Habeas Corpus Resource Center v. Federal Bureau of Investigations et al
Plaintiff: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations and U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 4:2021cv07665
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advance d notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 7, 2022 by 2:00 p.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/z oom/. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 11/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Bureau of Investigations, U.S. Department of Justice.. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint byFederal Bureau of Investigations, U.S. Department of Justice. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shiwon Choe (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Habeas Corpus Resource Center.. (Salyers, Jessica) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Gabrielle Schaefer (Schaefer, Rachel) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Habeas Corpus Resource Center. All Defendants. (Salyers, Jessica) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigations, U.S. Department of Justice. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Salyers, Jessica) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byHabeas Corpus Resource Center. (Salyers, Jessica) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
October 1, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file Complaint in its entirety. Re: #3 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Habeas Corpus Resource Center (msrS, COUR T STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Habeas Corpus Resource Center v. Federal Bureau of Investigations et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Salyers, Jessica) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Salyers, Jessica) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 FEE PAID (Filing fee$402,receipt number 0971-16449266). (Salyers, Jessica) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Othe r Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: 1 New Case Filing Fee filed by Habeas Corpus Resource Center (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Habeas Corpus Resource Center v. Federal Bureau of Investigations et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Jessica M Salyers
Represented By: Whitney Tipton
Represented By: Rachel Gabrielle Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Represented By: Shiwon Choe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Shiwon Choe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?