Nelson et al v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Nelson and Regina Peralta
Defendant: Kenvue Inc., McNeil Consumer Healthcare, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Haleon US Capital LLC, GSK Plc, Albertsons Companies, Inc., Target Corporation, Walmart Inc., Perrigo Company Plc and GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv04875
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Peralta, Jordan Nelson. Walmart Inc. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Peralta, Jordan Nelson. Target Corporation served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Peralta, Jordan Nelson. Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Peralta, Jordan Nelson. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Peralta, Jordan Nelson. Albertsons Companies, Inc. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 11/6/2023)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 STIPULATION to Substitute Party Name, Amend Caption, and to Enlarge Time for Responsive Proceedings Pending MDL Determination. Kenvue Inc., McNeil Consumer Healthcare, GSK Plc and Haleon US Capital LLC Terminated. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/19/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2023)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Substitute Party Name, Amend Caption, and to Enlarge Time for Responsive Proceedings Pending MDL Determination filed by Jordan Nelson, Regina Peralta. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 10/18/2023)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for January 9, 2024, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by January 2nd. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:23-cv-04875-HSG. The January 9, 2024 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2023)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 10/02/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2023)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2023)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jordan Nelson, Regina Peralta.. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 10/2/2023)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Albertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., GSK Plc, Haleon US Capital LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Kenvue Inc., McNeil Consumer Healthcare, Perrigo Company Plc, Target Corporation, Walmart Inc.. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2023)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 9/22/2023)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., GSK Plc, Haleon US Capital LLC, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Kenvue Inc., McNeil Consumer Healthcare, Perrigo Company Plc, Target Corporation, Walmart Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18673247.). Filed byRegina Peralta, Jordan Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Westcot, Sarah) (Filed on 9/22/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Nelson
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Peralta
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenvue Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeil Consumer Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haleon US Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSK Plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Company Plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare Holdings (US) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?