Arthur et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gary Young, Jeffrey Schackart, Steven Boyd, Michael James, Oswaldo Morales, Roger Hudson-Dobbs, Mark Maynard, Timothy Wearne, Suzanne Feynman, Robert Costin, Johnny L. Lewis, Jr., Gregory Arthur, Gary Cooper, Bradley White, Willie L McKoy, Jr., Robert Pearson, Stephan Schnell and Richard Lawrence
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv08435
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (69) Stipulation in case 4:19-cv-05383-JST.Associated Cases: 4:19-cv-05383-JST, 4:19-cv-08435-JST(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., Jones and Arthur Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 2/14/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 5, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Purposes filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc., Jones and Arthur Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 2/3/2020) Modified on 2/4/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND re #1 Complaint, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 1/31/2020) Modified on 2/3/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel A. Spira.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Daniel A. Spira ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14122575.) filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Spira, Daniel) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Inn-Young Park as Counsel, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Park, Inn-Young) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Debra Elaine Pole as Counsel, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Pole, Debra) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Alycia Ann Degen as Counsel, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Joshua Eugene Anderson as Counsel, filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/31/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES. Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RELATING CASE No. 4:19-cv-08435-KAW with Case Jones, et al. v. Gilead Sciences, Inc., No. 4:19-cv-05383-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S.Tigar on January 28, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gregory Arthur, Steven Boyd, Gary Cooper, Robert Costin, Suzanne Feynman, Roger Hudson-Dobbs, Michael James, Richard Lawrence, Johnny L. Lewis, Jr., Mark Maynard, Willie L McKoy, Jr., Oswaldo Morales, Robert Pearson, Jeffrey Schackart, Stephan Schnell, Timothy Wearne, Bradley White, Gary Young.. (Drakulich, Robert) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Costin, Bradley White, Willie L McKoy, Jr., Mark Maynard, Gregory Arthur, Gary Cooper, Timothy Wearne, Michael James, Stephan Schnell, Gary Young, Richard Lawrence, Jeffrey Schackart, Roger Hudson-Dobbs, Johnny L. Lewis, Jr., Suzanne Feynman, Oswaldo Morales, Robert Pearson, Steven Boyd. Gilead Sciences, Inc. served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Durant, Christine) (Filed on 1/20/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/30/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Drakulich, Robert) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gilead Sciences, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14019741.). Filed byRobert Costin, Bradley White, Willie L McKoy, Jr., Mark Maynard, Gregory Arthur, Gary Cooper, Timothy Wearne, Michael James, Stephan Schnell, Gary Young, Richard Lawrence, Jeffrey Schackart, Roger Hudson-Dobbs, Johnny L. Lewis, Jr., Suzanne Feynman, Oswaldo Morales, Robert Pearson, Steven Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drakulich, Robert) (Filed on 12/27/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Young
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Schackart
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Boyd
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oswaldo Morales
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Hudson-Dobbs
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Maynard
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Wearne
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Feynman
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Costin
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny L. Lewis, Jr.
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Arthur
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Cooper
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley White
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie L McKoy, Jr.
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pearson
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Schnell
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lawrence
Represented By: Robert James Drakulich
Represented By: Nicholas Joseph Drakulich
Represented By: Christine M. Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Spira
Represented By: Inn-Young Park
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Represented By: Debra Elaine Pole
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?