Mendel v. Chao
Plaintiff: S. Patrick Mendel
Defendant: Elaine Chao, Raiser-CA, LLC, Ryan Graves, Garrett Camp, Sidney Runyan Thomas, Travis Kalanick, Uber USA, LLC, San Francisco International Airport Commission, Xavier Becerra, Joseph J. Simmons, Carla J. Peterman, Raymond Martinez, Joseph J. Simons, Lyft, Inc., Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Logan Green, Ivar C. Satero, Maritza Perez, Loretta Bitner, Lichten & Liss-Riordan P.C., William Pelham Barr, John Zimmer, Adelaide Pagano, Anne Kramer, Portier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Martha Guzman Aceves, Shannon Liss-Riordan, Phyllis J. Hamilton, Clifford Rechtschffen, City and County of San Francisco and California Public Utilities Commission
Case Number: 4:2019cv03244
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 118 Mail sent to S. Patrick Mendel returned as undeliverable re #109 Order, Terminate Motions. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 117 Mail sent to S. Patrick Mendel returned as undeliverable re #105 Order, Set Deadlines. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #109 Order. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #105 Order. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER of USCA - Appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction as to #110 USCA Case Number, #108 Notice of Appeal, filed by S. Patrick Mendel (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE by Garrett Camp, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC re Order Filed on January 23, 2020 by United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appeal to United States Supreme Court by S. Patrick Mendel (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 111 Documents Received from S. Patrick Mendel. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Supreme Court filing)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
November 25, 2019 Filing 110 USCA Case Number 19-17380 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #108 Notice of Appeal, filed by S. Patrick Mendel. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER, Motions terminated: #79 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Elaine Chao, Phyllis J. Hamilton, Sidney Runyan Thomas, Raymond Martinez, Joseph J. Simons, William Pelham Barr, Loretta Bitner, #91 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by S. Patrick Mendel, #71 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 and 12(b), Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support filed by Lichten & Liss-Riordan P.C., Anne Kramer, Adelaide Pagano, Shannon Liss-Riordan. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 25, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Appeal of Order on Motion for Recusal, #97 , Order,,,, Set Deadlines,,, #105 , Order on Motion to Stay, #98 , Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge, #96 (Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 44611016654.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Receipt)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 107 CLERK'S NOTICE CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 106 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND REQUEST TO VACATE CONFERENCE filed by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Russell, Jay) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re #51 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Martha Guzman Aceves, Carla J. Peterman, Clifford Rechtschffen, Michael Picker, California Public Utilities Commission, Maritza Perez, Liane M. Randolph, #57 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer, Logan Green, #44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ivar C. Satero, City and County of San Francisco, #47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Travis Kalanick, Raiser-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Garrett Camp, #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Xavier Becerra Amended Pleadings due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 22, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Motion to Vacate. The correct event can be found at: Civil Events > Motions and Related Filings >gt ; Motions - General > Vacate. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #103 Case Management Statement, filed by Elaine Chao, Phyllis J. Hamilton, Sidney Runyan Thomas, Raymond Martinez, Joseph J. Simons, William Pelham Barr, Loretta Bitner (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 104 Joinder re #103 Case Management Statement, by Garrett Camp, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 103 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Federal Defendants' Request to Vacate CMC; Separate Case Management Statement filed by William Pelham Barr, Loretta Bitner, Elaine Chao, Phyllis J. Hamilton, Raymond Martinez, Joseph J. Simons, Sidney Runyan Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for Joinder RE DKT. #99 OPPOSITION TO MOTION filed by City and County of San Francisco, Ivar C. Satero. (Rollan, Raymond) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 101 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byMartha Guzman Aceves, California Public Utilities Commission, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen. (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION for Joinder re 99 Opposition to Motion filed by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Huston, Peter) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 99 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byGarrett Camp, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar Denying #80 Motion to Stay. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/25/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #74 Motion for Recusal. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/25/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #73 Motion to Disqualify Judge. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/25/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 95 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byXavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Russell, Jay) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER of USCA as to #81 USCA Case Number. Petitioner has not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of the court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. Accordingly, the petition is denied. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 93 Plaintiff's REPLY In Opposition to Multiple Defendants Responses (re #73 MOTION to Disqualify Judge ) filed by S. Patrick Mendel. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 92 REPLY (re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ) filed byWilliam Pelham Barr, Loretta Bitner, Elaine Chao, Phyllis J. Hamilton, Raymond Martinez, Joseph J. Simons, Sidney Runyan Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Responses due by 10/25/2019. Replies due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Rule 56 Statement, #4 Request for Judical Notice, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Elaine Chao, Phyllis J. Hamilton, Sidney Runyan Thomas, Raymond Martinez, Joseph J. Simons, William Pelham Barr, Loretta Bitner. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 10, 2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/10/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #71 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 and 12(b), Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support filed by Lichten & Liss-Riordan P.C., Anne Kramer, Adelaide Pagano, Shannon Liss-Riordan. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 10, 2013. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/10/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 88 REPLY (re #71 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 and 12(b), Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support ) filed byAnne Kramer, Lichten & Liss-Riordan P.C., Shannon Liss-Riordan, Adelaide Pagano. (Gunn, Brian) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Danny David. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/9/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13777156.) filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(David, Daniel) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 85 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ) filed byS. Patrick Mendel. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 84 Joinder re #82 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Huston, Peter) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 83 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #71 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 and 12(b)) filed by S. Patrick Mendel. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 82 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #73 MOTION to Disqualify Judge, #74 MOTION for Recusal ) filed byGarrett Camp, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 81 USCA Case Number 19-72420 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. A petition for writ of mandamus and/or prohibition. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019) Modified on 9/24/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Filing Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Emergency Motion Under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-3, Stay Requested filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Responses due by 10/7/2019. Replies due by 10/15/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by William Pelham Barr, Loretta Bitner, Elaine Chao, Phyllis J. Hamilton, Raymond Martinez, Joseph J. Simons, Sidney Runyan Thomas. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/7/2019. Replies due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #73 MOTION to Disqualify Judge filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 9/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER VACATING 9/25/2019 HEARING re #74 MOTION for Recusal filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 9/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 76 Letter to Judge White from S. Patrick Mendel. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 75 Letter to Chief Judge Hamilton from S. Patrick Mendel. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 74 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and MOTION to Recuse Judge Jon Tigar for Cause; Declaration of S. Patrick Mendel in Support filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/4/2019. Replies due by 10/11/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 73 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and MOTION for Disqualification and Objection to the Hon. Jon S. Tigar Whose Judicial Appointment Violates the Appointments Clause of the U.S. Constitution, Article II 2, Clause 2 filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/4/2019. Replies due by 10/11/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 72 Declaration of Brian H. Gunn in Support of #71 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 and 12(b), Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support filed byAnne Kramer, Lichten & Liss-Riordan P.C., Shannon Liss-Riordan, Adelaide Pagano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #71 ) (Gunn, Brian) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 and 12(b), Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support filed by Anne Kramer, Lichten & Liss-Riordan P.C., Shannon Liss-Riordan, Adelaide Pagano. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/2/2019. Replies due by 10/9/2019. (Gunn, Brian) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER VACATING 9/25/2019 HEARING. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 9/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Shannon Liss-Riordan and The Law Firm of Lichten & Liss-Riordan P.C. by S. Patrick Mendel re #6 Amended Complaint, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #4 Order (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 68 REPLY (re #51 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byMartha Guzman Aceves, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen. (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 67 REPLY (re #47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byGarrett Camp, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 66 REPLY (re #57 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) Corrected filed byLogan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Huston, Peter) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 65 REPLY (re #57 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byLogan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Huston, Peter) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 64 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION RESPONSE to #57 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant's Lyft and California Public Commissioners filed byS. Patrick Mendel. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 63 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION RESPONSE TO #47 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant's Uber filed byS. Patrick Mendel. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 62 CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND IVAR C. SATEROS REPLY In Support Of #44 Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(6) filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Ivar C. Satero. (Rollan, Raymond) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2019 Filing 61 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to Defendants City and County of San Francisco and Ivar Satero's (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by S. Patrick Mendel. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 60 Renotice motion hearing Defendant Becerra's Motion to Dismiss filed byXavier Becerra. (Russell, Jay) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 59 Request for Judicial Notice re #57 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byLogan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #57 ) (Huston, Peter) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 58 Proposed Order re #57 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Huston, Peter) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/4/2019. Replies due by 9/11/2019. (Huston, Peter) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 56 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martha Guzman Aceves, California Public Utilities Commission, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen re #51 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #52 Proposed Order, #54 Declaration in Support, #53 Request for Judicial Notice, (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 54 Declaration in Support of #53 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byMartha Guzman Aceves, California Public Utilities Commission, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 53 Request for Judicial Notice re #51 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #52 Proposed Order, filed byMartha Guzman Aceves, California Public Utilities Commission, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #51 , #52 ) (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 52 Proposed Order re #51 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Martha Guzman Aceves, California Public Utilities Commission, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen. (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Martha Guzman Aceves, California Public Utilities Commission, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/3/2019. Replies due by 9/10/2019. (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Garrett Camp, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC re #49 Declaration in Support, #48 Request for Judicial Notice, #47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 49 Declaration of Brian C. Rocca in Support of #48 Request for Judicial Notice, Re: Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byGarrett Camp, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L)(Related document(s) #48 ) (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 48 Request for Judicial Notice re #47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byGarrett Camp, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC. (Related document(s) #47 ) (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 19, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Garrett Camp, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/3/2019. Replies due by 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Case Management Conference and Continuing Motion Hearing. Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 9/25/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 8/26/2019. Replies due by 9/3/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 8/14/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #44 )(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 08/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City and County of San Francisco, Ivar C. Satero. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 8/26/2019. Replies due by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Rollan, Raymond) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 12, 2019. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #16 Stipulation REGARDING CPUC DEFENDANTS DUE DATE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Page Limits filed by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer, S. Patrick Mendel. (Huston, Peter) (Filed on 8/9/2019) Modified on 8/12/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities And Corporate Disclosure Statement by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer identifying Other Affiliate Rakuten, Inc. for Lyft, Inc. (Huston, Peter) (Filed on 8/1/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Huston on behalf of Lyft, Inc., Logan Green, and John Zimmer (Huston, Peter) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byXavier Becerra. (Russell, Jay) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Amended Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related (Docket No. 955 filed in C-13-3826 EMC) Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Garrett Camp, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities And Disclosure Statement by Garrett Camp, Ryan Graves, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC identifying Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate SB Cayman 2 Ltd. for Uber Technologies, Inc. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 7/26/2019) Modified on 7/26/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Minna L Naranjo (Naranjo, Minna) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Mundell (Mundell, Jordan) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Sujal Shah (Shah, Sujal) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Rocca (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Michael Roger (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) filed by S. Patrick Mendel. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S. Patrick Mendel re #6 Amended Complaint, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #4 Order. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. Patrick Mendel. William Pelham Barr served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019; Loretta Bitner served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019; Elaine Chao served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019; Phyllis J. Hamilton served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019; Raymond Martinez served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019; Joseph J. Simons served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019; Sidney Runyan Thomas served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. Patrick Mendel. City and County of San Francisco served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019; Ivar C. Satero served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Service waived by Logan Green waiver sent on 6/22/2019, answer due 8/21/2019; Lyft, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2019, answer due 8/21/2019; John Zimmer waiver sent on 6/22/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to William Pelham Barr, Loretta Bitner, Elaine Chao, Phyllis J. Hamilton, Raymond Martinez, Joseph J. Simons, Sidney Runyan Thomas. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to City and County of San Francisco, Ivar C. Satero. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by S. Patrick Mendel. Service waived by Martha Guzman Aceves waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; California Public Utilities Commission waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Garrett Camp waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Ryan Graves waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Maritza Perez waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Carla J. Peterman waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Michael Picker waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Liane M. Randolph waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Clifford Rechtschffen waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Travis Kalanick waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Uber Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Typo Error of Defendant Joseph J. Simons, Chairman, FTC by S. Patrick Mendel. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Order re #15 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Russell, Jay) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Martha Guzman Aceves, California Public Utilities Commission, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen re #16 Stipulation, #17 Proposed Order, #18 Notice of Appearance (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Moldavsky (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Order re #16 Stipulation by Martha Guzman Aceves, California Public Utilities Commission, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen. (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION REGARDING CPUC DEFENDANTS DUE DATE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Martha Guzman Aceves, California Public Utilities Commission, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen. (Moldavsky, Edward) (Filed on 7/11/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss #6 First Amended Complaint filed by Xavier Becerra. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 7/25/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Russell, Jay) (Filed on 7/11/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. Patrick Mendel. Martha Guzman Aceves served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Maritza Perez served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Carla J. Peterman served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; Michael Picker served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Liane M. Randolph served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019; Clifford Rechtschffen served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 Received Document - Lodged Copy of Amended Motion to Relate Case filed in 13-cv-3826-EMC by S. Patrick Mendel. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by S. Patrick Mendel. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. Patrick Mendel. Xavier Becerra served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019; City and County of San Francisco served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. Patrick Mendel. Sidney Runyan Thomas and David Anderson, U.S. Attorney, served on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Docket No. 946 filed in C-13-3826 EMC). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Sidney Runyan Thomas, U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Martha Guzman Aceves, Xavier Becerra, City and County of San Francisco, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Martha Guzman Aceves, William Pelham Barr, Xavier Becerra, Loretta Bitner, California Public Utilities Commission, Garrett Camp, Elaine Chao, City and County of San Francisco, Ryan Graves, Logan Green, Phyllis J. Hamilton, Anne Kramer, Lichten & Liss-Riordan P.C., Shannon Liss-Riordan, Lyft, Inc., Raymond Martinez, Adelaide Pagano, Maritza Perez, Carla J. Peterman, Michael Picker, Portier, LLC, Raiser-CA, LLC, Liane M. Randolph, Clifford Rechtschffen, San Francisco International Airport Commission, Ivar C. Satero, Joseph J. Simmons, Sidney Runyan Thomas, Travis Kalanick, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber USA, LLC, John Zimmer. Filed byS. Patrick Mendel. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Complaint, #2 Addendum 1, #3 Addendum 2)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re: Docket Entry 946 MOTION to Relate Case to 4:19-cv-03244-JSW Mendel v. Chao by S. Patrick Mendel filed in 13-cv-3826-EMC by S. Patrick Mendel. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/11/19. (Certificate of Service Attached)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Addendum re #1 Complaint filed byS. Patrick Mendel. (Related document(s) #1 ) (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Elaine Chao (Filing fee $ 400 PAID RECEIPT No. 34611142911.). Filed by S. Patrick Mendel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/11/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2019: #3 Corrected PDF of Complaint) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendel v. Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Patrick Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Chao
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raiser-CA, LLC
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Jordan Mundell
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Graves
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Jordan Mundell
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Camp
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Jordan Mundell
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Runyan Thomas
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Kalanick
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Jordan Mundell
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber USA, LLC
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Jordan Mundell
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco International Airport Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Jay Craig Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla J. Peterman
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Martinez
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Simons
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Peter K. Huston
Represented By: Daniel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Picker
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liane M. Randolph
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan Green
Represented By: Peter K. Huston
Represented By: Daniel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivar C. Satero
Represented By: Raymond R. Rollan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maritza Perez
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Bitner
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lichten & Liss-Riordan P.C.
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zimmer
Represented By: Peter K. Huston
Represented By: Daniel David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adelaide Pagano
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Kramer
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portier, LLC
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Jordan Mundell
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Represented By: Sujal Shah
Represented By: Jordan Mundell
Represented By: Brian C. Rocca
Represented By: Minna L Naranjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Guzman Aceves
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Rechtschffen
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Raymond R. Rollan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Public Utilities Commission
Represented By: Edward Moldavsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?