Wilkerson v. Combe Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wilkerson
Defendant: Combe Incorporated, Combe Products, Inc., Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe International LLC f/k/a Combe International LTD, Walgreen Co., Combe International LLC and Combe International LTD
Case Number: 4:2021cv05859
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Wilkerson (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 8, 2021 Attorney Paul Damien Caleo's profile updated on the docket. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 11/8/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference Only. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/ (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Answer filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Heisey, Mark) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Damien Caleo (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Caleo, Paul) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Heisey (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Heisey, Mark) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 8/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth Wilkerson.. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kenneth Wilkerson. Service waived by Combe Products, Inc. waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kenneth Wilkerson. Service waived by Combe Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kenneth Wilkerson. Service waived by Combe International LLC waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kenneth Wilkerson. Service waived by Combe Incorporated waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc., Walgreen Co. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
August 2, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please re-submit ONE Summons, listing all defendants. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re : #2 - #6 Proposed Summons filed by Kenneth Wilkerson. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet by Kenneth Wilkerson . (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc., Walgreen Co. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0971-16232911). Filed by Kenneth Wilkerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rockstad, Trevor) (Filed on 7/30/2021) Modified on 8/2/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Please resubmit current Civil Cover Sheet Rev.10/20 www.cand.uscourts.gov. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit y our document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Kenneth Wilkerson (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson v. Combe Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wilkerson
Represented By: Trevor Bruce Rockstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LLC f/k/a Combe International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Mark J. Heisey
Represented By: Paul Damien Caleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?