Bonner v. Doerr et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Bonner
Defendant: Carole Piwnica, Amyris, Inc., Kathleen Valiasek, Fernando de Castro Reinach, Patrick Yang, Christophe Vuillez, Philip Eykerman, Geoffrey Duyk, Christoph Goppelsroeder, Frank Kung, John G. Melo, R. Neil Williams, John Doerr, Steven Mills and Abdullah bin Khalifa Al Thani
Case Number: 4:2019cv03621
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Piper Molly Pehrson (Pehrson, Piper) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 9/9/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor; along with the related case set the same date and time. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RELATING CASES 19-cv-1765-YGR and 19-cv-3621-EMC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/22/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #15 Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Answer due 8/30/2019.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Abdullah bin Khalifa Al Thani, Amyris, Inc., John Doerr, Geoffrey Duyk, Philip Eykerman, Christoph Goppelsroeder, Frank Kung, John G. Melo, Steven Mills, Carole Piwnica, Fernando de Castro Reinach, Kathleen Valiasek, Christophe Vuillez, R. Neil Williams, Patrick Yang identifying Other Affiliate Eduardo Alvarez, Other Affiliate Koninklijke DSM N.V., Other Affiliate Loyola Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Vivo Capital, LLC, Other Affiliate Total Raffinage Chimie S.A., Other Affiliate James McCann, Other Affiliate Lisa Qi, Other Affiliate Nicole Kelsey, Other Affiliate Foris Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate DSM International B.V. for Amyris, Inc.. Defendants' Certification of Interested Entities (Celio, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amyris, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Koninklijke DSM N.V. for Amyris, Inc.. Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement (Celio, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Abdullah bin Khalifa Al Thani, Amyris, Inc., John Doerr, Geoffrey Duyk, Philip Eykerman, Christoph Goppelsroeder, Frank Kung, John G. Melo, Steven Mills, Carole Piwnica, Fernando de Castro Reinach, Kathleen Valiasek, Christophe Vuillez, R. Neil Williams, Patrick Yang. (Celio, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13499233.) filed by John Doerr. (Barday, Shireen) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/5/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wayne Bonner.. (Wedeking, Steven) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Dooley for Defendants John Doerr, et al. (Dooley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Celio for Defendants John Doerr, et al. (Celio, Michael) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Abdullah bin Khalifa Al Thani, Amyris, Inc., John Doerr, Geoffrey Duyk, Philip Eykerman, Christoph Goppelsroeder, Frank Kung, John G. Melo, Steven Mills, Carole Piwnica, Fernando de Castro Reinach, Kathleen Valiasek, Christophe Vuillez, R. Neil Williams, Patrick Yang. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wayne Bonner (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Abdullah bin Khalifa Al Thani, Amyris, Inc., John Doerr, Geoffrey Duyk, Philip Eykerman, Christoph Goppelsroeder, Frank Kung, John G. Melo, Steven Mills, Carole Piwnica, Fernando de Castro Reinach, Kathleen Valiasek, Christophe Vuillez, R. Neil Williams, Patrick Yang ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13459055.). Filed by Wayne Bonner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robbins, Brian) (Filed on 6/21/2019) Modified on 6/24/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner v. Doerr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Piwnica
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amyris, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Valiasek
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando de Castro Reinach
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Yang
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christophe Vuillez
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Eykerman
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Duyk
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christoph Goppelsroeder
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Kung
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Melo
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Neil Williams
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doerr
Represented By: Shireen A Barday
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mills
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdullah bin Khalifa Al Thani
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Dooley
Represented By: Michael D. Celio
Represented By: Piper Molly Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Bonner
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Craig Wallace Smith
Represented By: Steven Ray Wedeking, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?