Bankhalter v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Alan Bankhalter
Defendant: Arthur D. Levinson, Craig Federighi, Ronald D. Sugar, Apple Inc., James A. Bell, Luca Maestri, Timothy D. Cook, Andrea Jung, Susan L. Wagner, Robert A. Iger and Albert Gore, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv05881
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING AND VACATING DATES. In light of the stay, all pending dates are VACATED. Compliance hearing is set for Friday, 3/13/2020 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Joint statement containing a proposed case management schedule or the advisability of a continuing stay filed by by 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/4/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #11 Stipulation Staying Action. This action, including all deadlines and hearings is hereby temporarily stayed for a period of six (6) months. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings RE #16 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RELATING CASES 4:19-cv-2033-YGR and 5:19-cv-5881-EJD. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/3/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 5:19-cv-05881-EJD to 4:19-cv-02033-YGR. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/1/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander K. Talarides (Talarides, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Neil Kramer (Kramer, James) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Haag (Haag, Melinda) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY DERIVATIVE ACTION filed by Alan Bankhalter. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case, Reassignment Order signed by clerk on 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alan Bankhalter.. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc., James A. Bell, Timothy D. Cook, Craig Federighi, Albert Gore, Jr, Robert A. Iger, Andrea Jung, Arthur D. Levinson, Luca Maestri, Ronald D. Sugar, Susan L. Wagner. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2019. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alan Bankhalter (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint against James A. Bell, Timothy D. Cook, Craig Federighi, Albert Gore, Jr, Robert A. Iger, Andrea Jung, Arthur D. Levinson, Luca Maestri, Ronald D. Sugar, Susan L. Wagner ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13723329.). Filed byAlan Bankhalter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankhalter v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur D. Levinson
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Federighi
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Sugar
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Bell
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luca Maestri
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Cook
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Jung
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L. Wagner
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Iger
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Gore, Jr.
Represented By: James Neil Kramer
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Represented By: Alexander K. Talarides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Bankhalter
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?