Pennington et al v. Gilead Sciences Inc
Plaintiff: Gerald Smith, Montrey J. Simpson, Jimmy Gambino, Herman Hamilton, Bridget Oliver, Andrew Wilson, Camerel Lonie, Sylvia Homer, Areba Wilson, Shaun Sullivan, Maximiano Silveira, Ronald Thomas, Neil D. Embry, Charles J. Dillehay, Herbert T. Lee, Daniel R. Martin, Javier Blanco, Christopher Townsend, Robert Lucas, Susan D. DeLaura, Earnest O'Neal, Gloria Harris, Rickie Robinson, Youlanda Davis, Victor H. Jaquez, Harry Weathersby, Edward Richardson, Hartsel Shirley, Patrick Gibson, Melvin Moore, Darrelyn Mason, Edmund Hopson, Robert W. Thomas, Chad E. Thorne, Mia Montgomery, Brenda Washington, Kenyata M. Moore, Sarah Krautkremer, Helena Geter, Jerry West, Reginald Rice, John Sherrod, Jean Singleton, Louis Jones, Kristi Smith, Andrew Pennington, Krystle D. Jackson, Bessie Johnson, Earl Carter, Sr., Floyd H. Simmons, Antonio Clark, Antonio Fierova, Curtis Battenfield, Timmothy George, Orville Clark, Nicole Seals, Milton Allen, Troy Brown, Tracy Calvin, Derrick Henderson, Wesley Smith, Robert Blair, Jr. and Devon Henderson
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv03489
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 02:00 PM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing ONE list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than July 15, 2020 by 2:00 P.M. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619067542?pwd=YktBS2VoNm1JYW9xMS91dk9rUzZudz09Meeting ID: 161 906 7542Password: 959588Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 02:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. The re is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Eugene Anderson on Behalf of Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (290) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (13) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-03489-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Gilead Sciences Inc. and Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 6/16/2020) Modified on 6/17/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (284) Stipulation to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Purposes in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 02:00 PM. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE 20-cv-03489-KAW to 18-cv-06972-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 5, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Katrina Ashley.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Robert Hilliard.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Katrina Ashley ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14525069.) filed by Milton Allen, Curtis Battenfield, Robert Blair, Jr., Javier Blanco, Troy Brown, Tracy Calvin, Earl Carter, Sr., Antonio Clark, Orville Clark, Youlanda Davis, Susan D. DeLaura, Charles J. Dillehay, Neil D. Embry, Antonio Fierova, Jimmy Gambino, Timmothy George, Helena Geter, Patrick Gibson, Herman Hamilton, Gloria Harris, Derrick Henderson, Devon Henderson, Sylvia Homer, Edmund Hopson, Krystle D. Jackson, Victor H. Jaquez, Bessie Johnson, Louis Jones, Sarah Krautkremer, Herbert T. Lee, Camerel Lonie, Robert Lucas, Daniel R. Martin, Darrelyn Mason, Mia Montgomery, Melvin Moore, Kenyata M. Moore, Earnest O'Neal, Bridget Oliver, Andrew Pennington, Reginald Rice, Edward Richardson, Rickie Robinson, Nicole Seals, John Sherrod, Hartsel Shirley, Maximiano Silveira, Floyd H. Simmons, Montrey J. Simpson, Jean Singleton, Gerald Smith, Kristi Smith, Wesley Smith, Shaun Sullivan, Robert W. Thomas, Ronald Thomas, Chad E. Thorne, Christopher Townsend, Brenda Washington, Harry Weathersby, Jerry West, Andrew Wilson, Areba Wilson. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 6/1/2020) Modified on 6/2/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Robert Carl Hilliard ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14525039.) filed by Milton Allen, Curtis Battenfield, Robert Blair, Jr., Javier Blanco, Troy Brown, Tracy Calvin, Earl Carter, Sr., Antonio Clark, Orville Clark, Youlanda Davis, Susan D. DeLaura, Charles J. Dillehay, Neil D. Embry, Antonio Fierova, Jimmy Gambino, Timmothy George, Helena Geter, Patrick Gibson, Herman Hamilton, Gloria Harris, Derrick Henderson, Devon Henderson, Sylvia Homer, Edmund Hopson, Krystle D. Jackson, Victor H. Jaquez, Bessie Johnson, Louis Jones, Sarah Krautkremer, Herbert T. Lee, Camerel Lonie, Robert Lucas, Daniel R. Martin, Darrelyn Mason, Mia Montgomery, Melvin Moore, Kenyata M. Moore, Earnest O'Neal, Bridget Oliver, Andrew Pennington, Reginald Rice, Edward Richardson, Rickie Robinson, Nicole Seals, John Sherrod, Hartsel Shirley, Maximiano Silveira, Floyd H. Simmons, Montrey J. Simpson, Jean Singleton, Gerald Smith, Kristi Smith, Wesley Smith, Shaun Sullivan, Robert W. Thomas, Ronald Thomas, Chad E. Thorne, Christopher Townsend, Brenda Washington, Harry Weathersby, Jerry West, Andrew Wilson, Areba Wilson. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 6/1/2020) Modified on 6/2/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Andrew Pennington. Service waived by Gilead Sciences Inc waiver sent on 5/29/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2020 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/5/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES with jury demand against Gilead Sciences Inc ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14498174.)(no process). Filed by Robert Lucas, Camerel Lonie, Areba Wilson, Gloria Harris, Tracy Calvin, Krystle D. Jackson, Helena Geter, Jimmy Gambino, Nicole Seals, Ronald Thomas, Victor H. Jaquez, Chad E. Thorne, Jerry West, Herman Hamilton, Orville Clark, Herbert T. Lee, Darrelyn Mason, Youlanda Davis, Floyd H. Simmons, Louis Jones, Jean Singleton, Earnest O'Neal, Christopher Townsend, Reginald Rice, Susan D. DeLaura, Antonio Fierova, Kristi Smith, Harry Weathersby, Robert W. Thomas, John Sherrod, Patrick Gibson, Andrew Wilson, Shaun Sullivan, Milton Allen, Timmothy George, Andrew Pennington, Sarah Krautkremer, Edmund Hopson, Bessie Johnson, Bridget Oliver, Neil D. Embry, Brenda Washington, Montrey J. Simpson, Sylvia Homer, Wesley Smith, Derrick Henderson, Edward Richardson, Hartsel Shirley, Devon Henderson, Charles J. Dillehay, Troy Brown, Curtis Battenfield, Mia Montgomery, Antonio Clark, Gerald Smith, Maximiano Silveira, Earl Carter, Sr., Kenyata M. Moore, Robert Blair, Jr., Daniel R. Martin, Melvin Moore, Rickie Robinson, Javier Blanco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 5/22/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington et al v. Gilead Sciences Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montrey J. Simpson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Gambino
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Hamilton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Oliver
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Wilson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camerel Lonie
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Homer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Areba Wilson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Sullivan
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximiano Silveira
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Thomas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil D. Embry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Dillehay
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert T. Lee
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Martin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Blanco
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Townsend
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lucas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan D. DeLaura
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest O'Neal
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Harris
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickie Robinson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youlanda Davis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor H. Jaquez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Weathersby
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Richardson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartsel Shirley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Gibson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Moore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrelyn Mason
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund Hopson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Thomas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad E. Thorne
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia Montgomery
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Washington
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyata M. Moore
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Krautkremer
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Geter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry West
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Rice
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sherrod
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Singleton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Jones
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Pennington
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystle D. Jackson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Johnson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Carter, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd H. Simmons
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Clark
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fierova
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Battenfield
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timmothy George
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orville Clark
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Seals
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Allen
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Brown
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Calvin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Henderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Blair, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Henderson
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Inc
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?