #81 motion to dismiss from May 9 to be heard along with the Initial Case Management Conference on Tuesday, May 14 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. All parties shall participate in the drafting of the Case Management Statement (due May 7) and appear at the Conference unless granted permission by the Court to appear by phone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019) (Modified on 5/3/2019: corrected date) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2019 Filing 183 Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) by Armstrong International Inc. (Blomquist, Sonja) (Filed on 5/2/2019) Modified on 5/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2019 Filing 182 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff Thomas Toy by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #50 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING #47 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 179 Certificate of Interested Entities by Viking Pump Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BlackRock Inc., Corporate Parent Idex Corporation, Other Affiliate Viking Pump, Inc. for Viking Pump Inc.. (Thacker, Todd) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 178 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Dezurik, Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices > Certificate of Interested Entities, Corpora te Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety using the correct event and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. Re: #177 Statement filed by The Goodyear Tire > Rubber Company (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 177 Statement of Supplemental Fed. Rule of Civ. Procedure 7.1 Disclosure by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi L.K. Okumoto (Okumoto, Kristi) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Tarkoff (Tarkoff, Thomas) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 174 Certificate of Interested Entities by Smothers Parts International, Inc. (Bluestone, Marshall) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 173 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bluestone, Marshall) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 172 ANSWER to #76 Complaint with Defendant SMOTHERS hereby demands a trial by Jury in this action by Smothers Parts International, Inc. (Bluestone, Marshall) (Filed on 4/15/2019) Modified on 4/16/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2019 Filing 171 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lister, John) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 170 Answer to #76 Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium by Dezurik, Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2019 Filing 169 Certificate of Interested Entities Pursuant to Local Rule 7-1.1 and Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 by Dezurik, Inc (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilliam Fipp Stewart on behalf of Dezurik, Inc. (Stewart, Gilliam) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 167 Initial Disclosures per FRCP 26 by Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2019 Filing 166 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Sweeney Kirkpatrick, Heather) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 165 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2019) Modified on 4/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2019 Filing 164 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2019) Modified on 4/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2019 Filing 163 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Eagan, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2019) Modified on 4/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2019 Filing 162 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CLA-VAL Co. identifying Corporate Parent Griswold Industries for CLA-VAL Co.. Initial Disclosures Per FRCP 26 (Lister, John) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 161 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Viad Corp (Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 4/4/2019) Modified on 4/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2019 Filing 160 ANSWER to #76 First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Viad Corp. (Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 4/4/2019) Modified on 4/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2019 Filing 159 Answer to #76 Amended Complaint byIMO Industries Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 4/4/2019) Modified on 4/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2019 Filing 158 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 4/4/2019) Modified on 4/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2019 Filing 157 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 156 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand bySB Decking Inc. (Clayton, Trina) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/4/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2019 Filing 155 ANSWER to #76 Complaint by Fryer-Knowles Inc. (Bishop, Charles) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/4/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2019 Filing 154 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING (Docket Nos. 125 in case 4:19-cv-00325-HSG; 121 in case 4:19-cv-00326-HSG; and 93 in case 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 152 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Defendant Warren Pumps LLC (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 151 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options field by Defendant Carrier Corporation (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 4/2/2019) Modified on 4/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2019 Filing 150 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company (Cunningham, James) (Filed on 4/2/2019) Modified on 4/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2019 Filing 149 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 148 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by FLOWSERVE US INC., solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc. (Kelly, Daniel) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 147 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 146 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by defendant M. Slayen & Associates, Inc. (Bacon, Juniper) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 145 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Bacon, Juniper) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 144 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Scadden, James) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 143 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Scadden, James) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 142 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Pneumo Abex LLC (Brydon, John) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 141 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 26, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Name of Interested Entities must be entered. Correct event is found under Civil Events > Other Filings > Notices >gt ; Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #138 Notice (Other) filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 140 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Motor Products Inc. (Tavera, Leonard) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Filing 139 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of "Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction," Pending in State Court. (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE by Parker-Hannifin Corporation Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 26(A)(1) (Adams, Joseph) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 137 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex LLC identifying Corporate Parent Abex Corporation for Pneumo Abex LLC. Corrected Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Brydon, John) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 136 **DISREGARD, RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. #137 ** Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex LLC Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure (Brydon, John) (Filed on 3/19/2019) Modified on 3/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2019 Filing 135 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pneumo Abex LLC identifying Corporate Parent Abex Corporation (Pneumo Abex) for Pneumo Abex LLC. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 134 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 3/19/2019) Modified on 3/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance of Edward P. Tugade by John R. Brydon (Brydon, John) (Filed on 3/19/2019) Modified on 3/20/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Brydon (Brydon, John) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 131 Answer to #76 Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium by CLA-VAL Co. (Lister, John) (Filed on 3/12/2019) Modified on 3/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2019 Filing 130 REPLY (re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(2) ) of Defendant Viking Pump, Inc. filed byViking Pump Inc.. (Thacker, Todd) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 129 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byParker-Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Adams, Joseph) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Marie Sweeney Kirkpatrick for Defendant DCo LLC, f/k/a Dana Companies, LLC (Sweeney Kirkpatrick, Heather) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 127 Answer to #76 Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium by Dana Companies LLC. (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (Docket Nos. 118 in case 4:19-cv-00325-HSG; 113 in case 4:19-cv-00326-HSG; 85 in case 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) Stipulation re Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Genuine Parts Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 3/18/2019. Replies due by 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd, #3 Exhibit A to Majd Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Majd Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Majd Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Majd Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Majd Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Majd Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Majd Declaration, #10 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 124 Certificate of Interested Entities by Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 123 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Genuine Parts Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Nilufar Kashani Majd on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Dennis Pond on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Pond, Francis) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Graham on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Graham, Michael) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Leigh Burch on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company (Burch, Dana) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 118 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC filed by Hennessy Industries LLC., Thomas H. Toy, Sr. and Agnes Toy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Casey) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/4/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Document was improperly captioned and was not filed in all three cases per Judge's Order at docket no. 116 . Please re-file Stipulation in complianc e with the Judge's Order at docket no. 116 in its entirety. Re: #117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation re: Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC filed by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr., Hennessy Industries LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 117 **RE-FILED, SEE DOCKET NO. #118 .**STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Hennessy Industries, LLC filed by Hennessy Industries LLC., Thomas H. Toy, Sr., and Agnes Toy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Casey) (Filed on 2/28/2019) Modified on 3/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/4/2019 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. In any future stipulations and proposed orders that are submitted in more than one of cases 19-cv-00325, 326 and 336, the request should be in a single filing that includes the caption for each applicable case. In other words, the parties should not submit multiple separate identical documents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 115 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(2) ) filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 114 REPLY (re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byWestern Auto Supply Company. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #107 Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company Only. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 112 Answer to #76 Amended Complaint byIMO Industries Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 111 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Bacon, Juniper) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 110 REPLY (re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byNational Automotive Parts Association. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 109 Answer to #76 Amended Complaint for Personal Injury- Asbestos by CBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 108 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by M. Slayen and Associates, Inc. (Kannett, Mark) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 #Electronic filing error NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document also listed case numbers 4:19-cv-326-HSG and 4:19-cv-336-HSG. This case in NOT a consolidated case. If it is intended to be applied to the other case numbers, please e-file in those cases also. If the document is not applicable to that case, DO NOT include that case number on the documents and do not specify that 4:19-cv-325-HSG is the lead case number. [err102] Re: #102 Answer to Complaint filed by Carrier Corporation, #103 Answer to Complaint filed by Warren Pumps LLC, #101 Answer to Complaint filed by Blackmer Pump Company, #106 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC, #104 Answer to Complaint filed by Flowserve US Inc., #99 Answer to Complaint filed by Copes-Vulcan Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. Re:[10 2] Answer to Complaint filed by Carrier Corporation, #103 Answer to Complaint filed by Warren Pumps LLC, #101 Answer to Complaint filed by Blackmer Pump Company, #104 Answer to Complaint filed by Flowserve US Inc., #99 Answer to Complaint filed by Copes-Vulcan Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company Only filed by Ford Motor Company, Thomas H. Toy, Sr., and Agnes Toy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 106 Answer to #76 Amended Complaint byBorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 105 ANSWER to #76 First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 104 ANSWER to #76 First Amended Complaint by Flowserve US Inc. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 103 ANSWER to #76 First Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps LLC. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 102 ANSWER to #76 First Amended Complaint by Carrier Corporation. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 101 ANSWER to #76 First Amended Complaint by Blackmer Pump Company. (Tran, Ronald) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #95 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 99 ANSWER to #76 First Amended Complaint by Copes-Vulcan Inc. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 98 Notice of Withdrawal of #62 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(2) (Shaw, Casey) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Filing 97 Certificate of Interested Entities by CLA-VAL Co. identifying Corporate Parent Griswold Industries, Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Resolute Insurance Company for CLA-VAL Co.. (Lister, John) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 96 Notice of Withdrawal of #37 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Genuine Parts Company (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2019 Filing 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Pneumo Abex LLC. Thomas H. Toy, Sr., and Agnes Toy. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2019 Filing 94 **RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #97 ** Certificate of Interested Entities by CLA-VAL Co. identifying Corporate Parent Griswold Industries for CLA-VAL Co.. (Lister, John) (Filed on 2/21/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2019 Filing 93 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 2/21/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2019 Filing 92 **RE-FILED, SEE DOCKET NO. #95 ** STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading filed by Pneumo Abex LLC., Thomas H. Toy, Sr., and Agnes Toy. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 2/21/2019) Modified on 2/22/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Proposed Order should not have the Judge's printed name on the signature line. Please re-file the Stipulation and Proposed Order in its entirety with out the Judge's printed name on the signature line. Re: #89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading filed by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr., Pneumo Abex LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 91 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 90 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 89 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. #92 ** STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading filed by Pneumo Abex LLC. and Thomas H. Toy, Sr. and Agnes Toy. (Brydon, John) (Filed on 2/20/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/21/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/21/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2019 Filing 88 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Names of interested entities or person MUST be entered at the prompt. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #87 Certificate of Interested Entities filed b y CLA-VAL Co. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 87 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. #97 ** Certificate of Interested Entities by CLA-VAL Co. (Lister, John) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/22/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/25/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by John Russell Lister and Charles Kanter on behalf of Defendant Cla-Val Co. (Lister, John) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE of Refiling State Court Answer by CLA-VAL Co. (Lister, John) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/15/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2019 Filing 84 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aurora Pump Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Lanell Hansen on behalf of Defendant Aurora Pump Company (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer by Aurora Pump Company (Hansen, Haley) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/15/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Viking Pump Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/27/2019. Replies due by 3/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Todd M. Thacker, #3 Exhibit A to Decl. of T. Thacker, #4 Exhibit B to Decl. of T. Thacker, #5 Proposed Order)(Thacker, Todd) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 80 Certificate of Interested Entities by Borg Warner Morse Tec Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Borg Warner, Inc. for BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc. (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 2/13/2019) Modified on 2/14/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/14/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel B. Hoye for BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC As Successor-By-Merger To Borg-Warner Corporation (Hoye, Daniel) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metalclad Insulation LLC identifying Other Affiliate Transport Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ENTRX LLC (Holding Company), Other Affiliate Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group), Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group), Other Affiliate Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate), Other Affiliate Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group), Other Affiliate American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group) for Metalclad Insulation LLC. Metalclad Insulation LLC is erroneously sued herein as Metalclad Insulation Corporation. (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance for Metalclad Insulation LLC erroneously sued herein as Metalclad Insulation Corporation by Michelle Christian Jackson (Jackson, Michelle) (Filed on 2/12/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Reset Hearings, See Re-Notices as to (37 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (47 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (50 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (61 in 4:19-cv-00325-HSG) MOTION to Quash SECOND RE-NOTICE OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, PENDING IN STATE COURT, (45 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (47 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (26 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (61 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Quash of Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court (Second Re-Notice), (49 in 4:19-cv-00326-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (55 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court (Second Re-Notice) , (37 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (41 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , (39 in 4:19-cv-00336-HSG) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please attach all supporting documents and proposed orders to the Motion. Re: #75 Proposed Order filed by Ford Motor Company (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 76 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Inc., Armstrong International Inc, Aurora Pump Company, BW/IP Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc., CBS Corporation, CLA-VAL Co., Carrier Corporation, Copes-Vulcan Inc., Crane Co., Dana Companies LLC, Dezurik, Inc, Flowserve US Inc., Ford Motor Company, Fryer-Knowles Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Grinnell LLC, Hennessy Industries LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries Inc., ITT LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, National Automotive Parts Association, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, SB Decking Inc, Smothers Parts International, Inc., Standard Motor Products Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The William Powell Company, Velan Valve Corp., Viad Corp., Viking Pump Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Western Auto Supply Company. Filed byAgnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr. (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 75 Proposed Order re #66 Third Re-Notice re MOTION to Quash by Ford Motor Company. (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Nicole Empting on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Empting, Erin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Finnell Cronin on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Cronin, Justin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Douglas Jamison on Behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation, et al. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 71 Certificate of Interested Entities by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation. re #70 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Demand for Jury byCBS Corporation. (Jamison, Kevin) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 69 Second Re-Notice of #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Western Auto Supply Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 68 Second Re-Notice of #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Automotive Parts Association. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 67 Second Re-Notice of #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Genuine Parts Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 66 Third Re-Notice of #61 MOTION to Quash filed by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2019 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 14, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by May 7, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-00325-HSG, 4:19-cv-00326-HSG or 4:19-cv-00336-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE RE (Docket Nos. 61 in case nos. 19-cv-00325-HSG and 19-cv-00326- HSG and 55 in case no. 19-cv-00336-HSG) Motions to Quash. Notice is hereby given that the briefing schedule is: response is due February 22nd, and reply is due March 1st. The briefing set by counsel at the time the motions were re-filed/re-noticed are terminated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the (docket nos. 37, 47, 50 in case no. 19-cv-00325-HSG, 26, 45, 47, 49 in case no. 19-cv-00326-HSG and 37, 39 and 41 in case no. 19-cv-00336-HSG) motions to dismiss and the ( docket nos. 61 in case no. 19-cv-00325-HSG, 61 in case no. 19-cv-00326-HSG and 55 in case no. 19-cv-00336-HSG) motions to quash. Hearing dates of March 14th, are vacated. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. March 14th was not the Court's next available hearing date when the motions were e-filed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(2) filed by Hennessy Industries LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/22/2019. Replies due by 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacqueline K. Dubois, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Casey) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Filing 61 Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court filed by Ford Motor Company (Second Re-Notice) Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. Responses due by 2/21/2019. Replies due by 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in Support of Re-Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2019 Filing 60 Renotice motion hearing re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byWestern Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #47 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 59 Renotice motion hearing re #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byNational Automotive Parts Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #50 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 58 Renotice motion hearing re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byGenuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 57 Certificate of Interested Entities by Flowserve US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve US Inc., Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/8/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 53 **RE-FILED AS DOCKET NO. #61 ** Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in Support of Re-Notice of Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Bina Ghanaat SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 51 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd in Support of #50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byNational Automotive Parts Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #50 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Automotive Parts Association. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/20/2019. Replies due by 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 48 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd in Support of #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byWestern Auto Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #47 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Western Auto Supply Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/20/2019. Replies due by 2/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #25 #26 Administrative Motions to Relate. Cases 4:19-cv-00326-HSG and 3:19-cv-00336-JSC RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Lynn Crochet (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 43 Amended Request for Judicial Notice re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Exhibit B filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Related document(s) #37 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/5/2019) Modified on 2/6/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2019 Filing 42 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dana Companies LLC.. (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dana Companies LLC identifying Corporate Parent DCo LLC for Dana Companies LLC. re #39 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Glezakos on behalf of Dana Companies LLC (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byDana Companies LLC. (Glezakos, Christina) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 38 Declaration of Nilufar K. Majd in Support of #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byGenuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Genuine Parts Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/19/2019. Replies due by 2/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 36 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Ford Motor Company Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company's Disclosure Statement and Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 35 Joinder to The WM Powell Company's #26 Administrative MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Specially Appearing Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/4/2019) Modified on 2/5/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2019 Filing 34 Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pending in State Court by Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A in support of Notice)(Ghanaat, Bina) (Filed on 2/4/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by tje Executive Committee on 2/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 2, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc., ONLY by Agnes Toy, Thomas H. Toy, Sr (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/2/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 30 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Genuine Parts Company.. (Majd, Nilufar) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Flowserve US Inc. of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Copes-Vulcan Inc. of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin H Adams for Plaintiffs (Adams, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 26 Amended ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES re #25 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to relate cases filed by The William Powell Company. Responses due by 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Defendant The WM. Powell Companys Amended Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 1/30/2019) Modified on 1/31/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2019 Filing 25 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to relate cases. filed by The William Powell Company. Responses due by 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew L. Sharp in Support of Defendant The WM. Powell Companys Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related)(Sharp, Andrew) (Filed on 1/30/2019) Modified on 1/31/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byAir & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byVelan Valve Corp.. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo for Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner for Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon for Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by General Electric Company of Refiling State Court Answer (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson for Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Ingersoll-Rand Company Of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint for Damages and Personal Injuries; Demand for Jury Trial (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byThe Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation, Other Affiliate Fireman's Fund Ins, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual, Other Affiliate Utica National Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Resolute Management Inc. for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Inc.. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen R. Powell (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Inc.. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Velan Valve Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Velan Inc. for Velan Valve Corp.. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen R. Powell (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, by Velan Valve Corp.. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Document #1 -2) filed by Copes-Vulcan Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Copes-Vulcan, Inc. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Copes-Vulcan, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AB Electrolux, Corporate Parent Electrolux Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Electrolux Home Products, Inc., a Delaware Corporation for Copes-Vulcan, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG18932350. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13017281). Filed byCopes-Vulcan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 1/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Toy Asbestos Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGNES TOY
Represented By: Jessica M. Dean
Represented By: Benjamin H Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS TOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Toy, Sr.
Represented By: Jessica M. Dean
Represented By: Benjamin H Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Automotive Parts Association
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International Inc
Represented By: Christine Dianne Calareso
Represented By: Catherine Ellen Golden
Represented By: Gilliam Fipp Stewart
Represented By: Sonja E. Blomquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fryer-Knowles Inc.
Represented By: Charles Stewart Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Whitney A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Represented By: Paul-Erik Lannus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Frederick W. Gatt
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Represented By: Ronald Q Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dee Engineering Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napa
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Represented By: Ronald Q Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Heather Marie Sweeney Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Christina M Glezakos
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Christine Dianne Calareso
Represented By: Haley Lanell Hansen
Represented By: W. Joseph Gunter
Represented By: Gilliam Fipp Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Kirsten McNelly Bibbes
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Glen Elliot Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc
Represented By: Christine Dianne Calareso
Represented By: Haley Lanell Hansen
Represented By: W. Joseph Gunter
Represented By: Gilliam Fipp Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: James P. Cunningham
Represented By: Ronald Q Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Cormier
Represented By: Carrie S. Lin
Represented By: Kristi L.K. Young
Represented By: Thomas J. Tarkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Represented By: Khaled Taqi-Eddin
Represented By: Douglas Garth Wah
Represented By: Lori A. Cataldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg Warner Morse Tec LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc.
Represented By: Janell Maria Alberto
Represented By: Emily M Cunningham
Represented By: Keith Michael Ameele
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Represented By: Marte J. Bassi
Represented By: Reno Cross
Represented By: Leonard Michael Tavera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking Inc
Represented By: Florence Anne McClain
Represented By: Trina Marie Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL Co.
Represented By: Charles H. Kanter
Represented By: John Russell Lister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products Inc.
Represented By: Leonard Michael Tavera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Kannett
Represented By: Emily Denise Bergstrom
Represented By: Patrick Mark Mahoney
Represented By: Emily Diane Bergstrom
Represented By: Juniper Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Auto Supply Company
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Frank D. Pond
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: John R. Brydon
Represented By: Edward P Tugade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smothers Parts International, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall E. Bluestone
Represented By: Florence Anne McClain
Represented By: Trina Marie Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Michelle Christian Jackson
Represented By: Samuel David Jubelirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Represented By: Lance Douglas Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Inc.
Represented By: Peter K. Renstrom
Represented By: Todd Marshall Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP Inc.
Represented By: Keith Michael Ameele
Represented By: Nicole Denine Brown Yuen
Represented By: Suzanna L. Minasian
Represented By: Dennis Michael Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Kirk Dubois
Represented By: Casey Carlton Shaw
Represented By: Ian Garth Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Diane Bergstrom
Represented By: Juniper Bacon
Represented By: Mark S. Kannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Samuel David Jubelirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company doing business as Rayloc also known as Napa
Represented By: Michael A. Graham
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Represented By: Dana Leigh Burch
Represented By: Nilufar Kashani Majd
Represented By: Francis Dennis Pond
Represented By: Bina Ghanaat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman Specialty MFG, Corp.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell and Gossett Company
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Products Liability Signal, Inc.
Represented By: Kirsten McNelly Bibbes
Represented By: David Raymond Ongaro
Represented By: Glen Elliot Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Marlow
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries Inc
Represented By: Jacqueline Kirk Dubois
Represented By: Casey Carlton Shaw
Represented By: Ian Garth Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Represented By: Daniel B. Hoye
Represented By: Lisa Lurline Oberg
Represented By: Michelle Christian Jackson
Represented By: Samuel David Jubelirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries Inc
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Jamison
Represented By: Justin Finnell Cronin
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smothers Parts International, Inc. doing business as Smothers Auto Parts & Performance Accessories
Represented By: Marshall E. Bluestone
Represented By: Florence Anne McClain
Represented By: Trina Marie Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Fluid Products Corp
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Michael Quinn Eagan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dial Corporation
Represented By: Whitney A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?