Davis v. Breed et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lee Davis
Defendant: Jewish Defense League, Nancy A. Berryhill, London Breed and City of San Francisco
Case Number: 4:2019cv03419
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jimmy Lee Davis. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #1 Envelope) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of San Francisco. Filed byJimmy Lee Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Avert Dismissal filed by Jimmy Lee Davis. Responses due by 8/1/2019. Replies due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTIONS to re #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Jimmy Lee Davis by Jimmy Lee Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/11/19. ***The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 5/10/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing specifically sent to Jimmy Lee Davis***. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ***DISREGARD, ENTERED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET #10 FOR CORRECTED ENTRY***ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/11/19. ***The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 5/10/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing specifically sent to Jimmy Lee Davis***. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/11/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/10/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Review of Complaint Under 28 USC Section 1915. Objections due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 10, 2019. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Issuance of summons and service will be determined separately. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jimmy Lee Davis.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jimmy Lee Davis. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, London Breed, Jewish Defense League (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Jimmy Lee Davis. Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Breed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewish Defense League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: London Breed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lee Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?