Saunders v. Doordash, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Saunders
Defendant: Doordash, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv05825
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY (re #21 MOTION to Remand ) filed by Kevin Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Allen Graves in Support of Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Kevin Saunders in Support of Remand)(Graves, Allen) (Filed on 10/8/2020) Modified on 10/9/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2020 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #21 set for 10/22/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telepho ne or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand set for 10/22/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (Related documents(s) #21 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION to Remand ) filed byDoordash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cody Aughney, #2 Declaration of Michael Holecek)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay Proceedings (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintff's First Amended Complaint filed by Doordash, Inc. and Kevin Saunders. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 9/23/2020) Modified on 9/24/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed Order re #21 MOTION to Remand [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by Kevin Saunders. (Graves, Allen) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 17, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Proposed order required in accordance with L.R. 5-1(g). Re: #21 MOTION to Remand filed by Kevin Saunders (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Motion and MOTION to Remand Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Kevin Saunders. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2020 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/1/2020. Replies due by 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Allen Graves in Support of Plaintiff Kevin Saunders' Motion for Remand, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff Kevin Saunders' Motion for Remand)(Graves, Allen) (Filed on 9/17/2020) Modified on 9/18/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE: The court order at Docket No. 19 was erroneously filed in this case and should be disregarded. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ***Filed in wrong case, please disregard*** ORDER: The court has received the parties' notice of settlement 35 . All case deadlines are vacated. The parties shall file a joint status or dismissal by November 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/15/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020) Modified on 9/15/2020 (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Kevin Saunders. (Graves, Allen) (Filed on 9/14/2020) Modified on 9/14/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadlines #15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/9/2020. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Final Approval of Class Action Settlement ) Plaintiff Kevin Saunders' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed byKevin Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Allen Graves in Support of Plaintiff Kevin Saunders' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff Kevin Saunders' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay)(Graves, Allen) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Pleading Deadlines for Defendant's Motion to Stay and Motion to Dismiss filed by Kevin Saunders and DoorDash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Pleading Deadlines for Defendant's Motion to Stay and Motion to Dismiss)(Graves, Allen) (Filed on 9/4/2020) Modified on 9/8/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Doordash, Inc... (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Saunders.. (Graves, Allen) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials DMR immediately after the case number. Re: #10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Doordash, Inc., #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Doordash, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Doordash, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/8/2020. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant DoorDash, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Doordash, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/8/2020. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas Parker in Support of Defendant DoorDash's Motion to Stay, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant DoorDash's Motion to Stay)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11/11/20 20. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Doordash, Inc. of Filing of Notice of Removal of Class Action With Superior Court (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Doordash, Inc. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz of Michael Holecek (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Doordash, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Sequoia Capital, Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M2) L.P. for Doordash, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doordash, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Sequoia Capital, Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M2) L.P. for Doordash, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. Their case number is No. CGC-20-585467]. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14831181). Filed by Doordash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cody Aughney, #2 Declaration of Joshua Lipshutz, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 8/18/2020) Modified on 8/20/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Doordash, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Saunders
Represented By: Jacqueline S Treu
Represented By: Allen Graves
Represented By: Jenny Jae Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doordash, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Represented By: Michael J. Holecek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?