Heilman v. Koenig et al
Petitioner: Thomas John Heilman
Respondent: X. Becerra and C. Koenig
Case Number: 4:2019cv02607
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC GRC
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order to Show Cause. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 8/19/2019. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Case Transferred in to Northern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00820. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Fee for Habeas Petition: Paid on 5/8/2019. (jms) (jms).
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Case transferred to the District of Northern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *Northern District of California*.*450 Golden Gate Avenue, 16th Floor**San Francisco, CA 94102-3434*. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (jao).
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against X. Becerra, C. Koenig, filed by Thomas John Heilman.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-820-BAS-AGS. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heilman v. Koenig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas John Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: X. Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?