Calkins et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian F. McMorris, Felix Jones, Nena Walby, Yolanda Laster, Dennis Deel, Robert Perosa, Kecia Scales, Terris Peeler, Gerry Horton, Terry Smith-Flores, Leon Larrew, Rita Davis, Alice L. Johnson, Walter Lee Guyton, III, Raymond Monroe Parker, Jr., Albert Yancy, Jeffrey Lee Gillum, Samuel Mcintosh, Tyrone Harris, Donald Larrew, Michael Jones, Jennifer Chapman, Kurt Becker, Mark A. Dansby, Linda Ramos, Shannon Jones, Herbert Turner, Sharon Evans, Charles Wheatley, Carolyn Williams, Joyce Anne Owens, Mitchell Guin, Suzann Delores Wolfe, Elanda Wilson Williams, Vennica Barnes, Roy Washington, Floyd Bromley-Spiegle, Albert Hicks, Benjamin Leonard, Eric Miller, Gerald Hawkins, William J. Doepper, Floyd Twyman May, Jr., Vickie Roller, Danielle Francine Santos, Lisa M. Johnson, Russell Grooms, Shelae Monae, Dennis Griffin, Mary Mercer, Michael Hall, John Plummer, Paige Morgan, Leniza King, Anthony Brian Funderburk, Daniel Henry, II, David Werner, Jeremy Malean, Kevin Keifer, Danny L. O'Brien, James Ware, Trenard Johnson, Shirley Wilkinson, Craig Walker, Clifton Lewis, Kenneth Marc Zink, Dana B. Johnson, Ernest Lee Johnson, Jr., James Michael Eaton, Jeffrey Berry, Tarell Cole, James Young, Michael Charters, Mark Deiwert, Robert Martin McCormack, David Roos, Donald Cregger, Shannon Tyrone Woods, Betty Leclercq, Jacqueline Oliver, Fabian O'Neal, Anthony Taylor, Monty Herron, Linda Olivia Johnson, James Edward Oakes, Russell Nemitz, Officer Francisco Negrete, Adrian Tyson, Kevin D. Boone, Sr., Marland Anthony Roberts, Darryl Ellis, Aaron Calkins, Jerry Villa-Chauvin, Tyrone D. Johnson, Mario Fraccet, Nadine Godden, Seth Hopkins, Mark Peconi, Diane Austin, Edward Hamilton, Vickey Lynn Boyles, Demetrius Powell, Glen Vaughn, Sam Rogers Gilkey, Stuart Addison Thomas, Bonita Graham, Ingrid Hines, Juan Plummer, Levi Hampton, Curtis Reed, Arturo Rodriguez, James Wayne Jones, Sarah Rentschler, Latasha Medford, Jonathan C. Cox, Cathy Iverson, Darren Craig Gipson, Aytan Zadok, Renee Thompson, Rose Lane, Arthur Villarreal, Jonathan Correia, Terrace Dwaine Sharp, James Berry, Delia D. Washington, Robert Paul Cochran, Reachelian T. Ellison, Antonio Ware, Keith W. Schmidt, Adan Ace Zamora, Demarco Burts, Ransom David Fields, Nathaniel Griggs, Shirley Marshall, Joshua Bolton, Ruben Alvarado, William H. Chastang, Adam T. Gabriel, Carrie Mackey, Shelia Johnson, Michael A. Jackson, Raquel Carmona, Michael Haddan, Ella Frances Chatman, Willie Nathaniel Carrigan, Debora Templeton, Carol Rose, Jerry Vaughn and Raymond Okeefe
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01884
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 5/13/2020) Modified on 5/14/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (225) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (20) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-01884-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Dismissal of Claims filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Calkins Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 4/13/2020) Modified on 4/14/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Inn-Young Park (Park, Inn-Young) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy Rene Horth-Neubert (Horth-Neubert, Stacy) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra Elaine Pole (Pole, Debra) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alycia Ann Degen (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Eugene Anderson (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (214) Stipulation Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Purposes in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (11) Stipulation Consolidating Cases for Pretrial Purposes in case 4:20-cv-01884-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES filed by Ruben Alvarado, Diane Austin, Vennica Barnes, Kurt Becker, James Berry, Jeffrey Berry, Joshua Bolton, Kevin D. Boone, Sr, Vickey Lynn Boyles, Floyd Bromley-Spiegle, Demarco Burts, Aaron Calkins, Raquel Carmona, Willie Nathaniel Carrigan, Jennifer Chapman, Michael Charters, William H. Chastang, Ella Frances Chatman, Robert Paul Cochran, Tarell Cole, Jonathan Correia, Jonathan C. Cox, Donald Cregger, Mark A. Dansby, Rita Davis, Dennis Deel, Mark Deiwert, William J. Doepper, James Michael Eaton, Darryl Ellis, Reachelian T. Ellison, Sharon Evans, Ransom David Fields, Mario Fraccet, Anthony Brian Funderburk, Adam T. Gabriel, Sam Rogers Gilkey, Jeffrey Lee Gillum, Darren Craig Gipson, Nadine Godden, Bonita Graham, Dennis Griffin, Nathaniel Griggs, Russell Grooms, Mitchell Guin, Walter Lee Guyton, III, Michael Haddan, Michael Hall, Edward Hamilton, Levi Hampton, Tyrone Harris, Gerald Hawkins, Daniel Henry, II, Monty Herron, Albert Hicks, Ingrid Hines, Seth Hopkins, Gerry Horton, Cathy Iverson, Michael A. Jackson, Alice L. Johnson, Dana B. Johnson, Ernest Lee Johnson, Jr, Linda Olivia Johnson, Lisa M. Johnson, Shelia Johnson, Trenard Johnson, Tyrone D. Johnson, Felix Jones, James Wayne Jones, Michael Jones, Shannon Jones, Kevin Keifer, Leniza King, Rose Lane, Donald Larrew, Leon Larrew, Yolanda Laster, Betty Leclercq, Benjamin Leonard, Clifton Lewis, Carrie Mackey, Jeremy Malean, Shirley Marshall, Floyd Twyman May, Jr, Robert Martin McCormack, Brian F. McMorris, Samuel Mcintosh, Latasha Medford, Mary Mercer, Eric Miller, Shelae Monae, Paige Morgan, Francisco Negrete, Russell Nemitz, Danny L. O'Brien, Fabian O'Neal, James Edward Oakes, Raymond Okeefe, Jacqueline Oliver, Joyce Anne Owens, Raymond Monroe Parker, Jr, Mark Peconi, Terris Peeler, Robert Perosa, John Plummer, Juan Plummer, Demetrius Powell, Linda Ramos, Curtis Reed, Sarah Rentschler, Marland Anthony Roberts, Arturo Rodriguez, Vickie Roller, David Roos, Carol Rose, Danielle Francine Santos, Kecia Scales, Keith W. Schmidt, Terrace Dwaine Sharp, Terry Smith-Flores, Anthony Taylor, Debora Templeton, Stuart Addison Thomas, Renee Thompson, Herbert Turner, Adrian Tyson, Glen Vaughn, Jerry Vaughn, Jerry Villa-Chauvin, Arthur Villarreal, Nena Walby, Craig Walker, Antonio Ware, James Ware, Delia D. Washington, Roy Washington, David Werner, Charles Wheatley, Shirley Wilkinson, Carolyn Williams, Elanda Wilson Williams, Suzann Delores Wolfe, Shannon Tyrone Woods, Albert Yancy, James Young, Aytan Zadok, Adan Ace Zamora, Kenneth Marc Zink and Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 4/1/2020) Modified on 4/2/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE 20-cv-01884-TSH to 18-cv-06972-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 31, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Katrina Ashley. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Robert C. Hilliard.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14295397.) filed by Ruben Alvarado, Diane Austin, Vennica Barnes, Kurt Becker, James Berry, Jeffrey Berry, Joshua Bolton, Kevin D. Boone, Sr, Vickey Lynn Boyles, Floyd Bromley-Spiegle, Demarco Burts, Aaron Calkins, Raquel Carmona, Willie Nathaniel Carrigan, Jennifer Chapman, Michael Charters, William H. Chastang, Ella Frances Chatman, Robert Paul Cochran, Tarell Cole, Jonathan Correia, Jonathan C. Cox, Donald Cregger, Mark A. Dansby, Rita Davis, Dennis Deel, Mark Deiwert, William J. Doepper, James Michael Eaton, Darryl Ellis, Reachelian T. Ellison, Sharon Evans, Ransom David Fields, Mario Fraccet, Anthony Brian Funderburk, Adam T. Gabriel, Sam Rogers Gilkey, Jeffrey Lee Gillum, Darren Craig Gipson, Nadine Godden, Bonita Graham, Dennis Griffin, Nathaniel Griggs, Russell Grooms, Mitchell Guin, Walter Lee Guyton, III, Michael Haddan, Michael Hall, Edward Hamilton, Levi Hampton, Tyrone Harris, Gerald Hawkins, Daniel Henry, II, Monty Herron, Albert Hicks, Ingrid Hines, Seth Hopkins, Gerry Horton, Cathy Iverson, Michael A. Jackson, Alice L. Johnson, Dana B. Johnson, Ernest Lee Johnson, Jr, Linda Olivia Johnson, Lisa M. Johnson, Shelia Johnson, Trenard Johnson, Tyrone D. Johnson, Felix Jones, James Wayne Jones, Michael Jones, Shannon Jones, Kevin Keifer, Leniza King, Rose Lane, Donald Larrew, Leon Larrew, Yolanda Laster, Betty Leclercq, Benjamin Leonard, Clifton Lewis, Carrie Mackey, Jeremy Malean, Shirley Marshall, Floyd Twyman May, Jr, Robert Martin McCormack, Brian F. McMorris, Samuel Mcintosh, Latasha Medford, Mary Mercer, Eric Miller, Shelae Monae, Paige Morgan, Francisco Negrete, Russell Nemitz, Danny L. O'Brien, Fabian O'Neal, James Edward Oakes, Raymond Okeefe, Jacqueline Oliver, Joyce Anne Owens, Raymond Monroe Parker, Jr, Mark Peconi, Terris Peeler, Robert Perosa, John Plummer, Juan Plummer, Demetrius Powell, Linda Ramos, Curtis Reed, Sarah Rentschler, Marland Anthony Roberts, Arturo Rodriguez, Vickie Roller, David Roos, Carol Rose, Danielle Francine Santos, Kecia Scales, Keith W. Schmidt, Terrace Dwaine Sharp, Terry Smith-Flores, Anthony Taylor, Debora Templeton, Stuart Addison Thomas, Renee Thompson, Herbert Turner, Adrian Tyson, Glen Vaughn, Jerry Vaughn, Jerry Villa-Chauvin, Arthur Villarreal, Nena Walby, Craig Walker, Antonio Ware, James Ware, Delia D. Washington, Roy Washington, David Werner, Charles Wheatley, Shirley Wilkinson, Carolyn Williams, Elanda Wilson Williams, Suzann Delores Wolfe, Shannon Tyrone Woods, Albert Yancy, James Young, Aytan Zadok, Adan Ace Zamora, Kenneth Marc Zink. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14295378.) filed by Ruben Alvarado, Diane Austin, Vennica Barnes, Kurt Becker, James Berry, Jeffrey Berry, Joshua Bolton, Kevin D. Boone, Sr, Vickey Lynn Boyles, Floyd Bromley-Spiegle, Demarco Burts, Aaron Calkins, Raquel Carmona, Willie Nathaniel Carrigan, Jennifer Chapman, Michael Charters, William H. Chastang, Ella Frances Chatman, Robert Paul Cochran, Tarell Cole, Jonathan Correia, Jonathan C. Cox, Donald Cregger, Mark A. Dansby, Rita Davis, Dennis Deel, Mark Deiwert, William J. Doepper, James Michael Eaton, Darryl Ellis, Reachelian T. Ellison, Sharon Evans, Ransom David Fields, Mario Fraccet, Anthony Brian Funderburk, Adam T. Gabriel, Sam Rogers Gilkey, Jeffrey Lee Gillum, Darren Craig Gipson, Nadine Godden, Bonita Graham, Dennis Griffin, Nathaniel Griggs, Russell Grooms, Mitchell Guin, Walter Lee Guyton, III, Michael Haddan, Michael Hall, Edward Hamilton, Levi Hampton, Tyrone Harris, Gerald Hawkins, Daniel Henry, II, Monty Herron, Albert Hicks, Ingrid Hines, Seth Hopkins, Gerry Horton, Cathy Iverson, Michael A. Jackson, Alice L. Johnson, Dana B. Johnson, Ernest Lee Johnson, Jr, Linda Olivia Johnson, Lisa M. Johnson, Shelia Johnson, Trenard Johnson, Tyrone D. Johnson, Felix Jones, James Wayne Jones, Michael Jones, Shannon Jones, Kevin Keifer, Leniza King, Rose Lane, Donald Larrew, Leon Larrew, Yolanda Laster, Betty Leclercq, Benjamin Leonard, Clifton Lewis, Carrie Mackey, Jeremy Malean, Shirley Marshall, Floyd Twyman May, Jr, Robert Martin McCormack, Brian F. McMorris, Samuel Mcintosh, Latasha Medford, Mary Mercer, Eric Miller, Shelae Monae, Paige Morgan, Francisco Negrete, Russell Nemitz, Danny L. O'Brien, Fabian O'Neal, James Edward Oakes, Raymond Okeefe, Jacqueline Oliver, Joyce Anne Owens, Raymond Monroe Parker, Jr, Mark Peconi, Terris Peeler, Robert Perosa, John Plummer, Juan Plummer, Demetrius Powell, Linda Ramos, Curtis Reed, Sarah Rentschler, Marland Anthony Roberts, Arturo Rodriguez, Vickie Roller, David Roos, Carol Rose, Danielle Francine Santos, Kecia Scales, Keith W. Schmidt, Terrace Dwaine Sharp, Terry Smith-Flores, Anthony Taylor, Debora Templeton, Stuart Addison Thomas, Renee Thompson, Herbert Turner, Adrian Tyson, Glen Vaughn, Jerry Vaughn, Jerry Villa-Chauvin, Arthur Villarreal, Nena Walby, Craig Walker, Antonio Ware, James Ware, Delia D. Washington, Roy Washington, David Werner, Charles Wheatley, Shirley Wilkinson, Carolyn Williams, Elanda Wilson Williams, Suzann Delores Wolfe, Shannon Tyrone Woods, Albert Yancy, James Young, Aytan Zadok, Adan Ace Zamora, Kenneth Marc Zink. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shannon Jones, Darryl Ellis, Mario Fraccet, John Plummer, Rose Lane, Monty Herron, Brian F. McMorris, Sarah Rentschler, Betty Leclercq, Edward Hamilton, Gerry Horton, Leniza King, Dana B. Johnson, Mary Mercer, Ingrid Hines, Carolyn Williams, Raymond Monroe Parker, Jr, Lisa M. Johnson, William J. Doepper, Darren Craig Gipson, Debora Templeton, Antonio Ware, Keith W. Schmidt, Mark Peconi, Paige Morgan, Danielle Francine Santos, Jeffrey Berry, Terris Peeler, Glen Vaughn, Jacqueline Oliver, Benjamin Leonard, Terrace Dwaine Sharp, Kevin Keifer, James Edward Oakes, Mitchell Guin, Jonathan Correia, Juan Plummer, Levi Hampton, James Ware, Jennifer Chapman, Terry Smith-Flores, Sharon Evans, Aaron Calkins, Bonita Graham, Raymond Okeefe, Kurt Becker, William H. Chastang, Aytan Zadok, Suzann Delores Wolfe, Jerry Vaughn, Renee Thompson, Vickie Roller, Fabian O'Neal, Clifton Lewis, Trenard Johnson, Samuel Mcintosh, Nathaniel Griggs, Shelia Johnson, Kenneth Marc Zink, Russell Grooms, Charles Wheatley, Michael A. Jackson, Seth Hopkins, Ella Frances Chatman, Alice L. Johnson, Michael Haddan, Demarco Burts, Robert Perosa, Donald Larrew, Adrian Tyson, David Roos, James Wayne Jones, Carrie Mackey, Albert Yancy, Kevin D. Boone, Sr, Curtis Reed, Roy Washington, Michael Hall, Jonathan C. Cox, Joshua Bolton, James Michael Eaton, Raquel Carmona, Robert Martin McCormack, Mark Deiwert, Nadine Godden, Anthony Taylor, Rita Davis, Tyrone Harris, Mark A. Dansby, Ransom David Fields, Ernest Lee Johnson, Jr, Linda Olivia Johnson, Kecia Scales, Shirley Wilkinson, Willie Nathaniel Carrigan, Sam Rogers Gilkey, Felix Jones, Dennis Deel, James Young, Michael Charters, Arthur Villarreal, Diane Austin, Floyd Twyman May, Jr, Herbert Turner, Elanda Wilson Williams, Jeffrey Lee Gillum, Carol Rose, Gerald Hawkins, Jerry Villa-Chauvin, Jeremy Malean, Tarell Cole, Robert Paul Cochran, Linda Ramos, Vickey Lynn Boyles, Tyrone D. Johnson, Danny L. O'Brien, Michael Jones, Shannon Tyrone Woods, Craig Walker, Daniel Henry, II, Ruben Alvarado, Dennis Griffin, Latasha Medford, Joyce Anne Owens, Stuart Addison Thomas, James Berry, Yolanda Laster, Shelae Monae, Francisco Negrete, Russell Nemitz, Vennica Barnes, Cathy Iverson, Donald Cregger, Eric Miller, Arturo Rodriguez, Nena Walby, Albert Hicks, Leon Larrew, Delia D. Washington, Adam T. Gabriel, Marland Anthony Roberts, Walter Lee Guyton, III, Anthony Brian Funderburk, Floyd Bromley-Spiegle, Reachelian T. Ellison, Demetrius Powell, Adan Ace Zamora, David Werner, Shirley Marshall. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please re-file the Civil cover sheet and check mark the box for Class Action if this intends to be a class action case. Re:[1-2] Civil cover sh eet, filed by Benjamin Leonard, Albert Hicks, Suzann Delores Wolfe, Lisa M. Johnson, Vickey Lynn Boyles, Demetrius Powell, Jonathan Correia, Floyd Bromley-Spiegle, Shelia Johnson, Tyrone D. Johnson, Seth Hopkins, Ernest Lee Johnson, Jr., Kecia Scales, Darren Craig Gipson, Eric Miller, Levi Hampton, Nena Walby, Betty Leclercq, Sam Rogers Gilkey, Shirley Wilkinson, Reachelian T. Ellison, Jonathan C. Cox, Willie Nathaniel Carrigan, Raquel Carmona, Mary Mercer, Dennis Griffin, Linda Ramos, Jeffrey Lee Gillum, Renee Thompson, Leniza King, Samuel Mcintosh, Jennifer Chapman, Marland Anthony Roberts, Antonio Ware, Vickie Roller, Dana B. Johnson, Donald Cregger, Darryl Ellis, Albert Yancy, Demarco Burts, Russell Grooms, James Young, Diane Austin, Jerry Vaughn, Curtis Reed, Michael Hall, Robert Paul Cochran, John Plummer, Floyd Twyman May, Jr., Robert Martin McCormack, Herbert Turner, Joshua Bolton, Walter Lee Guyton, III, Kenneth Marc Zink, Mark Peconi, Shelae Monae, Mark A. Dansby, Carol Rose, Latasha Medford, James Ware, Ransom David Fields, Terry Smith-Flores, Craig Walker, Shannon Jones, Arthur Villarreal, David Roos, Daniel Henry, II, Delia D. Washington, Mitchell Guin, Tyrone Harris, Bonita Graham, Roy Washington, Glen Vaughn, Arturo Rodriguez, Ella Frances Chatman, James Wayne Jones, Adam T. Gabriel, Fabian O'Neal, Jerry Villa-Chauvin, Vennica Barnes, Juan Plummer, Clifton Lewis, Jeffrey Berry, William J. Doepper, Nathaniel Griggs, Terrace Dwaine Sharp, Raymond Monroe Parker, Jr., Ruben Alvarado, Donald Larrew, Michael Jones, Alice L. Johnson, Sharon Evans, Mario Fraccet, Debora Templeton, Cathy Iverson, Raymond Okeefe, James Michael Eaton, Carolyn Williams, Mark Deiwert, Dennis Deel, Felix Jones, Aaron Calkins, Linda Olivia Johnson, James Edward Oakes, Adan Ace Zamora, Kevin D. Boone, Sr., Jacqueline Oliver, Leon Larrew, Michael A. Jackson, Danielle Francine Santos, Rose Lane, David Werner, Charles Wheatley, Joyce Anne Owens, Michael Charters, Gerald Hawkins, Francisco Negrete, Elanda Wilson Williams, Monty Herron, Aytan Zadok, Kevin Keifer, Gerry Horton, Terris Peeler, Robert Perosa, Adrian Tyson, Shirley Marshall, Russell Nemitz, Carrie Mackey, Kurt Becker, Stuart Addison Thomas, Tarell Cole, William H. Chastang, Edward Hamilton, Paige Morgan, Rita Davis, James Berry, Brian F. McMorris, Michael Haddan, Anthony Brian Funderburk, Keith W. Schmidt, Nadine Godden, Anthony Taylor, Sarah Rentschler, Yolanda Laster, Jeremy Malean, Ingrid Hines, Trenard Johnson, Danny L. O'Brien, Shannon Tyrone Woods. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2020 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gilead Sciences, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14289630.). Filed byShannon Jones, Darryl Ellis, Mario Fraccet, John Plummer, Rose Lane, Monty Herron, Brian F. McMorris, Sarah Rentschler, Betty Leclercq, Edward Hamilton, Gerry Horton, Leniza King, Dana B. Johnson, Mary Mercer, Ingrid Hines, Carolyn Williams, Raymond Monroe Parker, Jr, Lisa M. Johnson, William J. Doepper, Darren Craig Gipson, Debora Templeton, Antonio Ware, Keith W. Schmidt, Mark Peconi, Paige Morgan, Danielle Francine Santos, Jeffrey Berry, Terris Peeler, Glen Vaughn, Jacqueline Oliver, Benjamin Leonard, Terrace Dwaine Sharp, Kevin Keifer, James Edward Oakes, Mitchell Guin, Jonathan Correia, Juan Plummer, Levi Hampton, James Ware, Jennifer Chapman, Terry Smith-Flores, Sharon Evans, Aaron Calkins, Bonita Graham, Raymond Okeefe, Kurt Becker, William H. Chastang, Aytan Zadok, Suzann Delores Wolfe, Jerry Vaughn, Renee Thompson, Vickie Roller, Fabian O'Neal, Clifton Lewis, Trenard Johnson, Samuel Mcintosh, Nathaniel Griggs, Shelia Johnson, Kenneth Marc Zink, Russell Grooms, Charles Wheatley, Michael A. Jackson, Seth Hopkins, Ella Frances Chatman, Alice L. Johnson, Michael Haddan, Demarco Burts, Robert Perosa, Donald Larrew, Adrian Tyson, David Roos, James Wayne Jones, Carrie Mackey, Albert Yancy, Kevin D. Boone, Sr, Curtis Reed, Roy Washington, Michael Hall, Jonathan C. Cox, Joshua Bolton, James Michael Eaton, Raquel Carmona, Robert Martin McCormack, Mark Deiwert, Nadine Godden, Anthony Taylor, Rita Davis, Tyrone Harris, Mark A. Dansby, Ransom David Fields, Ernest Lee Johnson, Jr, Linda Olivia Johnson, Kecia Scales, Shirley Wilkinson, Willie Nathaniel Carrigan, Sam Rogers Gilkey, Felix Jones, Dennis Deel, James Young, Michael Charters, Arthur Villarreal, Diane Austin, Floyd Twyman May, Jr, Herbert Turner, Elanda Wilson Williams, Jeffrey Lee Gillum, Carol Rose, Gerald Hawkins, Jerry Villa-Chauvin, Jeremy Malean, Tarell Cole, Robert Paul Cochran, Linda Ramos, Vickey Lynn Boyles, Tyrone D. Johnson, Danny L. O'Brien, Michael Jones, Shannon Tyrone Woods, Craig Walker, Daniel Henry, II, Ruben Alvarado, Dennis Griffin, Latasha Medford, Joyce Anne Owens, Stuart Addison Thomas, James Berry, Yolanda Laster, Shelae Monae, Francisco Negrete, Russell Nemitz, Vennica Barnes, Cathy Iverson, Donald Cregger, Eric Miller, Arturo Rodriguez, Nena Walby, Albert Hicks, Leon Larrew, Delia D. Washington, Adam T. Gabriel, Marland Anthony Roberts, Walter Lee Guyton, III, Anthony Brian Funderburk, Floyd Bromley-Spiegle, Reachelian T. Ellison, Demetrius Powell, Adan Ace Zamora, David Werner, Shirley Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 3/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calkins et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian F. McMorris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nena Walby
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Laster
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Deel
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Perosa
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kecia Scales
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terris Peeler
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Horton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Smith-Flores
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Larrew
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice L. Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Lee Guyton, III
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Monroe Parker, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Yancy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lee Gillum
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Mcintosh
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Harris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Larrew
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Chapman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Becker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Dansby
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Ramos
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Turner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Evans
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wheatley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Anne Owens
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Guin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzann Delores Wolfe
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elanda Wilson Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vennica Barnes
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Washington
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Bromley-Spiegle
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Hicks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Leonard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Miller
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Hawkins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Doepper
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Twyman May, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Roller
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Francine Santos
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Grooms
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelae Monae
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Griffin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Mercer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hall
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Plummer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Morgan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leniza King
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Brian Funderburk
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Henry, II
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Werner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Malean
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Keifer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny L. O'Brien
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ware
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenard Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Wilkinson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Walker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Lewis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Marc Zink
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana B. Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Lee Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael Eaton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Berry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarell Cole
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Young
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Charters
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Deiwert
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Martin McCormack
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Roos
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cregger
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Tyrone Woods
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Leclercq
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Oliver
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian O'Neal
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Taylor
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty Herron
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Olivia Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Oakes
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Nemitz
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Officer Francisco Negrete
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Tyson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Boone, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marland Anthony Roberts
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Ellis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Calkins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Villa-Chauvin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone D. Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Fraccet
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Godden
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Hopkins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Peconi
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Austin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hamilton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickey Lynn Boyles
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Powell
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Vaughn
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Rogers Gilkey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Addison Thomas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita Graham
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Hines
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Plummer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Hampton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Reed
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Rodriguez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wayne Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Rentschler
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Medford
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan C. Cox
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Iverson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Craig Gipson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aytan Zadok
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Thompson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Lane
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Villarreal
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Correia
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrace Dwaine Sharp
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Berry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia D. Washington
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Paul Cochran
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reachelian T. Ellison
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Ware
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith W. Schmidt
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adan Ace Zamora
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demarco Burts
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ransom David Fields
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Griggs
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Marshall
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Bolton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Alvarado
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Chastang
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam T. Gabriel
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Mackey
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Jackson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Carmona
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Haddan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Frances Chatman
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Nathaniel Carrigan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Templeton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Rose
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Vaughn
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Okeefe
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Inn-Young Park
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Represented By: Debra Elaine Pole
Represented By: Stacy Rene Horth-Neubert
Represented By: Alycia Ann Degen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?