Davis v. Marin County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Ulysses Davis, Jr.
Defendant: Marin County Jail, Detention of Medical and all employees, Annie Marie, Carylon, Marin County Sheriff's Department, Marin County Sheriff's Deputies, Members of Board of Supervisors, O'Neill, De Lao, McKenzie, Haynes, Seyler, Filipiak and Frey
Case Number: 5:2003cv04334
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 138 of Dismissal With Prejudice, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
May 20, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 133 to Enlarge Time for Discovery, Expert Disclosures, Dispositive Motions, and Other Related Dates. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/20/10. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 13, 2010 131 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 130 for Administrative Relief From Current Dispositive Motion Hearing Date and Other Related Dates: Jury Trial set for 10/25/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/13/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 11, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Conference held 4/30/10. Case not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/11/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
September 15, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 111 Continuing Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/15/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
July 31, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing Counsel. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/30/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
May 20, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/25/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
March 18, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 101 Motion for Leave to File Emergency Injunctive Motion; Denying 102 Motion For Emergency Injunctive Relief. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
December 9, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to Pro Se Prisoner Settlement Program; Denying [92, 95] pending Motions; Instructions to Clerk. Signed By Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
September 30, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Marin County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulysses Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Leo Patrick Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin County Jail
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detention of Medical and all employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Marie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Renee Giacomini Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin County Sheriff's Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Members of Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Neill
Represented By: Rebecca S. Widen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Lao
Represented By: Rebecca S. Widen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKenzie
Represented By: Rebecca S. Widen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haynes
Represented By: Rebecca S. Widen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seyler
Represented By: Rebecca S. Widen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filipiak
Represented By: Rebecca S. Widen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frey
Represented By: Rebecca S. Widen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?