Pickens v. Pelican Bay State Prison

Plaintiff: Todd D. Pickens
Defendant: R. Jacobs, Richard Kirkland, Earl Allen, Redder, Baugh and Northrup
Case Number: 5:2004cv02621
Filed: September 15, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2012 164 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/04/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
January 19, 2012 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STATUS REPORT Status Report due by 4/6/2012.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/18/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
June 7, 2011 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 145 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement conference previously set for 1:00 p.m. is rescheduled for 11:00 a.m. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
September 15, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR REFERRAL TO THE PRO SE PRISONER EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/15/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
March 30, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/30/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
February 2, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/2/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
December 17, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR PRO SE SETTLEMENT PROGRAM PROCEEDINGS; STAYING CASE PENDING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/8/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 2, 2008 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 to Refer Case to Pro Se Mediation Program with Magistrate Judge Vadas. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/2/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 21, 2008 85 Opinion or Order of the Court **FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD**ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/14/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/21/2008 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ALLEN'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING ALLEN'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS; GRANTING DUNCAN'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND FOR DEFAULT; GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COM PEL SERVICE; DIRECTING MARSHAL TO EXPEDITE SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS REDDER AND BAUGH; DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR PROVIDE LOCATION OF DEFENDANTS JACOBS AND KIRKLAND re 53 , 55 , 64 , 65 , 71 , 72 , 73 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/18/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickens v. Pelican Bay State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd D. Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Allen
Represented By: Kathleen Jane Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redder
Represented By: Michael James Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baugh
Represented By: Michael James Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?